United States v. MH PILLARS LTD.
Criminal Case District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:18-cr-00053-KBJ-1

Tags

Reality Check: Herbalife Nutrition, Ltd.

This docket is featured in the May 29, 2018 article Reality Check: Herbalife Nutrition, Ltd..

Last Updated July 14, 2021 at 1:39 PM DT (2.2 months ago) SpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Zia Faruqui +1 202 252 7117 zia.faruqui@usdoj.gov
Space John Peter Marston +1 202 252 6886 +1 202 307 2304 john.marston@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo MH Pillars Ltd., Defendant

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

MH PILLARS LTD. (1)
Office Washington, DC
Filed 3/8/2018
County 11001
Terminated
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 3
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1960.F
Offense Level 4
181960(a); MONETARY LAUNDERING; Operation of an Unlicensed Money Transmission Business.
Defendant Custody Status
Flag CAT B
  Entries (64) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 7/14/2021, Entered: None Return of Cash Deposit
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 4/27/2021, Entered: None Notice (Other)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 11/19/2020, Entered: None Transcript
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 11/18/2020, Entered: None Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 11/18/2020, Entered: None Judgment
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 11/17/2020, Entered: None Order for Forfeiture of Property
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 11/13/2020, Entered: None Notice of Proposed Order of Forfeiture
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 11/12/2020, Entered: None Sentencing Memorandum
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 10/27/2020, Entered: None Sentencing Memorandum
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 10/13/2020, Entered: None Notice of Substitution of Counsel
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 8/17/2020, Entered: None Order
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 8/12/2020, Entered: None Notice of Proposed Order of Forfeiture
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 7/17/2020, Entered: None ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 7/17/2020, Entered: None Order for Forfeiture of Property
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 7/17/2020, Entered: None Statement of Offense
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 7/17/2020, Entered: None Plea Agreement
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 7/17/2020, Entered: None Waiver of Trial by Jury
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 7/17/2020, Entered: None Waiver of Indictment
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 7/17/2020, Entered: None Information - Felony
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 5/15/2020, Entered: None Status Report
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 3/4/2020, Entered: None Continue
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 3/3/2020, Entered: None Continue
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document 72 Filed: 11/9/2019, Entered: None Exclude
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 9/16/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Continue
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document 58 Filed: 5/13/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 57 Filed: 5/8/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 1/16/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 1/15/2019, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance by Assistant U.S. Attorney
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 1/15/2019, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/11/2018, Entered: 5/14/2018 Order
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/11/2018, Entered: 5/11/2018 Detention Memorandum Court Filing
                                                            DETENTION MEMORANDUM as to FERHAN PATEL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson on 5/11/2018. (lcdar1)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Blank  Status Conference
                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson: Status Conference as to FERHAN PATEL held on 5/11/2018. Case called for a bond hearing, but not held. Speedy Trial Excludable (XT) started 5/11/18, until 5/15/18, in the interest of justice. Bond Hearing continued to 5/15/2018 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 17.Bond Status of Defendant: Committe/Commitment Issued; Court Reporter: Lisa Moreira; Defense Attorneys: Alain J. Ifrah and James M. Trusty; US Attorney: Zia M. Faruqui. (gdf)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/8/2018, Entered: 5/8/2018 Response to motion
