Rollo v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:18-cv-02577

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 9, 2019 at 1:03 AM ST (2.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Alexander Pham, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Aylstock, Witkin, Breis & Overholtz, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Sin-Ting Mary Liu +1 949 342 4555 +1 760 304 8933 mliu@awkolaw.com
No Logo Ann Schultz, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Aylstock, Witkin, Breis & Overholtz, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Sin-Ting Mary Liu +1 949 342 4555 +1 760 304 8933 mliu@awkolaw.com
No Logo Christopher Macy, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Aylstock, Witkin, Breis & Overholtz, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Sin-Ting Mary Liu +1 949 342 4555 +1 760 304 8933 mliu@awkolaw.com
No Logo Craig Crenshaw, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Aylstock, Witkin, Breis & Overholtz, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Sin-Ting Mary Liu +1 949 342 4555 +1 760 304 8933 mliu@awkolaw.com
No Logo Darren Gilliam, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Aylstock, Witkin, Breis & Overholtz, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Sin-Ting Mary Liu +1 949 342 4555 +1 760 304 8933 mliu@awkolaw.com
No Logo Grace Mucherian, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Aylstock, Witkin, Breis & Overholtz, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Sin-Ting Mary Liu +1 949 342 4555 +1 760 304 8933 mliu@awkolaw.com
No Logo Juliette Patterson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Aylstock, Witkin, Breis & Overholtz, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Sin-Ting Mary Liu +1 949 342 4555 +1 760 304 8933 mliu@awkolaw.com
No Logo Justin Friedman, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Aylstock, Witkin, Breis & Overholtz, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Sin-Ting Mary Liu +1 949 342 4555 +1 760 304 8933 mliu@awkolaw.com
No Logo Patrick Gaskill, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Aylstock, Witkin, Breis & Overholtz, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Sin-Ting Mary Liu +1 949 342 4555 +1 760 304 8933 mliu@awkolaw.com
No Logo Richard Rollo, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Aylstock, Witkin, Breis & Overholtz, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Sin-Ting Mary Liu +1 949 342 4555 +1 760 304 8933 mliu@awkolaw.com
No Logo Tyrone Kineard, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Aylstock, Witkin, Breis & Overholtz, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Sin-Ting Mary Liu +1 949 342 4555 +1 760 304 8933 mliu@awkolaw.com
No Logo Venita Ward, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Aylstock, Witkin, Breis & Overholtz, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Sin-Ting Mary Liu +1 949 342 4555 +1 760 304 8933 mliu@awkolaw.com
v.
Bristol-Myers Squibb Company Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Arnold & Porter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ryan Scott Gramacy +1 415 471 3205 ryan.gramacy@arnoldporter.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Sharon D. Mayo +1 415 471 3100 +1 415 471 3400 sharon.mayo@arnoldporter.com
McKesson Corporation McKesson Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Otsuka America Pharmaceutical, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Otsuka Pharmaceutical Company, Ltd., Defendant
Officially listed as "Otsuka Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd."
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1441
Nature of Suit 367 - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
  Entries (23) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/21/2018, Entered: None Order Transferring Case - - Out of District
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/8/2018, Entered: None Order Transferring Case - - Out of District
    ORDER LIFTING STAY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER. This case is transferred to the Northern District of Florida. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2018) (Entered: 06/21/2018)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/18/2018, Entered: 5/18/2018 Order on Motion to stayCourt Filing
      ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 16 Motion to Stay. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/17/2018, Entered: 5/17/2018 Opposition/Response to Motion
        OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 16 MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Pending Transfer to the Abilify MDL; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof ) filed byCraig Crenshaw, Justin Friedman, Patrick Gaskill, Darren Gilliam, Tyrone Kineard, Christopher Macy, Grace Mucherian, Juliette Patterson, Alexander Pham, Richard Rollo, Ann Schultz, Venita Ward. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order)(Liu, Sin-Ting) (Filed on 5/17/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE. Notice is hereby given that a status conference has been set for May 29, 2018, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m., in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2018) (Entered: 05/16/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/15/2018, Entered: 5/15/2018 StayCourt Filing
            MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Pending Transfer to the Abilify MDL; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. Motion Hearing set for 8/16/2018 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr.. Responses due by 5/29/2018. Replies due by 6/5/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Stay All Proceedings Pending Transfer to the Abilify MDL)(Mayo, Sharon) (Filed on 5/15/2018)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/15/2018, Entered: 5/15/2018 Order Reassigning CaseCourt Filing
              ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 5/15/2018. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2018)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/15/2018, Entered: 5/15/2018 Order Relating CaseCourt Filing
