J & J Sports Productions, Inc. v. Cotton
Federal Civil Lawsuit Nebraska District Court, Case No. 4:18-cv-03061

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 26, 2019 at 5:43 PM DT (2.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 47 U.S.C. § 0251
Nature of Suit Cable/Satellite TV
  Entries (21) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/26/2019, Entered: None Returned Mail
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/8/2019, Entered: None Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/8/2019, Entered: None Memorandum and Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/18/2018, Entered: None Costs Taxed
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/29/2018, Entered: None Bill of Costs
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/29/2018, Entered: None Attorney Fees
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/30/2018, Entered: None Judgment - Pro Se
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/30/2018, Entered: None Memorandum and Order
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/25/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                  ORDER - The Defendants shall respond to the Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment (Filing No. 14 ) on or before October 15, 2018. If no response is filed, the Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment shall be taken up on the materials contained in the court file without a hearing. The Clerk of Court shall send a copy of this order to the Defendants' last known address. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/23/2018, Entered: None Default Judgment
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/26/2018, Entered: None Clerk's Entry of Default
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/26/2018, Entered: None Clerks Entry of Default
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/29/2018, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/29/2018, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/11/2018, Entered: None Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/27/2018, Entered: None Attorney Letter
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/27/2018, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/27/2018, Entered: None Summons Requested
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/27/2018, Entered: None Summons Requested
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/27/2018, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/27/2018, Entered: None Complaint
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                            Statistics

                                            This case has been viewed 3 times.

                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                            Space
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                             
                                            PlainSite
                                            Sign Up
                                            Need Password Help?