Hopland Band of Pomo Indians v. McKesson Corporation
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:18-cv-02528

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 2, 2019 at 8:20 AM ST (2.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Hopland Band of Pomo Indians, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by CEIBA LEGAL, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Little Fawn Boland +1 415 684 7273 litlefawn@ceibalegal.com
v.
No Logo ACTAVIS LLC, Defendant
No Logo Actavis Pharma, Inc., Defendant
Allergan PLC Allergan PLC, Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Corporation AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Defendant
Cardinal Health, Inc. Cardinal Health, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Cephalon, Inc., Defendant
Unknown Role, Acusphere, Inc.
No Logo CVS HEALTH CORPORATION, Defendant
No Logo Endo Health Solutions Inc., Defendant
No Logo Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Johnson & Johnson, Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC Mallinckrodt PLC, Defendant
McKesson Corporation McKesson Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Covington

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Neema Trivedi Sahni +1 424 332 4800 +1 424 332 4782 nsahni@cov.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Nathan E. Shafroth +1 415 591 7053 nshafroth@cov.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Clara J. Shin +1 415 591 6000 +1 415 591 6091 cshin@cov.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Rebecca Grace Van Tassell +1 424 332 4768 +1 424 332 4749 rvantassell@cov.com
Ortho-mcneil-janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Ortho-mcneil-janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Defendant
PURDUE PHARMA, INC. PURDUE PHARMA, INC., Defendant
Purdue Pharma LP Purdue Pharma LP, Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd. Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Defendant
No Logo THE PURDUE FREDERICK COMPANY, INC., Defendant
Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Defendant
Unknown Role, Green Dot Corp
No Logo Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Watson Laboratories, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Defendant
Unknown Role, Andrx Corp
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1442
Nature of Suit 367 - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
  Entries (33) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/2/2018, Entered: None Order Transferring Case - - Out of District
MDL TRANSFER ORDER, TRANSFERRING CASE TO THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF OHIO. IN RE: NATIONAL PRESCRIPTION OPIATE LITIGATION, MDL. No. 2804. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2018) (Entered: 08/02/2018)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/16/2018, Entered: None Order Staying CaseCourt Filing
    ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO STAY. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 7/16/2018. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2018) (Entered: 07/16/2018)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      CLERK'S NOTICE vacating the hearing re Plaintiffs' Motions to Remand and Defendants' Motions to Stay Proceedings scheduled for 7/12/2018. The Court will issue a written ruling. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2018) (Entered: 07/09/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        CLERK'S NOTICE RESCHEDULING THE HEARING RE 9 MOTION to Remand, 12 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation. Motion Hearing set for 7/12/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor before Judge Vince Chhabria. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2018) (Entered: 06/20/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/19/2018, Entered: 6/19/2018 Reply to Opposition/Response
          REPLY (re 12 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation ) filed byMcKesson Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Nathan Shafroth, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4)(Shafroth, Nathan) (Filed on 6/19/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/15/2018, Entered: 6/15/2018 Reply to Opposition/Response
            REPLY (re 9 MOTION to Remand ) filed byHopland Band of Pomo Indians. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Little Fawn Boland, # 2 Exhibit 1. Settlement Agreement and Release, # 3 Exhibit 2. Order Regarding State Court Coordination)(Boland, Little Fawn) (Filed on 6/15/2018)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/12/2018, Entered: 6/12/2018 Re-notice motion
              Renotice motion hearing re 12 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation filed byMcKesson Corporation. (Related document(s) 12 ) (Shafroth, Nathan) (Filed on 6/12/2018)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/11/2018, Entered: 6/11/2018 Opposition/Response to Motion
                OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 12 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation ) filed by Hopland Band of Pomo Indians. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Little Fawn Boland, # 2 Exhibit 1. MDL 2804 Order, 12-14-2017, # 3 Exhibit 2. MDL 2804 Order, 2-16-2018, # 4 Exhibit 3. MDL 2804 Order, 5-17-2018)(Boland, Little Fawn) (Filed on 6/11/2018)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/9/2018, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/8/2018, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                    OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 9 MOTION to Remand ) filed byMcKesson Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Lori White, # 2 Declaration of Rebecca Van Tassell, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3)(Shafroth, Nathan) (Filed on 6/8/2018) (Entered: 06/08/2018)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/5/2018, Entered: 6/5/2018 Re-notice motion
                      Renotice motion hearing re 9 MOTION to Remand filed byHopland Band of Pomo Indians. (Related document(s) 9 ) (Boland, Little Fawn) (Filed on 6/5/2018)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                        REASSIGNED CASE - NOTICE OF NEW HEARING DATE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Vince Chhabria upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Chhabria's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. All pending motions will be taken off-calendar and must be re-noticed by the moving party for a new hearing according to Judge Chhabria's available dates, which are listed on his webpage under the section "Scheduling Notes." The new hearing date must be at least five weeks from the date the motion was filed and at least three weeks from the date the re-notice is filed. The due date for any opposition or reply papers not yet filed shall be calculated in accordance with Civil Local Rule 7-3. Case Management Statement due by 7/24/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/31/2018 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2018) (Entered: 06/05/2018)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/31/2018, Entered: 5/31/2018 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                          Case reassigned to Judge Vince Chhabria. Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2018)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/31/2018, Entered: 5/31/2018 Order Relating CaseCourt Filing
