J&J Sports Productions, Inc. v. Out In The Cold, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Louisiana Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:18-cv-04407

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated May 22, 2019 at 1:43 PM DT (2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 47 U.S.C. § 0605
Nature of Suit Cable/Satellite TV
  Entries (29) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/22/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/21/2019, Entered: None Dismiss
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 2/22/2019, Entered: None Settlement Conference
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 2/21/2019, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/19/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 2/12/2019, Entered: None Response/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/22/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Enroll as Counsel of Record
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/22/2019, Entered: None Set Hearings
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/18/2019, Entered: None Enroll as Counsel of Record
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/17/2019, Entered: None Enroll as Counsel of Record
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/17/2019, Entered: None Witness and Exhibit List
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/13/2019, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/8/2019, Entered: None Witness and Exhibit List
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/19/2018, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/27/2018, Entered: None summons returned executed
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/27/2018, Entered: None Summons Returned Unexecuted
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/27/2018, Entered: None Summons Returned Unexecuted
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/18/2018, Entered: None Order
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/12/2018, Entered: None Order
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/30/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Deadlines
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/28/2018, Entered: None Extension of Deadlines
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/24/2018, Entered: None Answer
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/23/2018, Entered: None Answer
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/13/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to dismiss partyCourt Filing
                                                ORDER AND REASONS denying 5 Motion to Dismiss Party. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 7/11/2018. (clc)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/25/2018, Entered: None Response/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/20/2018, Entered: None Dismiss Party
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/30/2018, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/28/2018, Entered: None Statement of Corporate Disclosure
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/28/2018, Entered: None Complaint
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                            Statistics

                                                            This case has been viewed 2 times.

                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                            Space
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                             
                                                            PlainSite
                                                            Sign Up
                                                            Need Password Help?