Wagner v. State of Indiana
Federal Civil Lawsuit Florida Middle District Court, Case No. 2:18-cv-00270

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 8, 2019 at 4:53 AM EST (2.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit Prisoner Petitions: Civil Detainee: Conditions of Confinement
  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/2/2018, Entered: None Judgment - prisoner
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    ORDER OF DISMISSAL dismissing 1 complaint without prejudice. The Clerk shall enter judgment accordingly, enclose a 2254 form with the Order, and close the file. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 5/1/2018. (RKR)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/25/2018, Entered: None Related case order and track 1 notice
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/25/2018, Entered: None Standing order pro se litigants
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/24/2018, Entered: None Proceed in forma pauperis/affidavit of indigency
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/24/2018, Entered: None Complaint
              Request RequestSpace LREF

              Statistics

              This case has been viewed 2 times.

              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
              Space
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
               
              PlainSite
              Sign Up
              Need Password Help?