League of Women Voters of Missouri v. Ashcroft
Federal Civil Lawsuit Missouri Western District Court, Case No. 2:18-cv-04073-BCW
District Judge Brian C. Wimes, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 1, 2020 at 7:26 PM EDT (1.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Greater Kansas City A. Philip Randolph Institute, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Allison Boldt +1 608 445 3232 allisonboldt@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by ACLU Foundation of Missouri

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Anthony E. Rothert +1 314 669 3420 +1 314 652 3112 trothert@aclu-mo.org
Space Jessie M. Steffan +1 314 652 3114 jsteffan@aclu-mo.org
Space Gillian R. Wilcox +1 816 470 9938 +1 314 652 3112 gwilcox@aclu-mo.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Advancement Project

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sabrina Shermin Khan +1 202 728 9557 skhan@advancementproject.org
Space Denise D. Lieberman +1 314 780 1833 +1 202 728 9558 dlieberman@advancementproject.org

Toggle Switch Represented by American Civil Liberties Union

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sarah E. Brannon +1 202 675 2337 sbrannon@aclu.org
Space Davin Mckay Rosborough +1 202 675 2334 +1 202 546 0738 drosborough@aclu.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Covington & Burling, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joshua Benjamin Picker +1 212 841 1124 +1 646 441 9124 jpicker@cov.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Dēmos

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Naila S. Awan +1 212 485 6065 +1 212 633 2015 nawan@demos.org
Space Chiraag Bains +1 202 864 2746 +1 202 514 8336 cbains@demos.org
No Logo League of Women Voters of Missouri, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Allison Boldt +1 608 445 3232 allisonboldt@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by ACLU Foundation of Missouri

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Anthony E. Rothert +1 314 669 3420 +1 314 652 3112 trothert@aclu-mo.org
Space Jessie M. Steffan +1 314 652 3114 jsteffan@aclu-mo.org
Space Gillian R. Wilcox +1 816 470 9938 +1 314 652 3112 gwilcox@aclu-mo.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Advancement Project

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sabrina Shermin Khan +1 202 728 9557 skhan@advancementproject.org
Space Denise D. Lieberman +1 314 780 1833 +1 202 728 9558 dlieberman@advancementproject.org

Toggle Switch Represented by American Civil Liberties Union Foundation Of Northern California

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sarah E. Brannon +1 202 675 2337 sbrannon@aclu.org
Space Davin Mckay Rosborough +1 202 675 2334 +1 202 546 0738 drosborough@aclu.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Covington & Burling, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joshua Benjamin Picker +1 212 841 1124 +1 646 441 9124 jpicker@cov.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Dēmos

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Naila S. Awan +1 212 485 6065 +1 212 633 2015 nawan@demos.org
Space Chiraag Bains +1 202 864 2746 +1 202 514 8336 cbains@demos.org
No Logo St. Louis A. Philip Randolph Institute, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Allison Boldt +1 608 445 3232 allisonboldt@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by ACLU Foundation of Missouri

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Anthony E. Rothert +1 314 669 3420 +1 314 652 3112 trothert@aclu-mo.org
Space Jessie M. Steffan +1 314 652 3114 jsteffan@aclu-mo.org
Space Gillian R. Wilcox +1 816 470 9938 +1 314 652 3112 gwilcox@aclu-mo.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Advancement Project

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sabrina Shermin Khan +1 202 728 9557 skhan@advancementproject.org
Space Denise D. Lieberman +1 314 780 1833 +1 202 728 9558 dlieberman@advancementproject.org

Toggle Switch Represented by American Civil Liberties Union

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sarah E. Brannon +1 202 675 2337 sbrannon@aclu.org
Space Davin Mckay Rosborough +1 202 675 2334 +1 202 546 0738 drosborough@aclu.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Covington & Burling, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joshua Benjamin Picker +1 212 841 1124 +1 646 441 9124 jpicker@cov.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Dēmos