                                                                RESPONSE by USA as to FERHAN PATEL re [13] MOTION for Release from Custody (Attachments: # (1) Attachment A, # (2) Attachment B)(Faruqui, Zia)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/7/2018, Entered: 5/7/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                  TRANSCRIPT OF DETENTION HEARING in case as to FERHAN PATEL before Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson, held on 04/24/2018. Page Numbers: 1-45. Date of Issuance: 05/07/2018. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Sara Wick, telephone number 202-354-3284. Tape Number: N/A. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 5/28/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/7/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/5/2018.(Wick, Sara)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/3/2018, Entered: 5/7/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                    ORDER as to FERHAN PATEL, that the period from May 3, 2018 through May 11, 2018, inclusive, is excluded from the Speedy Trial calculation as a reasonable period of delay based on the absence of the codefendant, insofar as the resulting delay fulfills the ends of justice. See 18 U.S.C. 3161(h)(6). Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 5/3/18. (zgdf)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Blank  Order
                                                                      MINUTE ORDER as to FERHAN PATEL (3): The parties appeared before this Court for a status conference on May 3, 2018. Based on the parties' representations at the status conference, it is hereby ORDERED that the defendant's motion regarding pretrial release is due on or before May 4, 2018, and the government shall file its response on or before May 8, 2018. So Ordered by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 5/3/18. (gdf)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank  Order on Motion for Speedy Trial
                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson: Status Conference as to FERHAN PATEL (3) held on 5/3/2018. Oral Order denying without prejudice [12] Motion for Speedy Trial. Speedy Trial Excludable (XT) started on 5/3/18 until 5/11/18, in the interest of justice, as to FERHAN PATEL (3). Bond Hearing set for 5/11/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 17 before Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. Bond Status of Defendant(3): COMMITTED/COMMITMENT ISSUED; Court Reporter: Sara Wick Defense Attorneys: Alain J. Ifrah and James M. Trusty; US Attorney: Zia Mustafa Faruqui. (gdf)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/2/2018, Entered: 5/2/2018, Terminated: 5/3/2018 Motion for Speedy Trial
                                                                          MOTION for Speedy Trial Exclusion by USA as to FERHAN PATEL. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Faruqui, Zia)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 10 Filed: 4/24/2018, Entered: 4/24/2018 Memorandum in Support of Pretrial Detention
                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Support of Pretrial Detention by USA as to FERHAN PATEL (Attachments: # (1) Attachment A: United States v. Ndukwu)(Faruqui, Zia)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank  Status Conference
                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson:Status Conference as to MH PILLARS LTD.(1), FIROZ PATEL(2), FERHAN PATEL(3) held on 11/13/2018. Defendants MH PILLARS LTD (1)and FIROZ PATEL (2), NOT PRESENT. Mr. Danny Onorato informed the court that the parties are still working on bond conditions for DEFENDANT FIROZ PATEL (2). DEFENDANT FERHAN PATEL(3) not present and appearance waived. Speedy Trial Excludable (XT) started 11/13/18 until 1/15/19, in the interest of justice as to MH PILLARS LTD.(1), FIROZ PATEL(2), FERHAN PATEL(3). Status Conference set for 1/15/2019 at 2:30 PM in Courtroom 17 before Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. Bond Status of Defendant: 3-FERHAN PATEL, Continue on Personal Recognizance; Court Reporter: Elizabeth Saint-Loth; Defense Attorney: 2-Danny Onorato, 3-James M. Trusty; US Attorney: Zia Faruqui. (gdf)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank  order on motion for release from custody
                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson: Detention Hearing as to FERHAN PATEL held on 4/24/2018. Motion [8] for Release from Custody by FERHAN PATEL (3); denied for reasons set forth on the record. Oral Motion by the Government to Commit Defendant FERHAN PATEL (3) to Custody of Attorney General; heard and granted. Pretrial Detention Ordered. Status Conference set for 5/3/2018 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 17 before Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. Bond Status of Defendant: Defendant Committed/ Commitment Issued; Court Reporter: FTR - Gold; FTR Time Frame: Ctrm 4 [10:16:27 - 11:15:24; 11:25:43 - 11:26:39; 2:26:55 - 2:33:22]; Defense Attorney: James Trusty; US Attorney: Zia Faruqui; Pretrial Officer: Saul Atencio. (cal)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank  Status Conference
