Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company L L C v. 43.36 Acres of Land
Federal Civil Lawsuit Louisiana Western District Court, Case No. 2:18-cv-00564

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated May 3, 2019 at 11:41 AM DT (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1358
Nature of Suit Condemnation
  Entries (45) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 5/3/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Disbursement of Funds
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 4/30/2019, Entered: None Dismiss/Joint or Voluntary
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 6/8/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Enroll as Counsel
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 6/1/2018, Entered: None Affidavit of Service
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 5/21/2018, Entered: None Affidavit of Service
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 5/21/2018, Entered: None summons returned executed
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 5/18/2018, Entered: None Affidavit of Service
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 5/18/2018, Entered: None Affidavit of Service
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 5/18/2018, Entered: None Affidavit of Service
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 5/18/2018, Entered: None Affidavit of Service
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 5/18/2018, Entered: None Affidavit of Service
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/18/2018, Entered: None Affidavit of Service
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/18/2018, Entered: None Enroll as Counsel
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/18/2018, Entered: None Affidavit of Service
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/18/2018, Entered: None Affidavit of Service
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/18/2018, Entered: None Affidavit of Service
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/18/2018, Entered: None Affidavit of Service
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/18/2018, Entered: None Affidavit of Service
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/18/2018, Entered: None Affidavit of Service
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/18/2018, Entered: None summons returned executed
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/18/2018, Entered: None summons returned executed
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/18/2018, Entered: None summons returned executed
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/18/2018, Entered: None summons returned executed
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/18/2018, Entered: None summons returned executed
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/18/2018, Entered: None summons returned executed
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/17/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to continue
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to continue
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/17/2018, Entered: None Continue
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None Continue
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/9/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Hearing
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/7/2018, Entered: None Hearing
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/3/2018, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/26/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for TRO
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                    RULING re 3 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Co L L C, DENYING the application for temporary restraining order, without prejudice to reurge its motion after curing the above deficiencies. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 4/26/2018. (crt,FinnSld, P)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/26/2018, Entered: None Sealed Document (Sealed Pleading)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/26/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/26/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Deposit Funds
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/26/2018, Entered: None Statement of Material Facts
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/25/2018, Entered: None Sealed Document (Sealed Pleading)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/25/2018, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/25/2018, Entered: None Deposit Funds
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/25/2018, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/25/2018, Entered: None Partial Summary Judgment
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/25/2018, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/25/2018, Entered: None Complaint
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                            This case has been viewed 5 times.

                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                            Space
                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                             
                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                            Need Password Help?