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Naila S. Awan +1 212 485 6065 +1 212 633 2015 nawan@demos.org
Space Chiraag Bains +1 202 864 2746 +1 202 514 8336 cbains@demos.org
v.
No Logo Joel W. Walters, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Missouri Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ryan Lee Bangert +1 573 751 8828 +1 573 751 0774 ryan.bangert@ago.mo.gov
Space David D Dean +1 314 340 7950 +1 314 340 7957 david.dean@ago.mo.gov
Space Russell J. Keller +1 816 889 5023 russell.keller@ago.mo.gov
No Logo John R. Ashcroft, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Missouri Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David D Dean +1 314 340 7950 +1 314 340 7957 david.dean@ago.mo.gov
Space Russell J. Keller +1 816 889 5023 russell.keller@ago.mo.gov
Office Jefferson City
Filed 4/17/2018
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 441 - Civil Rights: Voting
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331 Federal Question
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition
County Cole
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flags MAPJ,PHV
  Entries (148) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 7/1/2020, Entered: None Clerk's Judgment
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 6/12/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Attorney Fees
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 2/6/2020, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 1/16/2020, Entered: None extension of time
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 1/6/2020, Entered: None Attorney Fees
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 12/20/2019, Entered: None Order of Dismissal
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 9/27/2019, Entered: None Substitute Attorney
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 9/17/2019, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 9/6/2019, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 8/28/2019, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 3/30/2019, Entered: None Stay
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 3/6/2019, Entered: None Certificate of Service
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 2/26/2019, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 2/25/2019, Entered: None Certificate of Service
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 1/31/2019, Entered: None Certificate of Service
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 1/31/2019, Entered: None Certificate of Service
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 1/31/2019, Entered: None Notice to Take Deposition
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 1/23/2019, Entered: None Certificate of Service
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 1/23/2019, Entered: None Certificate of Service
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 1/15/2019, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 12/22/2018, Entered: None Certificate of service
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: None Answer to amended complaint
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 12/20/2018, Entered: None Answer to amended complaint
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 12/18/2018, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: None Certificate of service
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 12/15/2018, Entered: None Certificate of service
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 12/14/2018, Entered: None Certificate of service
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 12/14/2018, Entered: None Certificate of service
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 12/14/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 11/7/2018, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 11/1/2018, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 11/1/2018, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 10/31/2018, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 10/31/2018, Entered: None Amended Scheduling Order
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 10/19/2018, Entered: 10/19/2018 MOTION for Extension of Time
                                                                      Joint MOTION for extension of time to Complete Discovery and for Modification of Scheduling Order filed by David D Dean on behalf of All Defendants. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/2/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Dean, David)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Blank 101 Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: 10/10/2018 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery.Court Filing
                                                                        IT IS ORDERED the parties' second Joint Motion for Extension of Discovery Closure Deadline (Doc. #100) is GRANTED. Pursuant to the parties' agreement, the Closure Deadline established by the Scheduling Order (Doc. #81) is extended. All pretrial discovery authorized by the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure shall be completed on or before November 6, 2018. Signed on 10/10/18 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Baldwin, Joella)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: 10/10/2018, Terminated: 10/10/2018 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                                          Joint MOTION for extension of time to complete discovery to November 6, 2018 filed by Gillian R. Wilcox on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/24/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Wilcox, Gillian)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Blank 99 Filed: 10/4/2018, Entered: 10/4/2018 Order on Motion to withdraw as attorneyCourt Filing
                                                                            IT IS ORDER granting [95] Plaintiff's motion to withdraw as compliant with Local Rule 83.2. Attorney Saad U. Rizwan is withdrawn as counsel for plaintiff in this cause. Signed on 10/4/18 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Baldwin, Joella)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 9/26/2018, Entered: 9/26/2018 Memorandum and OpinionCourt Filing
