DOE v. Virgin America, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:18-cv-02420

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated June 8, 2019 at 12:38 AM DT (1.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo JANE DOE, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Andrus Anderson LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lori Erin Andrus +1 415 986 1400 +1 415 986 1474 lori@andrusanderson.com
v.
No Logo Alaska Air Group, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Stuart Dinnis, Defendant
No Logo Virgin America Inc., Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit Assault Libel & Slander
  Entries (52) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 12/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 12/3/2018. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2018)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 11/30/2018, Entered: None Declaration in Opposition
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 11/29/2018, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 11/29/2018, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 11/29/2018, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 11/15/2018, Entered: None Strike
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 11/15/2018, Entered: None Dismiss
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 11/7/2018, Entered: None Transcript Order
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 11/5/2018, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 10/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                    ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting in part and denying in part 15 Motion to Dismiss. Amended complaint due by 11/5/2018. Signed on 10/22/2018.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2018)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 10/8/2018, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 10/8/2018, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 10/3/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 10/1/2018, Entered: None Order Setting Settlement Conference
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 9/26/2018, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 9/25/2018, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 9/20/2018, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 9/20/2018, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 9/19/2018, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/19/2018, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 9/18/2018, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 9/17/2018, Entered: None Case Management Scheduling Order
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 9/17/2018, Entered: None Motion Hearing
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 9/6/2018, Entered: None Case Management Statement
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/30/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 8/30/2018, Entered: None ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/30/2018, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/30/2018, Entered: None ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/28/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/27/2018, Entered: None ADR Clerk's Notice re: Non-Compliance
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/10/2018, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/6/2018, Entered: None Stipulation And [proposed} Order
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/28/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/28/2018, Entered: None Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/21/2018, Entered: None Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/13/2018, Entered: None Affidavit of Service
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/12/2018, Entered: None Affidavit of Service
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/7/2018, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/7/2018, Entered: None Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/24/2018, Entered: None Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/23/2018, Entered: None Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/22/2018, Entered: None Stipulation And [proposed} Order
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/10/2018, Entered: None Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/10/2018, Entered: None Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/10/2018, Entered: None Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/9/2018, Entered: None Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/24/2018, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/24/2018, Entered: None Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: None Affidavit
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: None Proposed Summons
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: 4/23/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        COMPLAINT against Alaska Air Group, Inc., Stuart Dinnis, Virgin America, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12294964.). Filed byJANE DOE. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Andrus, Lori) (Filed on 4/23/2018)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 6 times.

                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                           
                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                          Need Password Help?