United States v. MARTIN
Federal Civil Lawsuit Pennsylvania Eastern District Court, Case No. 5:18-cv-01695

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated June 24, 2019 at 11:33 AM DT (1.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Beatriz T. Saiz +1 202 307 6585 +1 202 514 6866 beatriz.t.saiz@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo ELMER R. MARTIN, Defendant
No Logo GRACE Z. HURST, Defendant
No Logo STONEY CREEK ESTATES, LLC, Defendant
Citation Section 26 U.S.C. § 7403
Nature of Suit 870 - Federal Tax Suits: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
  Entries (23) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/24/2019, Entered: None Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/24/2019, Entered: None Judgment - consent
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/31/2019, Entered: None Approval
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/22/2019, Entered: None Approve Consent Judgment
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/26/2019, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/25/2019, Entered: None Order Lifting Stay
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/25/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Stay
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/23/2019, Entered: None Stay
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/3/2019, Entered: None Order Setting Answer Deadline
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/26/2018, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/25/2018, Entered: None Order
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/18/2018, Entered: None ~Util - Set Deadlines
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/10/2018, Entered: None summons returned executed
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/10/2018, Entered: None summons returned executed
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/10/2018, Entered: None summons returned executed
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/10/2018, Entered: None summons returned executed
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/27/2018, Entered: None order on motion for miscellaneous relief
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/21/2018, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/20/2018, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/25/2018, Entered: None Notice - other
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: 4/23/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                          INITIAL PROCEDURAL ORDER THAT GOVERNS THE CASE AND CONTAINS RULES OF PRACTICE THAT MUST BE FOLLOWED IN ADDITION TO THIS DISTRICT'S LOCAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSEPH F. LEESON, JR ON 4/23/18. 4/23/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (ky, )
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: 4/23/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                            COMPLAINT against GRACE Z. HURST, ELMER R. MARTIN, STONEY CREEK ESTATES, LLC (Filing fee $ 0..), filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 CASE MANAGEMENT FORMS)(jl, )
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              3 Summons Issued as to GRACE Z. HURST, ELMER R. MARTIN, STONEY CREEK ESTATES, LLC. Forwarded To: BEATRIZ SAIZ on 4/23/18 (jl, )
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                Statistics

                                                This case has been viewed 5 times.

                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                Space
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                 
                                                PlainSite
                                                Sign Up
                                                Need Password Help?