                                                                              AMENDED ORDER AND OPINION: IT IS ORDERED Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Doc #31) is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. See order for details. Signed on 9/26/18 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. (Baldwin, Joella)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Blank 97 Filed: 9/26/2018, Entered: 9/26/2018 Telephone ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                Minute Entry. Proceedings held before District Judge Brian C. Wimes: TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 9/26/2018; amended order to issue. Time in court: 10:30 a.m. to 11:12 a.m.To order a transcript of this hearing please contact Denise Halasey, 816-512-5657. (Baldwin, Joella)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 96 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: 9/21/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                  IT IS ORDERED Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Doc #31) is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. See order for details. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED setting this matter for Status Teleconference on 9/26/2018 at 10:30 a.m., (C.S.T.) before District Judge Brian C. Wimes. Counsel will be provided the conference call-in numbers via e-mail this date. Signed on 9/21/18 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. (Baldwin, Joella)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: 9/21/2018, Terminated: 10/4/2018 Motion to withdraw as attorney
                                                                                    MOTION to withdraw as attorney (Saad U. Rizwan) filed by Anthony E. Rothert on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/5/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Rothert, Anthony)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: 9/14/2018 Certificate of service
                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs Second Requests for Production to Defendant Ashcroft filed by Gillian R. Wilcox on behalf of Plaintiffs Greater Kansas City A. Philip Randolph Institute, League of Women Voters of Missouri, St. Louis A. Philip Randolph Institute.(Wilcox, Gillian)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: 9/14/2018 Certificate of service
                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs Second Interrogatories Directed to Defendant Ashcroft filed by Gillian R. Wilcox on behalf of Plaintiffs Greater Kansas City A. Philip Randolph Institute, League of Women Voters of Missouri, St. Louis A. Philip Randolph Institute.(Wilcox, Gillian)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: 9/14/2018 Certificate of service
                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs First Requests for Admissions to Defendant Ashcroft filed by Gillian R. Wilcox on behalf of Plaintiffs Greater Kansas City A. Philip Randolph Institute, League of Women Voters of Missouri, St. Louis A. Philip Randolph Institute.(Wilcox, Gillian)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: 9/14/2018 Certificate of service
                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by John R. Ashcroft, Joel W. Walters COS re Defendants First Interrogatories and RFP to Plaintiffs filed by David D Dean on behalf of Defendants John R. Ashcroft, Joel W. Walters.(Dean, David)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 9/10/2018, Entered: 9/10/2018 Certificate of service
                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs Second Requests for Production to Defendant Joel L. Walters filed by Gillian R. Wilcox on behalf of Plaintiffs Greater Kansas City A. Philip Randolph Institute, League of Women Voters of Missouri, St. Louis A. Philip Randolph Institute.(Wilcox, Gillian)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 9/10/2018, Entered: 9/10/2018 Certificate of service
                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs Second Requests for Admissions to Defendant Joel L. Walters filed by Gillian R. Wilcox on behalf of Plaintiffs Greater Kansas City A. Philip Randolph Institute, League of Women Voters of Missouri, St. Louis A. Philip Randolph Institute.(Wilcox, Gillian)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 9/10/2018, Entered: 9/10/2018 Certificate of service
                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs Second Interrogatories Directed to Defendant Joel L. Walters filed by Gillian R. Wilcox on behalf of Plaintiffs Greater Kansas City A. Philip Randolph Institute, League of Women Voters of Missouri, St. Louis A. Philip Randolph Institute.(Wilcox, Gillian)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 87 Filed: 8/31/2018, Entered: 8/31/2018 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery.Court Filing
                                                                                                    IT IS ORDERED the parties' Joint Motion for Extension of Discovery Closure Deadline (Doc. #86) is GRANTED. The Closure Deadline established by the Scheduling Order (Doc. #81) is extended by 30 days. All pretrial discovery authorized by the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure shall be completed on or before October 20, 2018. Signed on 8/31/18 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Baldwin, Joella)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 8/29/2018, Entered: 8/29/2018, Terminated: 8/31/2018 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                                                                      Joint MOTION for extension of time to complete discovery from September 20, 2018 to October 20, 2018 filed by Anthony E. Rothert on behalf of League of Women Voters of Missouri. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/12/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Rothert, Anthony)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 85 Filed: 8/28/2018, Entered: 8/28/2018 settlement conferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                        Minute Entry. Unrecorded settlement proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William A. Knox on 8/28/2018. Case did not settle. (Price, Jackie)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 8/24/2018, Entered: 8/24/2018 Proposed Findings of Fact
                                                                                                          PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT by Greater Kansas City A. Philip Randolph Institute, League of Women Voters of Missouri, St. Louis A. Philip Randolph Institute . (Rothert, Anthony)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 8/25/2018, Entered: None Proposed Findings of Fact
                                                                                                            PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT by Greater Kansas City A. Philip Randolph Institute, League of Women Voters of Missouri, St. Louis A. Philip Randolph Institute . (Rothert, Anthony) (Entered: 08/24/2018)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 8/24/2018, Entered: 8/24/2018 Proposed Findings of Fact