                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson:Status Conference as to MH PILLARS LTD.(1), FIROZ PATEL(2), FERHAN PATEL(3) held on 11/13/2018. Defendants MH PILLARS LTD (1)and FIROZ PATEL (2), NOT PRESENT. Mr. Danny Onorato informed the court that the parties are still working on bond conditions for DEFENDANT FIROZ PATEL (2). DEFENDANT FERHAN PATEL(3) not present and appearance waived. Speedy Trial Excludable (XT) started 11/13/18 until 1/15/19, in the interest of justice as to MH PILLARS LTD.(1), FIROZ PATEL(2), FERHAN PATEL(3). Status Conference set for 1/15/2019 at 2:30 PM in Courtroom 17 before Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. Bond Status of Defendant: 3-FERHAN PATEL, Continue on Personal Recognizance; Court Reporter: Elizabeth Saint-Loth; Defense Attorney: 2-Danny Onorato, 3-James M. Trusty; US Attorney: Zia Faruqui. (gdf)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank  Motion to Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General
                                                                                  ORAL MOTION by the Government to Commit Defendant FERHAN PATEL to Custody of Attorney General. (cal)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank  set/reset hearings
                                                                                    Set/Reset Hearings as to MH PILLARS LTD. (1), FIROZ PATEL (2): Arraignment/Status Conference set for 10/2/2018 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 17 before Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (gdf)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: 4/24/2018 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed
                                                                                      Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 4/23/2018 as to FERHAN PATEL. (cal)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Blank  Status Conference
                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson:Status Conference as to MH PILLARS LTD.(1), FERHAN PATEL(3) held on 8/21/2018. Presentation made to the court that Mr. Danny C. Onorato will be entering his appearance on behalf of MH PILLARS LTD. (1) AND FIROZ PATEL (2). Arraignment set for 10/2/18 at 9:30 AM for MH PILLARS LTD. (1) AND FIROZ PATEL (2). Oral request by Defense Counsel James Trusty to waive FERHAN PATEL(3) appearance at the next status conference, heard and granted. Speedy Trial Excludable (XT) started for FERHAN PATEL(3)from 8/21/18 until 10/2/18, in the interest of justice. Status Conference set for 10/2/2018 at 9:30 AM for all defendants in Courtroom 17 before Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. Bond Status of Defendant: 1-NOT PRESENTED; 3-APPEARANCE WAIVED/CONTINUED ON BOND; Court Reporter: Lisa Griffith; Defense Attorney: 1-Danny C. Onorato, 3-James Trusty; US Attorney: Zia Mustafa Faruqui. (gdf)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank  Order on Motion for Temporary Detention
                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson: Initial Appearance/Arraignment as to FERHAN PATEL (3): Count 1,2,4 held on 4/23/2018. Not Guilty Plea as to all counts. Oral Motion by the Government for Temporary Detention (3-Day Hold) as to FERHAN PATEL (3); heard and granted. Defense's Motion [8] revisited and deferred to Detention Hearing. Detention Hearing set for 4/24/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4 before Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson. Parties are to contact Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson's Courtroom Deputy for Status Hearing date. Bond Status of Defendant: Defendant Held without Bond/ Commitment Issued; Court Reporter: FTR - Gold; FTR Time Frame: Ctrm 4 [1:39:01 - 1:46:24]; Defense Attorney: James M. Trusty; US Attorney: Zia Faruqui; Pretrial Officer: Andre Sidbury. (cal)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank  Order on Motion to continue
                                                                                            MINUTE ORDER granting [26] Motion to Continue Arraignment as to MH PILLARS LTD. (1). Arraignment set for 8/21/2018 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 17 before Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 7/17/18. (gdf)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/16/2018, Entered: 7/16/2018, Terminated: 7/17/2018 Motion to Continue
                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION to Continue Arraignment by USA as to MH PILLARS LTD.. (Attachments: # (1) Attachment A: Letter from Counsel for Firoz Patel, # (2) Text of Proposed Order)(Faruqui, Zia)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Blank  Motion for Temporary Detention
                                                                                                ORAL MOTION by the Government for Temporary Detention (3-Day Hold) as to FERHAN PATEL. (cal)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                  Blank  arrest
                                                                                                  Arrest of FERHAN PATEL. (cal)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank  Notice of Corrected Docket Entry
                                                                                                    NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: as to MH PILLARS LTD., FIROZ PATEL, FERHAN PATEL re [23] MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release was entered in error and counsel was instructed to refile said pleading to relate to just the defendant (3). (zvt)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/3/2018, Entered: 7/3/2018, Terminated: 7/17/2018 motion to modify conditions of release
