United States v. Brewer
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 5:18-cv-02498

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 20, 2019 at 11:30 PM ST (2.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas Moore +1 415 436 7017 +1 415 436 7009 tom.moore@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo James Brewer, Defendant
Citation Section 26 U.S.C. § 7402
Nature of Suit 870 - Federal Tax Suits: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/20/2018, Entered: 6/20/2018 Notice of voluntary dismissal
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Notice Of Dismissal by United States of America (Moore, Thomas) (Filed on 6/20/2018)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/30/2018, Entered: 5/30/2018 Certificate/Proof of Service
    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America re 3 Order to Show Cause, Declaration of Belden B. Granada (Moore, Thomas) (Filed on 5/30/2018)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/23/2018, Entered: 5/23/2018 Order to Show CauseCourt Filing
      ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE ENFORCEMENT OF INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE SUMMONS. Show Cause Response due by 6/13/2018. Government's Reply due 7 days after. Government ordered to serve respondent with this order within 7 days. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 5/23/2018. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        Case assigned to Judge Vince Chhabria. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2018) (Entered: 04/26/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/26/2018, Entered: 4/26/2018 Unknown Document Type
          PETITION to Enforce IRS Summons . Filed byUnited States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-3, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Moore, Thomas) (Filed on 4/26/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Set Hearing re 3 Order to Show Cause: Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 6/28/2018 10:00 AM. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF

            Statistics

            This case has been viewed 4 times.

            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
            Space
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
             
            PlainSite
            Sign Up
            Need Password Help?