USA v. HADDOW
Criminal Case District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:87-cr-00165-NHJ

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.

Reality Check: Herbalife Nutrition, Ltd.

This docket is featured in the May 29, 2018 article Reality Check: Herbalife Nutrition, Ltd..

Last Updated April 30, 2018 at 5:55 PM DT (3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo C. MCCLAIN HADDOW, Defendant

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

C. MCCLAIN HADDOW (1)
Office Washington, DC
Filed 4/17/1987
County 11001
Terminated 9/15/1987
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flag DEC10
  Entries (5) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 3 Filed: 11/5/1999, Entered: 11/12/1999 Probation Request for Course of ActionCourt Filing
PROBATION MEMORANDUM (Request for Disclosure of Presentence Report) filed as to C. MCCLAIN HADDOW; signed by Chief Judge Norma H. Johnson. Probation Office to disclose presentence report to the Commonwealth of Virginia; Attachment. (erd)
    LREF
    Blank  Motion Hearing
    ALL DOCKET ENTRIES PRIOR TO OCTOBER, 1991 WILL BE FOUND ON MICROFICHE. (erd)
      LREF
      Blank  Motion Hearing
      ALL DOCKET ENTRIES PRIOR TO OCTOBER, 1991 WILL BE FOUND ON MICROFICHE. (erd)
        LREF
        Blank 2 Filed: 1/16/1998, Entered: 5/28/1998 OrderCourt Filing
        ORDER by Chief Judge Norma H. Johnson as to C. MCCLAIN HADDOW : That upon the presentation of a duly sworn and signed statement by defendant requesting that a copy of his Presentence Report dated 9/8/87, prepared by United States Probation Officer Ralph Ardito, Jr. for the Honorable gerhard A. Gesell, be immediately transmitted to the offices of the Honorable George Allen, Governor of the Commonwealth of Virginia. That the presentence report not be released to defendant. (N) (erd)
          LREF
          Blank 1 Filed: 1/16/1998, Entered: 5/28/1998 letterCourt Filing
          LETTER filed by C. MCCLAIN HADDOW as to C. MCCLAIN HADDOW. Regarding Removal of Political Disabilities application. "Let this be filed by Chief Judge Norma H. Johnson" (erd)
            LREF

            Statistics

            This case has been viewed 129 times.

            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
            Space
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
             
            PlainSite
            Sign Up
            Need Password Help?