                                                                                                              PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT by John R. Ashcroft, Joel W. Walters (Defendants' Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law). (Attachments: # (1) Defendants' Exhibit 1, # (2) Defendants' Exhibit 2, # (3) Defendants' Exhibit 3, # (4) Defendants' Exhibit 7, # (5) Defendants' Exhibit 8, # (6) Defendants' Exhibit 9, # (7) Defendants' Exhibit 10, # (8) Defendants' Exhibit 11, # (9) Defendants' Exhibit 13, # (10) Defendants' Exhibit 14, # (11) Defendants' Exhibit 15, # (12) Defendants' Exhibit 16, # (13) Plaintiffs' Exhibit 1, # (14) Plaintiffs' Exhibit 3, # (15) Plaintiffs' Exhibit 11, # (16) Plaintiffs' Exhibit 12, # (17) Plaintiffs' Exhibit 13, # (18) Plaintiffs' Exhibit 14, # (19) Plaintiffs' Exhibit 15, # (20) Plaintiffs' Exhibit 16)(Dean, David)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 8/13/2018, Entered: 8/13/2018 Electronic TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                ELECTRONIC TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held August 8, 2018 before Judge Brian C. Wimes. Court Reporter: Denise Halasey, 816-512-5657, denise_halasey@mow.uscourts.gov. Number of pages: 191. NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 7 calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Redaction, of the parties' intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy is located on our website at www.mow.uscourts.gov. Please read this policy carefully. NOTICE: Attorneys must contact the court reporter for copies during this 90 day period. Notice of Intent to File Redaction of Transcripts due by 8/20/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/8/2018.(Halasey, Denise)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 8/8/2018, Entered: 8/8/2018 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  SCHEDULING ORDER:Final Pretrial Teleconference set for 3/21/2019 at 2:00 p.m. Parties will be provided the call-in numbers via e-mail at a later date. Bench Trial(3-5 days) set for 4/15/2019 at 9:00 a.m., in Courtroom 3B, Jefferson City, before District Judge Brian C. Wimes. Signed on 8/8/18 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. (Baldwin, Joella)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 8/8/2018, Entered: 8/8/2018 Exhibit
                                                                                                                    DEFENDANT'S EXHIBIT INDEX (MOTION HEARING). (Baldwin, Joella)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 8/8/2018, Entered: 8/8/2018 Exhibit
                                                                                                                      PLAINTIFF'S EXHIBIT INDEX (MOTION HEARING). (Baldwin, Joella)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 8/8/2018, Entered: 8/8/2018 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        Minute Entry. Proceedings held before District Judge Brian C. Wimes: Oral Argument re: Plaintiffs (#31) Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Case Management Conference held this date. Counsel shall file their Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law on or before August 24, 2018 and e-mail a Word version to the Courtroom Deputy. Case management conference held; scheduling order to issue. Time in court: 9:30 a.m. to 3:05 p.m. To order a transcript of this hearing please contact Denise Halasey, 816-512-5657. (Baldwin, Joella)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 77 Filed: 8/8/2018, Entered: 8/8/2018 Order on Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [75] motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Sabrina Shermin Khan for plaintiff's allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached.(Geiser, Angel)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 8/7/2018, Entered: 8/7/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                            NOTICE of appearance by Russell J. Keller on behalf of John R. Ashcroft, Joel W. Walters (Attorney Russell J. Keller added to party John R. Ashcroft(pty:dft), Attorney Russell J. Keller added to party Joel W. Walters(pty:dft))(Keller, Russell)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 8/7/2018, Entered: 8/7/2018, Terminated: 8/8/2018 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                              Motion to allow Sabrina Shermin Khan to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-5814625) filed by Anthony E. Rothert on behalf of League of Women Voters of Missouri. (Rothert, Anthony)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 74 Filed: 8/6/2018, Entered: 8/6/2018 Order on Motion to withdraw as attorneyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                IT IS ORDERED Attorney Doug Shull's Motion to Withdraw as Attorney (Doc. #73) is GRANTED. Signed on 8/6/18 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached.(Baldwin, Joella)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 8/3/2018, Entered: 8/3/2018, Terminated: 8/6/2018 Motion to withdraw as attorney
                                                                                                                                  MOTION to withdraw as attorney filed by Doug Shull on behalf of John R. Ashcroft. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/17/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Shull, Doug)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 8/1/2018, Entered: 8/1/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of appearance by David D Dean on behalf of John R. Ashcroft (Attorney David D Dean added to party John R. Ashcroft(pty:dft))(Dean, David)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 7/27/2018, Entered: 7/27/2018 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by John R. Ashcroft "Defendant Ashcroft's Objections and Response to Plaintiff's First Interrogatories and Request for Production" filed by Doug Shull on behalf of Defendant John R. Ashcroft.(Shull, Doug)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 7/27/2018, Entered: 7/27/2018 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Joel W. Walters re Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs First Interrogatories, Requests for Admission, and Requests for Production filed by David D Dean on behalf of Defendant Joel W. Walters.(Dean, David)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 7/16/2018, Entered: 7/16/2018 Notice to Take Deposition
                                                                                                                                          NOTICE to take deposition of John R. Ashcroft in his official capacity as the Missouri Secretary of State filed by Gillian R. Wilcox on behalf of Plaintiffs Greater Kansas City A. Philip Randolph Institute, League of Women Voters of Missouri, St. Louis A. Philip Randolph Institute.(Wilcox, Gillian)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 7/16/2018, Entered: 7/16/2018 Notice to Take Deposition
