Banks v. Central Intelligence Agency
Federal Civil Lawsuit Ohio Northern District Court, Case No. 4:18-cv-00965

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 15, 2019 at 11:33 PM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo FREDERICK BANKS, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by #0063533

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Frederick Banks
v.
The Associated Press The Associated Press, Respondent
Officially listed as "Associated Press"
United States Central Intelligence Agency United States Central Intelligence Agency, Respondent
Officially listed as "Central Intelligence Agency"
No Logo Don Aaron, Respondent
No Logo James Shaw, Jr., Respondent
Pompeo, Michael Richard Pompeo, Michael Richard, Respondent
Officially listed as "Mike Pompeo"
No Logo Nashville Police Department, Respondent
No Logo Robert Huston, Respondent
No Logo Steve Anderson, Respondent
No Logo Tazewell County, Ill, Respondent
No Logo Todd Hudson, Respondent
No Logo United States Secret Service, Respondent
No Logo Walt Ehmer, Respondent
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 2254
Nature of Suit 530 - Prisoner: Habeas Corpus
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/18/2018, Entered: None Order dismissing case
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/27/2018, Entered: 4/27/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    Administrative Track DCM Initial Order. Chief Judge Patricia A. Gaughan. (S,SR)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/27/2018, Entered: None Proceed In Forma Pauperis
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Petitioner Frederick Banks. (S,SR) (Entered: 04/27/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/27/2018, Entered: None Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Petition under 28 USC 2242 for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a person in state custody. Filing fee not paid, IFP. Filed by Frederick Banks. (S,SR) (Entered: 04/27/2018)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Judge Donald C. Nugent assigned to case. (S,SR)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II. (S,SR)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Remark by Clerk: This case was assigned and processed without the filing of a Civil Cover Sheet, which is required by Local Rule 3.13(a). Copy of 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254), 3 Administrative Track DCM Initial Order and a blank civil cover sheet mailed to Frederick Banks #0063533 at Mahoning County Jail 110 Fifth Avenue Youngstown, OH 44503 on 4/27/2018. (S,SR)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 5 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?