Combs v. Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Ohio Northern District Court, Case No. 1:18-cv-00802

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated May 20, 2019 at 7:57 AM DT (2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Lori Combs, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cutter Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Margot P. Cutter +1 916 290 9400 +1 916 588 9330
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Todd Alan Walburg +1 916 290 9400 +1 916 588 9330

Toggle Switch Represented by Cutter Law PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Curtis Brooks Cutter +1 916 290 9400 +1 916 588 9330 bcutter@cutterlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Penthouse One

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Craig S. Tuttle +1 614 221 2223 +1 614 221 3106 ctuttle@leesebergvalentine.com
v.
Bayer Corporation Bayer Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 05/16/2018, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 05/16/2018, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 05/16/2018, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 05/16/2018 Rodney Michael Hudson, Esq. +1 415 591 7500 +1 415 591 7510 rodney.hudson@dbr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Goldman Ismail Tomaselli Brennan & Baum - Santa Monica

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 05/16/2018, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 05/16/2018, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 05/16/2018, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 05/16/2018 Kenneth F. Baum +1 310 576 6900 +1 310 629 8107

Toggle Switch Represented by Goldman Ismail Tomaselli Brennan & Baum LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward James Dumoulin +1 312 681 6000 edumoulin@goldmanismail.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew L. Goldman +1 312 881 5960 +1 312 881 5965 agoldman@goldmanismail.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer L. Greenblatt +1 312 881 5949 +1 312 881 5191 jgreenblatt@goldmanismail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Tucker Ellis & West LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Madeline Dennis +1 216 696 5801 madeline.dennis@tuckerellis.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Q. Lewis +1 216 592 5000 +1 216 592 5009 john.lewis@tuckerellis.com
Bayer Healthcare LLC Bayer Healthcare LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 05/16/2018, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 05/16/2018, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 05/16/2018, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 05/16/2018 Rodney Michael Hudson, Esq. +1 415 591 7500 +1 415 591 7510 rodney.hudson@dbr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Goldman Ismail Tomaselli Brennan & Baum - Santa Monica

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 05/16/2018, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 05/16/2018, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 05/16/2018, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 05/16/2018 Kenneth F. Baum +1 310 576 6900 +1 310 629 8107

Toggle Switch Represented by Goldman Ismail Tomaselli Brennan & Baum LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward James Dumoulin +1 312 681 6000 edumoulin@goldmanismail.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew L. Goldman +1 312 881 5960 +1 312 881 5965 agoldman@goldmanismail.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer L. Greenblatt +1 312 881 5949 +1 312 881 5191 jgreenblatt@goldmanismail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Tucker Ellis & West LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Madeline Dennis +1 216 696 5801 madeline.dennis@tuckerellis.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Q. Lewis +1 216 592 5000 +1 216 592 5009 john.lewis@tuckerellis.com
Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc. Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 05/16/2018, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 05/16/2018, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 05/16/2018, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 05/16/2018 Rodney Michael Hudson, Esq. +1 415 591 7500 +1 415 591 7510 rodney.hudson@dbr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Goldman Ismail Tomaselli Brennan & Baum - Santa Monica

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 05/16/2018, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 05/16/2018, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 05/16/2018, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 05/16/2018 Kenneth F. Baum +1 310 576 6900 +1 310 629 8107

Toggle Switch Represented by Goldman Ismail Tomaselli Brennan & Baum LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward James Dumoulin +1 312 681 6000 edumoulin@goldmanismail.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew L. Goldman +1 312 881 5960 +1 312 881 5965 agoldman@goldmanismail.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer L. Greenblatt +1 312 881 5949 +1 312 881 5191 jgreenblatt@goldmanismail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Tucker Ellis & West LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Madeline Dennis +1 216 696 5801 madeline.dennis@tuckerellis.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Q. Lewis +1 216 592 5000 +1 216 592 5009 john.lewis@tuckerellis.com
No Logo Bayer Pharma AG, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 05/16/2018, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 05/16/2018, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 05/16/2018, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 05/16/2018 Rodney Michael Hudson, Esq. +1 415 591 7500 +1 415 591 7510 rodney.hudson@dbr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Goldman Ismail Tomaselli Brennan & Baum - Santa Monica

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 05/16/2018, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 05/16/2018, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 05/16/2018, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 05/16/2018 Kenneth F. Baum +1 310 576 6900 +1 310 629 8107