                                                                                                                                            NOTICE to take deposition of Joel W. Walters in his official capacity as the Director of the Missouri Department of Revenue filed by Gillian R. Wilcox on behalf of Plaintiffs Greater Kansas City A. Philip Randolph Institute, League of Women Voters of Missouri, St. Louis A. Philip Randolph Institute.(Wilcox, Gillian)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 7/5/2018, Entered: 7/5/2018 Answer to amended complaint
                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to [19] Amended Complaint,, on behalf of John R. Ashcroft.(Shull, Doug)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 6/29/2018, Entered: None Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 6/30/2018, Entered: None Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 6/29/2018, Entered: None Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 6/30/2018, Entered: None Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 6/29/2018, Entered: None Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 6/30/2018, Entered: None Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 6/29/2018, Entered: None Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 6/30/2018, Entered: None Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 6/29/2018, Entered: None Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 6/30/2018, Entered: None Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 6/22/2018, Entered: None Reply Suggestions to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 6/23/2018, Entered: None Reply Suggestions to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 60 Filed: 6/21/2018, Entered: 6/21/2018 Order on motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdictionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        IT IS ORDERED Defendant John Ashcrofts Motion to Dismiss (Doc. #28) is DENIED. Signed on 6/21/18 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. (Baldwin, Joella)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 59 Filed: 6/20/2018, Entered: 6/20/2018 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          IT IS ORDERED Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limit (Doc. #58) is DENIED. Signed on 6/20/18 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached.(Baldwin, Joella)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 6/19/2018, Entered: 6/19/2018, Terminated: 6/20/2018 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for leave to file excess pages filed by Gillian R. Wilcox on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 7/3/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Wilcox, Gillian)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 57 Filed: 6/18/2018, Entered: 6/18/2018 scheduling conferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry. Proceedings held before District Judge Brian C. Wimes: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE CONTINUED. Motion Hearing re: Doc. # 31 - Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction set for 8/8/2018 at 9:30 a.m., in Courtroom 7D, Kansas City (BCW) before District Judge Brian C. Wimes. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. Time in court: 10:05 a.m. to 10:25 a.m. To order a transcript of this hearing please contact Denise Halasey, 816-512-5657. (Baldwin, Joella)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 6/15/2018, Entered: 6/15/2018 Reply Suggestions to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re [28] MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) filed by Doug Shull on behalf of Defendant John R. Ashcroft. (Related document(s)[28]) (Shull, Doug)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 55 Filed: 6/15/2018, Entered: 6/15/2018 Order on Motion for Leave to AppearCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [52] Plaintiff's motion for pro hac vice counsel to appear telephonically at the Case Management (Scheduling) Conference on Monday, June 18, 2018 at 10:00 a.m. (C.S.T.). Counsel will be provided the conference call-in numbers via e-mail this date. Signed on 6/15/18 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached.(Baldwin, Joella)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 54 Filed: 6/15/2018, Entered: 6/15/2018 Order on Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [48] motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Denise Debra Lieberman for Greater Kansas City A. Philip Randolph Institute, League of Women Voters of Missouri, and for St. Louis A. Philip Randolph Institute allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached.(Geiser, Angel)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 53 Filed: 6/15/2018, Entered: 6/15/2018 Order on Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER denying [50] motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. The court has denied your pro hac vice motion because no indication was made in regards to enrollment into a District Court, as required pursuant to 83.5 (h) To better meet the requirements of recently amended Local Rule 83.5(h), the pro hac vice form was revised. This new form is now required and is available on our court website at Pro Hac Vice Form. If you still wish to proceed pro hac vice in this case, please refile your motion using the correct form, indicating all District Court (s) you are enrolled in. To avoid being charged a duplicate fee, please insert the receipt number issued for this motion in the receipt box on your new filing. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached.(Geiser, Angel)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 6/14/2018, Entered: 6/14/2018, Terminated: 6/15/2018 Motion for Leave to Appear
                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for leave to appear by telephone filed by Gillian R. Wilcox on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 6/28/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Wilcox, Gillian)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 51 Filed: 6/14/2018, Entered: 6/14/2018 order on motion for miscellaneous reliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [49] defense counsel's motion to appear telephonically at the Scheduling Conference set on 6/18/18 at 10:00 a.m. before district Judge Brian C. Wimes. Counsel will be provided the conference call-in numbers via e-mail this date. Signed on 6/14/18 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached.(Baldwin, Joella)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 6/13/2018, Entered: 6/13/2018, Terminated: 6/15/2018 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                            Motion to allow Sabrina S. Khan to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-5814625) filed by Anthony E. Rothert on behalf of Greater Kansas City A. Philip Randolph Institute, League of Women Voters of Missouri. (Rothert, Anthony)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 6/13/2018, Entered: 6/13/2018, Terminated: 6/14/2018 Motion for order
