BAZ v. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:18-cv-01013

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 11, 2019 at 7:24 PM DT (1.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo KHUSHNOOD ALI BAZ, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Holwell Shuster & Goldberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Laura Shriver Aronsson +1 646 837 5151 +1 646 837 5150 laronsson@hsgllp.com
Space Paul Anthony Kemnitzer +1 646 837 5151 +1 646 837 5150
Space David Saverio Sanson +1 646 837 5151 +1 646 837 5150 dsanson@hsgllp.com
Space Andrei Vrabie +1 646 837 8381 avrabie@hsgllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by muslimadvocates.org Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sirine Shebaya +1 202 897 1894 sirine@muslimadvocates.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Johnathan James Smith +1 415 692 1484 +1 415 765 1774 johnathan@muslimadvocates.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 600

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE Javed Inam Ellahie +1 408 579 1280 +1 408 886 9468 Javed@ellahie.com
v.
No Logo CHARLES H. KABLE, IV, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Damon William Taaffe +1 202 252 2544 damon.taaffe@usdoj.gov
No Logo CHRISTOPHER WRAY, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Damon William Taaffe +1 202 252 2544 damon.taaffe@usdoj.gov
No Logo DAVID P. PEKOSKE, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Damon William Taaffe +1 202 252 2544 damon.taaffe@usdoj.gov
United States Department of Homeland Security United States Department of Homeland Security, Defendant
Officially listed as "DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Damon William Taaffe +1 202 252 2544 damon.taaffe@usdoj.gov
United States Department of State United States Department of State, Defendant
Officially listed as "DEPARTMENT OF STATE"
Federal Bureau of Investigation Federal Bureau of Investigation, Defendant
Officially listed as "FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATIONS"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Damon William Taaffe +1 202 252 2544 damon.taaffe@usdoj.gov
No Logo JEFFERSON B. SESSIONS, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Damon William Taaffe +1 202 252 2544 damon.taaffe@usdoj.gov
No Logo KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Damon William Taaffe +1 202 252 2544 damon.taaffe@usdoj.gov
Pompeo, Michael Richard Pompeo, Michael Richard, Defendant
Officially listed as "MICHAEL R. POMPEO"
No Logo TERRORIST SCREENING CENTER, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Damon William Taaffe +1 202 252 2544 damon.taaffe@usdoj.gov
No Logo TRANSPORTATION SECURITY ADMINISTRATION, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Damon William Taaffe +1 202 252 2544 damon.taaffe@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (40) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/11/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 10/11/2019, Entered: None Memorandum & Opinion
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 9/11/2019, Entered: None Transcript
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/11/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 2/1/2019, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 2/1/2019, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/1/2018, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/18/2018, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 9/27/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/20/2018, Entered: None Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/4/2018, Entered: 9/4/2018 Unknown Document Type
                        RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 8/23/2018 (Vrabie, Andrei)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/4/2018, Entered: 9/4/2018 Unknown Document Type
                          RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. MICHAEL R. POMPEO served on 8/23/2018 (Vrabie, Andrei)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/21/2018, Entered: 8/21/2018 Electronic Summons Issued
                            SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF STATE, MICHAEL R. POMPEO. (jf)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/20/2018, Entered: 8/20/2018 Request for Summons to Issue
                              REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE TO DEPARTMENT OF STATE AND TO MICHAEL R. POMPEO, in his official capacity as Secretary of State re 21 Amended Complaint, filed by KHUSHNOOD ALI BAZ. Related document: 21 Amended Complaint, filed by KHUSHNOOD ALI BAZ.(Vrabie, Andrei)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/20/2018, Entered: 8/20/2018 Amended Complaint
                                AMENDED COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATIONS, CHARLES H. KABLE, IV, KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN, DAVID P. PEKOSKE, JEFFERSON B. SESSIONS, TERRORIST SCREENING CENTER, TRANSPORTATION SECURITY ADMINISTRATION, CHRISTOPHER WRAY, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, MICHAEL R. POMPEO with Jury Demand filed by KHUSHNOOD ALI BAZ.(Vrabie, Andrei)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/20/2018, Entered: 8/20/2018 Notice of change of address
                                  NOTICE of Change of Address by Sirine Shebaya (Shebaya, Sirine)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/20/2018, Entered: 8/20/2018 Notice of change of address
                                    NOTICE of Change of Address by Johnathan James Smith (Smith, Johnathan)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/11/2018, Entered: 7/11/2018 Notice of change of address
                                      NOTICE of Change of Address by Paul Anthony Kemnitzer (Kemnitzer, Paul)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/10/2018, Entered: 7/10/2018 Notice of change of address
                                        NOTICE of Change of Address by Laura Shriver Aronsson ( Aronsson, Laura)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/10/2018, Entered: 7/10/2018 Notice of change of address
                                          NOTICE of Change of Address by David Saverio Sanson (Sanson, David)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/10/2018, Entered: 7/10/2018 Notice of change of address
                                            NOTICE of Change of Address by Andrei Vrabie (Vrabie, Andrei)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/25/2018, Entered: 6/25/2018 stipulation
                                              STIPULATION and Proposed Order by KHUSHNOOD ALI BAZ. (Vrabie, Andrei)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/22/2018, Entered: 5/22/2018 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