                            ORDER RELATING CASES. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 5/31/2018. (knmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2018)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/31/2018, Entered: 5/31/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                              ORDER, Case reassigned to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Judge Susan Illston no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 5/31/18. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2018)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/30/2018, Entered: 5/30/2018 Order of recusalCourt Filing
                                ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 5/30/18. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2018)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/30/2018, Entered: None Stay
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/29/2018, Entered: None StayCourt Filing
                                    MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation filed by McKesson Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 7/13/2018 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 01, 17th Floor before Judge Susan Illston. Responses due by 6/12/2018. Replies due by 6/19/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Nathan E. Shafroth, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Proposed Order)(Shafroth, Nathan) (Filed on 5/29/2018) (Entered: 05/29/2018)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/29/2018, Entered: 5/29/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                      ORDER, Case reassigned to Judge Susan Illston. Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Judge (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2018)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/25/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                        CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2018) (Entered: 05/25/2018)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/25/2018, Entered: 5/25/2018 Remand*Court Filing
                                          MOTION to Remand filed by Hopland Band of Pomo Indians. Motion Hearing set for 7/12/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. Responses due by 6/8/2018. Replies due by 6/15/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1. Press Release, # 2 Exhibit 2. PPV Contract, # 3 Exhibit 3. 12/14/2017 MDL Order, # 4 Proposed Order)(Boland, Little Fawn) (Filed on 5/25/2018)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/25/2018, Entered: 5/25/2018 Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures
                                            Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hopland Band of Pomo Indians (Boland, Little Fawn) (Filed on 5/25/2018)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/14/2018, Entered: 5/14/2018 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                              CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by McKesson Corporation.. (Shafroth, Nathan) (Filed on 5/14/2018)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/4/2018, Entered: 5/4/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT filed by McKesson Corporation. (Shafroth, Nathan) (Filed on 5/4/2018)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/2/2018, Entered: 5/2/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by McKesson Corporation re 1 Notice of Removal, (Attachments: # 1 Notice to Plaintiff of Removal and Proof of Service)(Shin, Clara) (Filed on 5/2/2018)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/30/2018, Entered: None Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/19/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/26/2018 10:00 AM. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2018) (Entered: 04/30/2018)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                        Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/14/2018. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2018) (Entered: 04/30/2018)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/27/2018, Entered: 4/27/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                          Certificate of Interested Entities by McKesson Corporation re 1 Notice of Removal, (Shin, Clara) (Filed on 4/27/2018)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/27/2018, Entered: 4/27/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                            NOTICE OF REMOVAL of Case from San Francisco Superior. Their case number is CGC-18-564491. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-12310640). Filed byMcKesson Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Docket, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Shin, Clara) (Filed on 4/27/2018)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              Case electronically transferred to the Northern District of Ohio as case number 1:18-op-45913. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2018) Modified on 8/8/2018 (fabS, COURT STAFF).
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              Reset Deadlines as to 12 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation. Motion Hearing set for 7/5/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor before Judge Vince Chhabria. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2018)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                Reset Deadlines as to 9 MOTION to Remand . Motion Hearing set for 7/5/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor before Judge Vince Chhabria. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2018)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                  Statistics

                                                                  This case has been viewed 4 times.

                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                  Space
                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                   
                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                  Need Password Help?