                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for order PERMISSION TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE re [45] Notice of Hearing, filed by Doug Shull on behalf of All Defendants. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 6/27/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s)[45]) (Shull, Doug)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 6/13/2018, Entered: 6/13/2018, Terminated: 6/15/2018 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                Motion to allow Denise D. Lieberman to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-5813090) filed by Anthony E. Rothert on behalf of Greater Kansas City A. Philip Randolph Institute, League of Women Voters of Missouri, St. Louis A. Philip Randolph Institute. (Rothert, Anthony)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 6/8/2018, Entered: 6/8/2018 Suggestions in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUGGESTIONS in opposition re [31] MOTION for preliminary injunction filed by David D Dean on behalf of Defendants John R. Ashcroft, Joel W. Walters. Reply suggestions due by 6/22/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A (Wisch Declaration))(Related document(s)[31]) (Dean, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 6/8/2018, Entered: 6/8/2018 CERTIFICATE of service of initial Rule 26 disclosures
                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES of Defendant Ashcroft filed by Doug Shull on behalf of Defendant John R. Ashcroft.(Shull, Doug)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 45 Filed: 6/6/2018, Entered: 6/6/2018 Notice of hearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      **AMENDED** NOTICE OF HEARING - This is the official notice for this hearing. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. Due to the Court's trial calendar, the Scheduling Conference is RESET from 6/20/18 to 6/18/2018 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 7D, Kansas City (BCW) before District Judge Brian C. Wimes. (Baldwin, Joella)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 6/5/2018, Entered: 6/5/2018 CERTIFICATE of service of initial Rule 26 disclosures
                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Anthony E. Rothert on behalf of Plaintiffs Greater Kansas City A. Philip Randolph Institute, League of Women Voters of Missouri, St. Louis A. Philip Randolph Institute.(Rothert, Anthony)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 6/5/2018, Entered: 6/5/2018 CERTIFICATE of service of initial Rule 26 disclosures
                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by David D Dean on behalf of Defendant Joel W. Walters.(Dean, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 6/1/2018, Entered: None Suggestions in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 6/2/2018, Entered: None Suggestions in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 5/31/2018, Entered: 5/31/2018 Proposed Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by Greater Kansas City A. Philip Randolph Institute. (Rothert, Anthony)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 40 Filed: 5/29/2018, Entered: 5/29/2018 Order on motion to amend/correctCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  IT IS ORDERED Defendants' Amended Motion for Extension of Time (Doc. #[37]) is GRANTED. Defendants shall file a response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction on or before June 8, 2018. Signed on 05/29/18 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Carritt, Shelly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 39 Filed: 5/29/2018, Entered: 5/29/2018 Order on motion for extension of timeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    IT IS ORDERED Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time (Doc. #[36]) is GRANTED. Defendants shall file a response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction on or before June 8, 2018. Signed on 05/29/18 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Carritt, Shelly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 38 Filed: 5/29/2018, Entered: 5/29/2018 Order on motion for extension of time to file Response/ReplyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      IT IS ORDERED Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Time (Doc. #[34]) is GRANTED. Plaintiffs shall file a response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss on or before June 1, 2018. Signed on 05/29/18 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Carritt, Shelly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 5/29/2018, Entered: 5/29/2018, Terminated: 5/29/2018 motion to amend/correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to amend/correct [36] Joint MOTION for extension of time filed by Doug Shull on behalf of John R. Ashcroft, Joel W. Walters. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 6/12/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s)[36]) (Shull, Doug)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 5/29/2018, Entered: 5/29/2018, Terminated: 5/29/2018 MOTION for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Joint MOTION for extension of time filed by Doug Shull on behalf of John R. Ashcroft, Joel W. Walters. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 6/12/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Shull, Doug)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 5/29/2018, Entered: 5/29/2018 Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to motion re [34] MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply as to [28] MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) filed by Doug Shull on behalf of Defendant John R. Ashcroft. Reply suggestions due by 6/12/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Shull, Doug)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 5/25/2018, Entered: 5/25/2018, Terminated: 5/29/2018 motion for extension of time to file response/reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply as to [28] MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) filed by Anthony E. Rothert on behalf of Greater Kansas City A. Philip Randolph Institute, League of Women Voters of Missouri, St. Louis A. Philip Randolph Institute. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 6/8/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s)[28]) (Rothert, Anthony)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 5/22/2018, Entered: 5/22/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of appearance by Ryan Lee Bangert on behalf of Joel W. Walters (Attorney Ryan Lee Bangert added to party Joel W. Walters(pty:dft))(Bangert, Ryan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/18/2018, Entered: None Suggestions in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/19/2018, Entered: None Suggestions in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/18/2018, Entered: None Preliminary Injunction