Toggle Switch Represented by Goldman Ismail Tomaselli Brennan & Baum LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward James Dumoulin +1 312 681 6000 edumoulin@goldmanismail.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew L. Goldman +1 312 881 5960 +1 312 881 5965 agoldman@goldmanismail.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer L. Greenblatt +1 312 881 5949 +1 312 881 5191 jgreenblatt@goldmanismail.com
McKesson Corporation McKesson Corporation, Defendant
McKesson Medical-Surgical, Inc. McKesson Medical-Surgical, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Merry X-Ray Chemical Corporation, Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 367 - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
  Entries (68) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 5/15/2019, Entered: None memorandum opinion and order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 1/25/2019, Entered: None Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: None Leave
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 11/19/2018, Entered: None Order
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 11/19/2018, Entered: None Amended Complaint
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 10/15/2018, Entered: None Order
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 9/7/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to continue
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 9/5/2018, Entered: 9/5/2018 Continue
                Joint Motion to continue 9/10/2018 Case Management Conference and Set Case Schedule, and Report of Rule 26(f) Compliance filed by Bayer Corporation, Bayer Healthcare LLC, Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Lewis, John)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 8/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) filed by Lori Combs. (Cutter, Curtis) (Entered: 08/28/2018)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 6/15/2018, Entered: 6/15/2018 Continue
                    Joint Motion to continue 6/28/18 Scheduling Conference filed by Bayer Corporation, Bayer Healthcare LLC, Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Lewis, John)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: 5/16/2018 Order on Motion to withdraw as attorneyCourt Filing
                      Marginal Entry Order granting defense counsel's Motion to withdraw as attorney, attorney Rodney M. Hudson removed from case. (Related Doc # 40 ). Judge Donald C. Nugent on 5/16/2018. (M, S)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: 5/16/2018 Order on Motion to withdraw as attorneyCourt Filing
                        Marginal Entry Order granting defense counsel's Motion to withdraw as attorney, attorney Kenneth F. Baum removed from case. (Related Doc # 39 ). Judge Donald C. Nugent on 5/16/2018. (M, S)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 5/11/2018, Entered: 5/11/2018 Withdraw as Attorney
                          Motion by Rodney M. Hudson to withdraw as attorney filed by Bayer Corporation, Bayer Healthcare LLC, Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Notarized Affidavit of Withdrawing Attorney Rodney M Hudson, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Withdrawal of Attorney Rodney M Hudson)(Lewis, John)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 5/11/2018, Entered: 5/11/2018 Withdraw as Attorney
                            Motion by Kenneth F. Baum to withdraw as attorney filed by Bayer Corporation, Bayer Healthcare LLC, Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Notarized Affidavit of Withdrawing Attorney Kenneth F. Baum, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Withdrawal of Attorney Kenneth F. Baum)(Lewis, John)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 5/11/2018, Entered: 5/11/2018 Case Management Conference Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                              Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference to be held on 6/28/2018 at 11:00 AM at Chambers 15A before Judge Donald C. Nugent. Judge Donald C. Nugent on 5/11/2018. (M, S)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: 4/23/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                Motion for attorney Edward Dumoulin to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-8668742, filed by Bayer Corporation, Bayer Healthcare LLC, Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Edward Dumoulin, # 2 Certificate of Good Standing) (Lewis, John)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: 4/23/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                  Motion for attorney Jennifer L. Greenblatt to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-8668730, filed by Bayer Corporation, Bayer Healthcare LLC, Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Jennifer L. Greenblatt, # 2 Certificate of Good Standing) (Lewis, John)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: 4/23/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                    Motion for attorney Andrew L. Goldman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-8668672, filed by Bayer Corporation, Bayer Healthcare LLC, Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Andrew L. Goldman, # 2 Certificate of Good Standing) (Lewis, John)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: 4/23/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                      Motion for attorney Curtis Brooks Cutter to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-8668174, filed by Plaintiff Lori Combs. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Tuttle, Craig)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        Attorney Appearance by Craig S. Tuttle filed by on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Tuttle, Craig) (Entered: 04/23/2018)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 4/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          Attorney Appearance by Madeline Dennis filed by on behalf of Bayer Corporation, Bayer Healthcare LLC, Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Dennis, Madeline) (Entered: 04/18/2018)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 4/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            Attorney Appearance by John Q. Lewis filed by on behalf of Bayer Corporation, Bayer Healthcare LLC, Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Lewis, John) (Entered: 04/18/2018)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              Magistrate Consent Form issued. (S,L) (Entered: 04/10/2018)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of California Northern. Case number 3:17-cv-06369. Electronic file, transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 04/10/2018)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER by Judge James Donato re 27 Stipulation. (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2018) [Transferred from cand on 4/10/2018.] (Entered: 04/06/2018)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation and [Proposed] Transfer Order filed by Bayer Corporation, Bayer HealthCare LLC, Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Hudson, Rodney) (Filed on 3/22/2018) [Transferred from cand on 4/10/2018.] (Entered: 03/22/2018)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Lori Combs (Walburg, Todd) (Filed on 3/22/2018) [Transferred from cand on 4/10/2018.] (Entered: 03/22/2018)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                        Transcript of Proceedings held on 3/1/18, before Judge James Donato. Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce, telephone number 510-910-5888, email: joann_bryce@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction after 90 days. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (33 in 3:17-cv-07026-JD) Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/4/2018. (jabS, COURTSTAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2018) [Transferred from cand on 4/10/2018.] (Entered: 03/06/2018)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James Donato: Initial Case Management Conference held on 3/1/2018. Total Time in Court: 13 minutes. Court Reporter: JoAnn Bryce. (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/1/2018) [Transferred from cand on 4/10/2018.] (Entered: 03/01/2018)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT & [PROPOSED] ORDER filed by Bayer Corporation, Bayer HealthCare LLC, Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals Inc., Bayer Pharma AG. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Hudson, Rodney) (Filed on 2/22/2018) [Transferred from cand on 4/10/2018.] (Entered: 02/22/2018)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lori Combs. All Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons)(Walburg, Todd) (Filed on 1/24/2018) [Transferred from cand on 4/10/2018.] (Entered: 01/24/2018)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                ORDER by Judge James Donato as to Jennifer L. Greenblatt granting (15) Motion for Pro Hac Vice in case 3:17-cv-06309-JD; granting (17) Motion for Pro Hac Vice in case 3:17-cv-06369-JD; granting (15) Motion for Pro Hac Vice in case 3:17-cv-06374-JD; granting (15) Motion for Pro Hac Vice in case 3:17-cv-06375-JD; granting (14) Motion for Pro Hac Vice in case 3:17-cv-06861-JD; granting (25) Motion for Pro Hac Vice in case 3:17-cv-07026-JD. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2018) [Transferred from cand on 4/10/2018.] (Entered: 01/23/2018)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                  ORDER by Judge James Donato as to Andrew L. Gordman. granting (16) Motion for Pro Hac Vice in case 3:17-cv-06309-JD; terminating (18) Motion for Pro Hac Vice; granting (19) Motion for Pro Hac Vice in case 3:17-cv-06369-JD; granting (16) Motion for Pro Hac Vice in case 3:17-cv-06374-JD; granting (16) Motion for Pro Hac Vice in case 3:17-cv-06375-JD; granting (15) Motion for Pro Hac Vice in case 3:17-cv-06861-JD; granting (26) Motion for Pro Hac Vice in case 3:17-cv-07026-JD. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2018) [Transferred from cand on 4/10/2018.] (Entered: 01/23/2018)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 18 ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12045849.) Filing fee previously paid on 1/22/18 filed by Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Goldman, Andrew) (Filed on 1/23/2018) [Transferred from cand on 4/10/2018.] (Entered: 01/23/2018)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12045849.) filed by Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Goldman, Andrew) (Filed on 1/22/2018) [Transferred from cand on 4/10/2018.] (Entered: 01/22/2018)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 267AOS20.) Filing fee previously paid on 1/22/18 filed by Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Greenblatt, Jennifer) (Filed on 1/22/2018) [Transferred from cand on 4/10/2018.] (Entered: 01/22/2018)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                          ORDER. As the Court advised the parties on December 18, 2017, Dkt. No. 53 in Case No. 17-4377, all deadlines and hearings have been vacated pending the case management conference set for March 1, 2018. Please do not contact our courtroom deputy, Ms. Clark, about filings or hearing dates. Please also do not file any substantive motions pending further order of the Court. Motions terminated: (14 in 3:17-cv-06273-JD) STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] SCHEDULING ORDER filed by Guerbet LLC, Liebel-Flarsheim Company LLC, (13 in 3:17-cv-06375-JD) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re (1) Complaint, Joint Stipulation to Extend Defendant Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc.'s Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint and Stipulated Request for [Proposed] Order Changing Time filed by Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc., (15 in 3:17-cv-06369-JD) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re (1) Complaint Joint Stipulation to Extend Defendant Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc.'s Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint and Stipulated Request for [Proposed] Order Changing Time filed by Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals Inc., (13 in 3:17-cv-06374-JD) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re (1) Complaint Joint Stipulation to Extend Defendant Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc.'s Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint and Stipulated Request for [Proposed] Order Changing Time filed by Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals Inc., (13 in 3:17-cv-06309-JD) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re (1) Complaint Joint Stipulation to Extend Defendant Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc.'s Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint and Stipulated Request for [Proposed] Order Changing Time filed by Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals Inc. Signed by Judge James Donato on 1/2/2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2018) [Transferred from cand on 4/10/2018.] (Entered: 01/02/2018)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 1 Complaint Joint Stipulation to Extend Defendant Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc.'s Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint and Stipulated Request for [Proposed] Order Changing Time filed by Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Hudson, Rodney) (Filed on 12/21/2017) [Transferred from cand on 4/10/2018.] (Entered: 12/21/2017)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                              ORDER. The Court vacates all pending deadlines and hearings for all the related cases. The Court sets a case management conference for 3/1/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. In addition to the usual case management topics, the parties should be prepared to discuss whether and to what extent the related cases should be consolidated for pre-trial and trial purposes. Case management statement due by 2/22/2018. Signed by Judge James Donato on 12/18/17. