Breeze v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:18-cv-02514

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 10, 2020 at 7:37 PM DT (10.4 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Ariana Venegas, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Napoli Shkolnik PLLC-New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Jennifer R. Liakos +1 310 331 8224 +1 646 843 7603 jliakos@napolilaw.com
No Logo Delvin Gallimore, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Napoli Shkolnik PLLC-New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Jennifer R. Liakos +1 310 331 8224 +1 646 843 7603 jliakos@napolilaw.com
No Logo Janice Brookins, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Napoli Shkolnik PLLC-New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Jennifer R. Liakos +1 310 331 8224 +1 646 843 7603 jliakos@napolilaw.com
No Logo Leonard Tyler, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Napoli Shkolnik PLLC-New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Jennifer R. Liakos +1 310 331 8224 +1 646 843 7603 jliakos@napolilaw.com
No Logo Michael Shanklin, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Napoli Shkolnik PLLC-New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Jennifer R. Liakos +1 310 331 8224 +1 646 843 7603 jliakos@napolilaw.com
No Logo Nicholas Breeze, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Napoli Shkolnik PLLC-New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Jennifer R. Liakos +1 310 331 8224 +1 646 843 7603 jliakos@napolilaw.com
No Logo Sharon Norman, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Napoli Shkolnik PLLC-New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Jennifer R. Liakos +1 310 331 8224 +1 646 843 7603 jliakos@napolilaw.com
No Logo Tracey Victoria McCraclin, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Napoli Shkolnik PLLC-New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Jennifer R. Liakos +1 310 331 8224 +1 646 843 7603 jliakos@napolilaw.com
No Logo Tracy C. Hayden, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Napoli Shkolnik PLLC-New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Jennifer R. Liakos +1 310 331 8224 +1 646 843 7603 jliakos@napolilaw.com
v.
Bristol-Myers Squibb Company Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Arnold & Porter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Sharon D. Mayo +1 415 471 3100 +1 415 471 3400 sharon.mayo@arnoldporter.com
McKesson Corporation McKesson Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Otsuka America Pharmaceutical, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Benesch Friedlander Coplan & Arnoff - Chicago

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Krista M. Enns +1 415 569 7924 +1 216 363 4588 kenns@beneschlaw.com
No Logo Otsuka Pharmaceutical Company, Ltd., Defendant
Officially listed as "Otsuka Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd."
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1441
Nature of Suit 367 - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/10/2020, Entered: None Order Transferring Case - - Out of District
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/24/2020, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/23/2020, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/28/2020, Entered: None Amended Notice of Removal
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/10/2018, Entered: 5/10/2018 Order Transferring Case - - Out of District
          MDL ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the Northern District of Florida re MDL No. 2734. ***3:18-cv-01327*** (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2018) Modified on 5/15/2018 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/10/2018, Entered: 5/10/2018 Remand*Court Filing
            MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Nicholas Breeze. Motion Hearing set for 6/22/2018 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Responses due by 5/24/2018. Replies due by 5/31/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Liakos, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/10/2018)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/10/2018, Entered: 5/10/2018 Order
              ***ERRONEOUS ENTRY. PLEASE DISREGARD. ***CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-86) by MDL Panel on 05/10/2018. (rcsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2018) Modified on 5/10/2018 (rcsS, COURT STAFF).
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/4/2018, Entered: 5/4/2018 Unknown Document Type
                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company (Mayo, Sharon) (Filed on 5/4/2018)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/3/2018, Entered: 5/3/2018 Unknown Document Type
                  Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/3/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/10/2018 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2018)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/1/2018, Entered: 5/1/2018 Unknown Document Type
                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Otsuka America Pharmaceutical, Inc. re 5 Certificate of Counsel (Enns, Krista) (Filed on 5/1/2018)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/1/2018, Entered: 5/1/2018 Unknown Document Type
                      CERTIFICATE of Counsel re 1 Notice of Removal, by Sharon D. Mayo on behalf of Bristol-Myers Squibb Company (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Mayo, Sharon) (Filed on 5/1/2018)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/30/2018, Entered: 4/30/2018 Unknown Document Type
                        Certificate of Interested Entities by Otsuka America Pharmaceutical, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Otsuka America, Inc. for Otsuka America Pharmaceutical, Inc.. Certification of Interested Entities or Persons Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 and Civ. L.R. 3-15 (Enns, Krista) (Filed on 4/30/2018) Modified on 5/3/2018 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                          Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/11/2018. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2018) (Entered: 04/27/2018)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/27/2018, Entered: 4/27/2018 Unknown Document Type
                            Certificate of Interested Entities by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company re 1 Notice of Removal, (Mayo, Sharon) (Filed on 4/27/2018)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/27/2018, Entered: 4/27/2018 Unknown Document Type
                              NOTICE OF REMOVAL of Action; Demand for Jury Trial from San Francisco County Superior Court. Their case number is CGC-18-566068. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number 0971-12308117). Filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Mayo, Sharon) (Filed on 4/27/2018) Modified on 5/3/2018 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 10 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?