                                                                                                      ENTERED IN ERROR.....MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release by FERHAN PATEL as to MH PILLARS LTD., FIROZ PATEL, FERHAN PATEL. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Trusty, James) Modified on 7/9/2018 (zvt).
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/19/2018, Entered: 4/19/2018 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                                                        NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Rachel Hirsch appearing for FERHAN PATEL (Hirsch, Rachel)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Blank  Notice of hearing
                                                                                                          NOTICE OF HEARING as to MH PILLARS LTD. Arraignment set for 7/17/2018 at 2:30 PM in Courtroom 17 before Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (gdf)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/4/2018, Entered: 5/4/2018, Terminated: 8/16/2018 motion for release from custody
                                                                                                            MOTION for Release from Custody by FERHAN PATEL as to MH PILLARS LTD., FIROZ PATEL, FERHAN PATEL. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F, # (7) Exhibit G, # (8) Exhibit H, # (9) Exhibit I, # (10) Exhibit J, # (11) Exhibit K, # (12) Exhibit L)(Trusty, James)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/19/2018, Entered: 4/19/2018 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                                                              NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: James M. Trusty appearing for FERHAN PATEL (Trusty, James)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/19/2018, Entered: 4/19/2018, Terminated: 8/16/2018 motion for release from custody
                                                                                                                MOTION for Release from Custody by FERHAN PATEL as to MH PILLARS LTD., FIROZ PATEL, FERHAN PATEL. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E)(Trusty, James) (Attachment 1 replaced on 4/20/2018) (zvt). (Attachment 2 replaced on 4/20/2018) (zvt). (Attachment 3 replaced on 4/20/2018) (zvt). (Attachment 4 replaced on 4/20/2018) (zvt). (Attachment 5 replaced on 4/20/2018) (zvt). Modified to remove double headers on 4/20/2018 (zvt).
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/19/2018, Entered: 4/19/2018 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Alain J. Ifrah appearing for FERHAN PATEL (Ifrah, Alain)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/19/2018, Entered: 3/26/2018 Order on Motion to Unseal CaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [4] Motion by USA to Unseal Criminal Indictment and accompanying Motion to Seal as to Defendants MH PILLARS LTD (1), FIROZ PATEL (2) and FERHAN PATEL (3); unsealing the Court's instant order in this case; signed by Magistrate Judge Robin M. Meriweather on 3/19/18. (zkk)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/19/2018, Entered: 3/20/2018 Motion to Unseal Case
                                                                                                                      MOTION to Unseal Case by USA as to MH PILLARS LTD., FIROZ PATEL, FERHAN PATEL. (Attachment: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(ztl)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/8/2018, Entered: 3/9/2018 Order on Motion to Seal Case +Court Filing
                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [2] Motion to Seal the Criminal Indictment, Bench Warrants and to Delay Entry on the Public Docket of the Filing of this Motion to Seal and Related Matters as to MH PILLARS LTD. (1), FIROZ PATEL (2), FERHAN PATEL (3). Signed by Magistrate Judge Robin M. Meriweather on 03/08/2018. (zvt)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document 2 Filed: 3/8/2018, Entered: 3/9/2018 Motion to Seal Case
                                                                                                                          MOTION to Seal the Criminal Indictment, Bench Warrants and to Delay Entry on the Public Docket of the Filing of this Motion to Seal and Related Matters by USA as to MH PILLARS LTD., FIROZ PATEL, FERHAN PATEL. (Attachment: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(zvt)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document 1 Filed: 3/8/2018, Entered: 3/9/2018 Indictment (Sealed)
                                                                                                                          SEALED INDICTMENT as to MH PILLARS LTD. (1) count(s) 3, FIROZ PATEL (2) count(s) 1, 2, 4, FERHAN PATEL (3) count(s) 1, 2, 4. (FORFEITURE ALLEGATION) (zvt)
                                                                                                                            LREF

                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 1,047 times.

                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?