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2017) [Transferred from cand on 4/10/2018.] (Entered: 12/18/2017)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                Case reassigned to Judge James Donato. Judge Susan Illston no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2017) [Transferred from cand on 4/10/2018.] (Entered: 12/14/2017)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                  ORDER RELATING CASE.. Signed by Judge James Donato on 12/13/17. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2017) [Transferred from cand on 4/10/2018.] (Entered: 12/13/2017)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    CLERK'S NOTICE Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/2/2018 02:30 PM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order, # 2 Standing Order) (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2017) [Transferred from cand on 4/10/2018.] (Entered: 11/09/2017)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                      ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Susan Illston for all further proceedings. Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 11/8/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2017) [Transferred from cand on 4/10/2018.] (Entered: 11/08/2017)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                        ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 11/8/17. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2017) [Transferred from cand on 4/10/2018.] (Entered: 11/08/2017)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                          ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 11/3/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2017) [Transferred from cand on 4/10/2018.] (Entered: 11/03/2017)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                            CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (vlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2017) [Transferred from cand on 4/10/2018.] (Entered: 11/02/2017)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              Summons Issued as to Bayer Corporation, Bayer HealthCare LLC, Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals Inc., Bayer Pharma AG formerly known as Bayer Schering Pharma AG, McKesson Corporation, McKesson Medical-Surgical Inc., Merry X-Ray Chemical Corporation. (vlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2017) [Transferred from cand on 4/10/2018.] (Entered: 11/02/2017)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/24/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/31/2018 01:30 PM. (vlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2017) [Transferred from cand on 4/10/2018.] (Entered: 11/02/2017)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                  CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Lori Combs.. (Walburg, Todd) (Filed on 11/1/2017) [Transferred from cand on 4/10/2018.] (Entered: 11/01/2017)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                    Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/15/2017. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2017) [Transferred from cand on 4/10/2018.] (Entered: 11/01/2017)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      Proposed Summons. (Cutter, Curtis) (Filed on 11/1/2017) [Transferred from cand on 4/10/2018.] (Entered: 11/01/2017)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-11842614.). Filed byLori Combs. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cutter, Curtis) (Filed on 11/1/2017) [Transferred from cand on 4/10/2018.] (Entered: 11/01/2017)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          Order [non-document]granting Joint Motion to continue (Related Doc # 43 )Case Management Conference. Case management conference is re-scheduled to be held on 9/10/2018 at 9:00 AM at Chambers 15A before Judge Donald C. Nugent. Judge Donald C. Nugent on 6/15/18.(R,JM) Modified hearing date to 2018 and re-generated NEF on 6/19/2018 (D,Ky).
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            Order [non-document]granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by Curtis Brooks Cutter, Esq. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. (Related Doc # 34 ). Judge Donald C. Nugent on 4/30/18.(R,JM)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              Order [non-document]granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by Andrew L. Goldman, Esq. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. (Related Doc # 35 ). Judge Donald C. Nugent on 4/30/18.(R,JM)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                Order [non-document]granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by Jennifer L. Greenblatt, Esq. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. (Related Doc # 36 ). Judge Donald C. Nugent on 4/20/18.(R,JM)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  Order [non-document]granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by Edward Dumoulin, Esq. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. (Related Doc # 37 ). Judge Donald C. Nugent on 4/30/18.(R,JM)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    Judge Donald C. Nugent assigned to case. (S,L)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. (S,L)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                        Notice by Clerk: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.13(b), the parties are reminded of their requirement to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement. (S,L)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          Notice to Attorney C. Brooks Cutter. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. (D,JJ)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            Notice to Attorney Todd A. Walburg. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. (D,JJ)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              Notice to Attorney Margot P. Cutter. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. (D,JJ)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                Notice to Attorney Kenneth F. Baum. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. (D,JJ)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                  Notice to Attorney Andrew Goldman. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. (D,JJ)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                    Notice to Attorney Jennifer Greenblatt. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. (D,JJ)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                      Notice to Attorney Edward Dumoulin. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. (D,JJ)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                        Notice to Attorney Rodney M. Hudson. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. (D,JJ)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 4 times.

                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?