J & J Sports Productions, Inc. v. Rodriguez
Federal Civil Lawsuit Nebraska District Court, Case No. 8:18-cv-00191

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 7, 2019 at 2:14 AM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 47 U.S.C. § 0251
Nature of Suit Cable/Satellite TV
  Entries (19) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/4/2019, Entered: None Memorandum and Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 2/4/2019, Entered: None Memorandum and Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/18/2018, Entered: None Costs Taxed
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/11/2018, Entered: None Amend
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: None Bill of Costs
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: None Attorney Fees
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/13/2018, Entered: None Judgment - Pro Se
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - J&J Sports Production, Inc.'s motion for default judgment (filing 16 ) is granted. Default judgment is entered in favor of plaintiff J&J Sports Production, Inc., and against defendants Victor Rodriguez and Victor's M exican Restaurant jointly and severally. Plaintiff J&J Sports Production, Inc., shall recover from defendants Victor Rodriguez and Victor's Mexican Restaurant, jointly and severally, the sum of $3,000.00, with post-judgment interest thereon at the rate provided by 28 U.S.C. ยง 1961. The Clerk is directed to award costs in this matter. A separate judgment will be entered. Ordered by Chief Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copies mailed to defendants) (LKO)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                  ORDER - that the plaintiff is given until Wednesday, September 12, 2018, to show cause why the plaintiff's claims should not be dismissed for want of prosecution, in the absence of which the plaintiff's claims against the defendants may be dismissed, and a judgment of dismissal may be entered without further notice. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Copies mailed to defendants)(CS)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/2/2018, Entered: None Clerks Entry of Default
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/6/2018, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/27/2018, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/11/2018, Entered: None Admission Pro Hac Vice
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/27/2018, Entered: None Summons Issued
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/27/2018, Entered: None Attorney Letter
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/27/2018, Entered: None Summons Requested
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/27/2018, Entered: None Summons Requested
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/27/2018, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/27/2018, Entered: None Complaint
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                        Statistics

                                        This case has been viewed 19 times.

                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                        Space
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                         
                                        PlainSite
                                        Sign Up
                                        Need Password Help?