                ORDER RELATING CASE to 16-cv-00254-HSG. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 5/15/2018. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2018)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/15/2018, Entered: 5/15/2018 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                  CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company.. (Mayo, Sharon) (Filed on 5/15/2018)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/15/2018, Entered: 5/15/2018 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                    CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Craig Crenshaw, Justin Friedman, Patrick Gaskill, Darren Gilliam, Tyrone Kineard, Christopher Macy, Grace Mucherian, Juliette Patterson, Alexander Pham, Richard Rollo, Ann Schultz, Venita Ward.. (Liu, Sin-Ting) (Filed on 5/15/2018)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/11/2018, Entered: 5/11/2018 Certificate of counsel
                      CERTIFICATE of Counsel re 1 Notice of Removal, by Sharon D. Mayo on behalf of Bristol-Myers Squibb Company (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Mayo, Sharon) (Filed on 5/11/2018)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/11/2018, Entered: 5/11/2018 Notice - other
                        NOTICE by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company of Pendency of Other Action or Proceeding (Gramacy, Ryan) (Filed on 5/11/2018)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/9/2018, Entered: 5/9/2018 Certificate/Proof of Service
                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Craig Crenshaw, Justin Friedman, Patrick Gaskill, Darren Gilliam, Tyrone Kineard, Christopher Macy, Grace Mucherian, Juliette Patterson, Alexander Pham, Richard Rollo, Ann Schultz, Venita Ward re 7 MOTION to Remand Case to California State Court (Liu, Sin-Ting) (Filed on 5/9/2018)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/9/2018, Entered: 5/9/2018 Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination
                            CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFFS AND DEFENDANTS Re: Consent or Declination. Plaintiffs and Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 5/15/2018. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (shy, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2018)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/8/2018, Entered: 5/8/2018 Remand*Court Filing
                              MOTION to Remand Case to California State Court filed by Craig Crenshaw, Justin Friedman, Patrick Gaskill, Darren Gilliam, Tyrone Kineard, Christopher Macy, Grace Mucherian, Juliette Patterson, Alexander Pham, Richard Rollo, Ann Schultz, Venita Ward. Motion Hearing set for 6/12/2018 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Responses due by 5/22/2018. Replies due by 5/29/2018. (Attachments: # 1 MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO REMAND, # 2 Declaration SIN-TING MARY LIU IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO REMAND, # 3 Certificate/Proof of Service, # 4 Proposed Order)(Liu, Sin-Ting) (Filed on 5/8/2018)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/8/2018, Entered: 5/8/2018 Certificate/Proof of Service
                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company (Mayo, Sharon) (Filed on 5/8/2018)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/3/2018, Entered: 5/3/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                  NOTICE by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company of Withdrawal of Ground of Removal (Mayo, Sharon) (Filed on 5/3/2018)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/3/2018, Entered: None Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                      Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/24/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/31/2018 10:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 5/2/18. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2018) (Entered: 05/03/2018)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                        Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/16/2018. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2018) (Entered: 05/02/2018)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/2/2018, Entered: 5/2/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                          Certificate of Interested Entities by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company (Mayo, Sharon) (Filed on 5/2/2018)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/2/2018, Entered: 5/2/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                            NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF ACTION PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1332,1441, and 1446; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; (NO PROCESS); from San Francisco Superior Court. Their case number is CGC-18-566146. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-12319323). Filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mayo, Sharon) (Filed on 5/2/2018) Modified on 5/3/2018 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              Case has been successfully transferred to the Northern District of Florida; their case number is 3:18-cv-01443. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2018)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                              Statistics

                                              This case has been viewed 6 times.

                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                              Space
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                               
                                              PlainSite
                                              Sign Up
                                              Need Password Help?