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/19/2018, Entered: None Preliminary Injunction
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/15/2018, Entered: 5/15/2018 Answer to amended complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to [19] Amended Complaint,, on behalf of Joel W. Walters.(Dean, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 29 Filed: 5/15/2018, Entered: 5/15/2018 Order on Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [27] motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Allison Boldt for Greater Kansas City A. Philip Randolph Institute,Allison Boldt for League of Women Voters of Missouri,Allison Boldt for St. Louis A. Philip Randolph Institute allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached.(Russel, Jeri)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/15/2018, Entered: 5/15/2018, Terminated: 6/21/2018 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) filed by Doug Shull on behalf of John R. Ashcroft. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/29/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Shull, Doug)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/14/2018, Entered: 5/14/2018, Terminated: 5/15/2018 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Motion to allow Allison Boldt to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-5774479) filed by Anthony E. Rothert on behalf of St. Louis A. Philip Randolph Institute. (Rothert, Anthony)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 26 Filed: 5/4/2018, Entered: 5/4/2018 Order on Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [23] motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Saad U Rizwan for Plaintiff's allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached.(Geiser, Angel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 25 Filed: 5/3/2018, Entered: 5/3/2018 Notice of hearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF HEARING - This is the official notice for this hearing. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. Parties are directed to review the MAP General Order docketed in this case. All persons with actual settlement authority are required to attend the mediation. Additionally, if an insurance representatives approval is required to settle, they must attend in person. Parties are also directed to submit a combined mediation statement of no more than four pages to angel_geiser@mow.uscourts.gov at least seven days prior to the mediation. Settlement Conference set for 8/28/2018 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3B, Jefferson City (WAK) before Magistrate Judge William A. Knox. (Geiser, Angel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/3/2018, Entered: 5/3/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of appearance by David D Dean on behalf of Joel W. Walters (Attorney David D Dean added to party Joel W. Walters(pty:dft))(Dean, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/2/2018, Entered: 5/2/2018, Terminated: 5/4/2018 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Motion to allow Saad U. Rizwan to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-5760284) filed by Anthony E. Rothert on behalf of Greater Kansas City A. Philip Randolph Institute, League of Women Voters of Missouri, St. Louis A. Philip Randolph Institute. (Rothert, Anthony)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/2/2018, Entered: 5/2/2018 Rule 16 NoticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 6/8/2018. Rule 26 conference due by 5/25/2018. Scheduling Conference set for 6/20/2018 at 9:30 a.m., in Courtroom 7D, Kansas City (BCW) before District Judge Brian C. Wimes. Signed on 5/2/18 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. (Baldwin, Joella)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/1/2018, Entered: 5/1/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of appearance by Doug Shull on behalf of John R. Ashcroft (Attorney Doug Shull added to party John R. Ashcroft(pty:dft))(Shull, Doug)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 20 Filed: 4/25/2018, Entered: 4/25/2018 Order on Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [17] motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Chiraag Bains for Greater Kansas City A. Philip Randolph Institute, League of Women Voters of Missouri, and St. Louis A. Philip Randolph Institute allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached.(Geiser, Angel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/24/2018, Entered: 4/24/2018 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AMENDED COMPLAINT against John R. Ashcroft, Joel W. Walters filed by Anthony E. Rothert on behalf of League of Women Voters of Missouri, Greater Kansas City A. Philip Randolph Institute, St. Louis A. Philip Randolph Institute. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Ex. A - NVRA Notice Letter, # (2) Exhibit Ex. B - Letter to MO SOS with attachment, # (3) Exhibit Ex. C - Letter to MO DOR with attachments, # (4) Exhibit Ex. D - MO DOR Online Request for Change of Address, # (5) Exhibit Ex. E - Form 4160 - Mail-To Address Change Request, # (6) Exhibit Ex. F - Form 4317 - Mail-in Driver License Application, # (7) Exhibit Ex. G - Form 4318 - Military Application with Power of Attorney)(Rothert, Anthony)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/24/2018, Entered: 4/24/2018 Disclosure of corporate interests
