Freeze v. Sawyer
Federal Civil Lawsuit Florida Middle District Court, Case No. 2:18-cv-00307

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 17, 2020 at 2:32 PM EDT (1.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit Prisoner Petitions: Civil Detainee: Conditions of Confinement
  Entries (17) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/17/2020, Entered: None USCA Mandate
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/6/2020, Entered: None USCA Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/19/2019, Entered: None USCA Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/31/2018, Entered: None Order on motion for leave to appeal in forma pauperis/affidavit of indigency
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/31/2018, Entered: None Order on motion for relief from judgmentCourt Filing
          ORDER denying 11 Motion for relief from judgment or Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 7/31/2018. (RKR)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/11/2018, Entered: None financial affidavit
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/11/2018, Entered: None Appeal in forma pauperis/affidavit of indigency
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/2/2018, Entered: None Relief from Judgment
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/26/2018, Entered: None Transmittal of initial appeal package
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/25/2018, Entered: None Notice of appeal
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/12/2018, Entered: None Judgment - prisoner
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/11/2018, Entered: None Order dismissing caseCourt Filing
                        ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE dismissing 1 Complaint without prejudice. The Clerk shall close the case. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 6/11/2018. (RKR)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/21/2018, Entered: None Notice of pendency of related cases
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/10/2018, Entered: None Related case order and track 1 notice
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/4/2018, Entered: None Standing order pro se litigants
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/4/2018, Entered: None Proceed in forma pauperis/affidavit of indigency
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/4/2018, Entered: None Complaint
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                    Statistics

                                    This case has been viewed 2 times.

                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                    Space
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                     
                                    PlainSite
                                    Sign Up
                                    Need Password Help?