J&J Sports Productions, Inc. v. Theta Beta Sigma Chapter of Phi Beta Sigma Fraternity, Incorporated
Federal Civil Lawsuit Louisiana Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:18-cv-04406

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 25, 2019 at 3:14 PM DT (1.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 47 U.S.C. § 0605
Nature of Suit Cable/Satellite TV
  Entries (49) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 9/25/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss Case
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 9/23/2019, Entered: None Dismiss Case
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 6/24/2019, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 6/21/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 5/10/2019, Entered: None Protective Order
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 5/10/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Protective Order
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 5/9/2019, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 5/6/2019, Entered: None Protective Order
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 4/29/2019, Entered: None Witness and Exhibit List
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 3/6/2019, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 3/6/2019, Entered: None Status Conference
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 2/20/2019, Entered: None Set Hearings
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 2/14/2019, Entered: None Continue
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 2/12/2019, Entered: None Witness and Exhibit List
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 1/31/2019, Entered: None Status Conference
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/17/2019, Entered: None Status Conference
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: None Answer to Third-Party Complaint
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 12/4/2018, Entered: None Set Hearings
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: None summons returned executed
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 11/1/2018, Entered: None Summons issued
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 11/1/2018, Entered: None Third-Party Complaint
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/1/2018, Entered: None order on motion for leave to file
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/26/2018, Entered: None Third-Party Complaint
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/18/2018, Entered: None Status Conference
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/18/2018, Entered: None Third-Party Complaint
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/12/2018, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/30/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/3/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/31/2018, Entered: None Answer
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/18/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss/Failure to State a ClaimCourt Filing
                                                            ORDER & REASONS that the Defendant's 7 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim is DENIED. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 7/18/18. (dno)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/18/2018, Entered: None Answer
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/5/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for More Definite StatementCourt Filing
                                                                ORDER & REASONS that 8 Dimitri Ashmore, William Harris, Theta Beta Sigma Chapter of Phi Beta Sigma Fraternity, Incorporated, Theta Beta Sigma Programs and Housing Foundation's Motion for More Definite Statement is DENIED. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 7/5/18. (dno)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/25/2018, Entered: None summons returned executed
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/25/2018, Entered: None summons returned executed
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/25/2018, Entered: None summons returned executed
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/25/2018, Entered: None summons returned executed
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/25/2018, Entered: None summons returned executed
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/25/2018, Entered: None summons returned executed
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/25/2018, Entered: None Summons Returned Unexecuted
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/11/2018, Entered: None Response to motion
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/11/2018, Entered: None Response to motion
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/31/2018, Entered: None More Definite Statement
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/31/2018, Entered: None Dismiss/Failure to State a Claim/FRCP12(b)(6)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/23/2018, Entered: None Answer
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/23/2018, Entered: None Answer
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/2/2018, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/28/2018, Entered: None Statement of Corporate Disclosure
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/28/2018, Entered: None Complaint
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/18/2018, Entered: None Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 4 times.

                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                     
                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                    Need Password Help?