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Amended DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Anthony E. Rothert on behalf of Plaintiff Greater Kansas City A. Philip Randolph Institute.(Rothert, Anthony)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: 4/23/2018, Terminated: 4/25/2018 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Motion to allow Chiraag Bains to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-5743082) filed by Anthony E. Rothert on behalf of Greater Kansas City A. Philip Randolph Institute, League of Women Voters of Missouri, St. Louis A. Philip Randolph Institute. (Rothert, Anthony)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 16 Filed: 4/19/2018, Entered: 4/19/2018 Order on Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [15] motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Sarah Brannon for Greater Kansas City A. Philip Randolph Institute, League of Women Voters of Missouri, and St. Louis A. Philip Randolph Institute allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a CM/ECF account. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Please return the original completed ECF Registration Form to 80 Lafayette Street, Jefferson City, Missouri 65101. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached.(Geiser, Angel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/19/2018, Entered: 4/19/2018, Terminated: 4/19/2018 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Motion to allow Sarah Brannon to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number 0866-5737036) filed by Anthony E. Rothert on behalf of Greater Kansas City A. Philip Randolph Institute, League of Women Voters of Missouri, St. Louis A. Philip Randolph Institute. (Rothert, Anthony)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 14 Filed: 4/19/2018, Entered: 4/19/2018 Order on Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [5] [10] [12] motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorneys Joshua B Picker Naila S Awan and Davin Rosborough for plaintiff's allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a CM/ECF account. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Please return the original completed ECF Registration Form to 80 Lafayette Street, Jefferson City, Missouri 65101. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached.(Geiser, Angel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/18/2018, Entered: 4/18/2018 Return of Service of Complaint Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by All Plaintiffs. Joel W. Walters served on 4/17/2018, answer due 5/8/2018. (Rothert, Anthony)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/18/2018, Entered: 4/18/2018, Terminated: 4/19/2018 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Motion to allow Davin M. Rosborough to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number 0866-5735058) filed by Anthony E. Rothert on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Rothert, Anthony)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/18/2018, Entered: 4/18/2018 Return of Service of Complaint Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by All Plaintiffs. John R. Ashcroft served on 4/17/2018, answer due 5/8/2018. (Rothert, Anthony)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/18/2018, Entered: 4/18/2018, Terminated: 4/19/2018 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Motion to allow Naila S. Awan to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number 0866-5733942) filed by Anthony E. Rothert on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Rothert, Anthony)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/17/2018, Entered: 4/17/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of appearance by Gillian R. Wilcox on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attorney Gillian R. Wilcox added to party Greater Kansas City A. Philip Randolph Institute(pty:pla), Attorney Gillian R. Wilcox added to party League of Women Voters of Missouri(pty:pla), Attorney Gillian R. Wilcox added to party St. Louis A. Philip Randolph Institute(pty:pla))(Wilcox, Gillian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/17/2018, Entered: 4/17/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of appearance by Jessie Steffan on behalf of Greater Kansas City A. Philip Randolph Institute, League of Women Voters of Missouri, St. Louis A. Philip Randolph Institute (Attorney Jessie Steffan added to party Greater Kansas City A. Philip Randolph Institute(pty:pla), Attorney Jessie Steffan added to party League of Women Voters of Missouri(pty:pla), Attorney Jessie Steffan added to party St. Louis A. Philip Randolph Institute(pty:pla))(Steffan, Jessie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/17/2018, Entered: 4/17/2018 Notice of MAPJCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to United States Magistrate Judge William A. Knox. (Attachments: # (1) MAP General Order)(Lock, Tania)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 6 Filed: 4/17/2018, Entered: 4/17/2018 Order Transferring/Reassigning CaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER TRANSFERRING/REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to District Judge Brian C. Wimes for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Willie J. Epps, Jr no longer assigned to case Signed on 04/17/2018 by Clerk of Court. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Lock, Tania)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/17/2018, Entered: 4/17/2018, Terminated: 4/19/2018 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Motion to allow Joshua B. Picker to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number 0866-5732985) filed by Anthony E. Rothert on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Rothert, Anthony)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/17/2018, Entered: 4/17/2018 Disclosure of corporate interests
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Anthony E. Rothert on behalf of Plaintiff Greater Kansas City A. Philip Randolph Institute.(Rothert, Anthony)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/17/2018, Entered: 4/17/2018 Disclosure of corporate interests
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Anthony E. Rothert on behalf of Plaintiff St. Louis A. Philip Randolph Institute.(Rothert, Anthony)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/17/2018, Entered: 4/17/2018 Disclosure of corporate interests
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Anthony E. Rothert on behalf of Plaintiff League of Women Voters of Missouri.(Rothert, Anthony)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/17/2018, Entered: 4/17/2018 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Anthony E. Rothert on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Filing fee $400, receipt number 0866-5732901. Service due by 7/16/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Ex. A - NVRA Notice Letter, # (2) Exhibit Ex. B - Letter to Missouri Secretary of State with attachments, # (3) Exhibit Ex. C - Letter to Missouri Department of Revenue with attachments, # (4) Exhibit Ex. D - Missouri Department of Revenue Online Request for Change of Address, # (5) Exhibit Ex. E - Form 4160 - Mail-To Address Change Request, # (6) Exhibit Ex. F - Form 4317 - Mail-in Driver License Application, # (7) Exhibit Ex. G - Form 4318 - Military Application with Power of Attorney, # (8) Civil Cover Sheet)(Rothert, Anthony)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/20/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to withdraw as attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to John R. Ashcroft, Joel W. Walters and emailed to plaintiff's counsel. (Lock, Tania)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 24 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?