                                                RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 5/11/2018; KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN served on 5/11/2018; DAVID P. PEKOSKE served on 5/11/2018; TRANSPORTATION SECURITY ADMINISTRATION served on 5/11/2018 (Vrabie, Andrei) .
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/18/2018, Entered: 5/18/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Damon William Taaffe on behalf of All Defendants (Taaffe, Damon)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/17/2018, Entered: 5/17/2018 Summons Returned Executed as to DC Government Defendant
                                                    RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATIONS served on 5/10/2018; CHARLES H. KABLE, IV served on 5/10/2018; JEFFERSON B. SESSIONS served on 5/10/2018; TERRORIST SCREENING CENTER served on 5/10/2018; CHRISTOPHER WRAY served on 5/10/2018, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 05/10/2018., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/10/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/9/2018.) (Vrabie, Andrei)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/7/2018, Entered: 5/7/2018 Appear - Pro Hac Vice
                                                      MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Javed Ellahie, :Firm- The Ellahie Law Firm, :Address- Javed@ellahie.com. Phone No. - (408) 579-1280. Fax No. - (408) 886-9468 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5467277. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by KHUSHNOOD ALI BAZ (Shebaya, Sirine)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/7/2018, Entered: 5/7/2018 Appear - Pro Hac Vice
                                                        MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- David Saverio Sanson, :Firm- Holwell Shuster & Goldberg, LLP, :Address- 750 Seventh Avenue, 26th Floor, New York, NY 10019. Phone No. - (646) 837-8407. Fax No. - (646) 837-5150 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5466981. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by KHUSHNOOD ALI BAZ (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of good standing)(Shebaya, Sirine)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/7/2018, Entered: 5/7/2018 Appear - Pro Hac Vice
                                                          MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Paul Anthony Kemnitzer, :Firm- Holwell Shuster & Goldberg, LLP, :Address- 750 Seventh Ave, 26th Floor, New York, NY 20019. Phone No. - (646) 837-8404. Fax No. - (646) 837-5150 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5466976. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by KHUSHNOOD ALI BAZ (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of good standing)(Shebaya, Sirine)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/7/2018, Entered: 5/7/2018 Appear - Pro Hac Vice
                                                            MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Laura Shriver Aronsson, :Firm- Holwell Shuster & Goldberg, LLP, :Address- 750 Seventh Avenue, 26th Floor, New York, NY 10019. Phone No. - (646) 837-8552. Fax No. - (646) 837-5150 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5466965. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by KHUSHNOOD ALI BAZ (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of good standing)(Shebaya, Sirine)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/7/2018, Entered: 5/7/2018 Appear - Pro Hac Vice
                                                              MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Andrei Vrabie, :Firm- Holwell Shuster & Goldberg, LLP, :Address- 750 Seventh Ave, 26th floor, New York NY 10019. Phone No. - (646) 837-8483. Fax No. - (646) 837-5150 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5466941. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by KHUSHNOOD ALI BAZ (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of good standing)(Shebaya, Sirine)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/7/2018, Entered: 5/7/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Sirine Shebaya on behalf of KHUSHNOOD ALI BAZ (Shebaya, Sirine)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/2/2018, Entered: 5/2/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                  STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 05/02/18. (Attachment: # 1 Exhibit 1) (mac)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/1/2018, Entered: 5/1/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                    SUMMONS (11) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATIONS, CHARLES H. KABLE, IV, KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN, DAVID P. PEKOSKE, JEFFERSON B. SESSIONS, TERRORIST SCREENING CENTER, TRANSPORTATION SECURITY ADMINISTRATION, CHRISTOPHER WRAY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsth)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/1/2018, Entered: 5/1/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Johnathan James Smith on behalf of KHUSHNOOD ALI BAZ (Smith, Johnathan)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/1/2018, Entered: 5/1/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                                        COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5451381) filed by KHUSHNOOD ALI BAZ. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(Shebaya, Sirine)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Complaint due by 8/20/2018. Defendant Reply due by 9/19/2018. (mac)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          MINUTE ORDER. In view of 14 the parties' stipulation and proposed order, plaintiffs shall file an amended complaint by no later than August 20, 2018 and defendants shall reply by no later than September 19, 2018. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 7/20/2018. (lcegs1)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            MINUTE ORDER granting 6, 7, 8, 9, 10 motions to appear pro hac vice. Andrei Vrabie, Laura Shriver Aronsson, Paul Anthony Kemnitzer, David Saverio Sanson, and Javed Ellahie are hereby admitted pro hac vice in this action. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 5/9/2018. (lcegs3)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (zsth)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                This case has been viewed 5 times.

                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                Space
                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                 
                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                Need Password Help?