Secure Cam, LLC v. Project Nursery, LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:18-cv-02335

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 9, 2019 at 3:02 AM ST (2.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Secure Cam, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by 371 Dogwood Way

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nicholas Richard Ranallo +1 831 703 4011 +1 831 533 5073 nick@ranallolawoffice.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Brandt Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE Todd Y Brandt +1 903 212 3130 +1 903 753 6761 tbrandt@thebrandtlawfirm.com
v.
No Logo Project Nursery, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Voxx Accessories Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Brown Wegner Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY William J Brown, Jr. +1 949 705 0080 bill@brownwegner.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Matthew K Wegner +1 949 705 0080 mwegner@brownwegner.com
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1126
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (30) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 6/26/2018, Entered: 6/26/2018 Receipt
Receipt of acknowledgment - Case transferred from California Northern has been opened in Southern District of Indiana as case 1:18-cv-01922, filed 06/26/2018.. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2018)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/21/2018, Entered: 6/21/2018 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
    ORDER Granting 27 Joint Stipulation for Transfer to the Southern District of Indiana. THE CLERK SHALL CLOSE THE FILE. All deadlines/hearings are terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/21/2018. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2018)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/21/2018, Entered: 6/21/2018 Stipulation And [proposed} Order
      STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER FOR TRANSFER TO THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF INDIANA filed by Voxx Accessories Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Brown, William) (Filed on 6/21/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/21/2018, Entered: 6/21/2018 Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures
        Certificate of Interested Entities by Voxx Accessories Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Voxx International for Voxx Accessories Corporation. (Brown, William) (Filed on 6/21/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/21/2018, Entered: 6/21/2018 Notice of appearance
          NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Keenan Wegner (Wegner, Matthew) (Filed on 6/21/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/21/2018, Entered: 6/21/2018 Notice of appearance
            NOTICE of Appearance by William James Brown, Jr (Brown, William) (Filed on 6/21/2018)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/11/2018, Entered: 6/11/2018 Order Reassigning CaseCourt Filing
              ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Virginia K DeMarchi for all further discovery proceedings. Judge Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd no longer assigned to the case. Signed by The Executive Committee on 6/7/2018. (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2018)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/31/2018, Entered: 5/31/2018 waiver of service executed
                WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Secure Cam, LLC. Service waived by Voxx Accessories Corporation waiver sent on 5/21/2018, answer due 7/20/2018. (Brandt, Todd) (Filed on 5/31/2018)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/18/2018, Entered: 5/18/2018 Notice - other
                  NOTICE by Secure Cam, LLC of AO 120 - Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent (Brandt, Todd) (Filed on 5/18/2018)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/18/2018, Entered: 5/18/2018 Amended Complaint
                    AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against Voxx Accessories Corporation. Filed bySecure Cam, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Patent 7257158, # 2 Exhibit B - Project Nursery Claim Chart)(Brandt, Todd) (Filed on 5/18/2018)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/1/2018, Entered: None Clerks Notice
                      (Text Only) CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOLLOWING REASSIGNMENT. Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/9/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/19/2018 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Hon. Edward J. Davila.. The Court does not issue a revised Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ejdorders. This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2018) (Entered: 05/01/2018)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/1/2018, Entered: 5/1/2018 Order Reassigning CaseCourt Filing
                        ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Edward J. Davila and Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd for all further proceedings., This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2018)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/1/2018, Entered: None Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text OnlyCourt Filing
                          CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2018) (Entered: 05/01/2018)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/1/2018, Entered: 5/1/2018 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                            CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Secure Cam, LLC.. (Ranallo, Nicholas) (Filed on 5/1/2018)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/26/2018, Entered: 4/26/2018 Order on Motion for Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                              Order granting 14 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 4/26/2018. (hrllc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2018)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/24/2018, Entered: 4/24/2018 Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 2694LUPD.) Filing fee previously paid on 4/18/18 filed by Secure Cam, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Ranallo, Nicholas) (Filed on 4/24/2018)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: 4/23/2018 Patent/Trademark Copy
                                  REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding Patent Infringement (cc: form mailed to register). (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2018)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/21/2018, Entered: 4/21/2018 Notice - other
                                    NOTICE by Secure Cam, LLC AO 120 - Report on Filing or Determination of Patent Action (Ranallo, Nicholas) (Filed on 4/21/2018)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/19/2018, Entered: 4/19/2018 Order on Motion for Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                      Order denying 7 Application to appear pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 4/19/2018. (hrllc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2018)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/19/2018, Entered: 4/19/2018 Summons issued
                                        Summons Issued as to Project Nursery, LLC. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2018)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/19/2018, Entered: None Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/18/2018, Entered: None Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
                                            Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/10/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/17/2018 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2018) (Entered: 04/19/2018)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/18/2018, Entered: None Case Assigned by IntakeCourt Filing
                                              Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/2/2018. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2018) (Entered: 04/18/2018)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/18/2018, Entered: 4/18/2018 Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                Amended MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 2694LUPD.) Filing fee previously paid on 4/18/2018 filed by Secure Cam, LLC. (Ranallo, Nicholas) (Filed on 4/18/2018)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/18/2018, Entered: 4/18/2018 Proposed Summons
                                                  Proposed Summons. (Ranallo, Nicholas) (Filed on 4/18/2018)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/18/2018, Entered: 4/18/2018 Civil Cover Sheet
                                                    Civil Cover Sheet by Secure Cam, LLC . (Ranallo, Nicholas) (Filed on 4/18/2018)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/18/2018, Entered: 4/18/2018 Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                      MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12281367.) filed by Secure Cam, LLC. (Ranallo, Nicholas) (Filed on 4/18/2018)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/18/2018, Entered: 4/18/2018 Certificate of Interested Entities
                                                        Certificate of Interested Entities by Secure Cam, LLC (Ranallo, Nicholas) (Filed on 4/18/2018)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/18/2018, Entered: 4/18/2018 Proposed Summons
                                                          Proposed Summons. (Ranallo, Nicholas) (Filed on 4/18/2018)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/18/2018, Entered: 4/18/2018 Complaint
                                                            COMPLAINT against Project Nursery, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12281324.). Filed bySecure Cam, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ranallo, Nicholas) (Filed on 4/18/2018)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                              Statistics

                                                              This case has been viewed 3 times.

                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                              Space
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                               
                                                              PlainSite
                                                              Sign Up
                                                              Need Password Help?