Jones v. Wells Fargo Bank NA
Federal Civil Lawsuit Indiana Northern District Court, Case No. 1:18-cv-00125

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 6, 2018 at 1:33 AM ST (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1601
Nature of Suit Truth in Lending
  Entries (18) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/3/2018, Entered: None Opinion and Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/6/2018, Entered: None Amend/Correct
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/30/2018, Entered: None Amend/Correct
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/28/2018, Entered: None Opinion and OrderCourt Filing
        OPINION AND ORDER: The Court DENIES 14 as the Plaintiff's Complaint was dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction and no basis exists to reopen her case. Signed by Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann on 9/25/2018. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(lhc)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/26/2018, Entered: None Stay
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/25/2018, Entered: None clerk's judgment
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/25/2018, Entered: None Opinion and OrderCourt Filing
              OPINION AND ORDER: The Plaintiff's Motion to Amend the Complaint (ECF 11) is MOOT, the Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (ECF 6) is DENIED, and the case is DISMISSED for LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION. Signed by Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann on 9/25/18. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(ksp)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/10/2018, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/10/2018, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/10/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to Amend
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/8/2018, Entered: None Order
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/6/2018, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/6/2018, Entered: None Proceed In Forma Pauperis
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/16/2018, Entered: None Order
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/26/2018, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/14/2018, Entered: None ~Util - Set Deadlines
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/9/2018, Entered: None Proceed In Forma Pauperis
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/9/2018, Entered: None Pro Se Complaint
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                      Statistics

                                      This case has been viewed 7 times.

                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                      Space
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                       
                                      PlainSite
                                      Sign Up
                                      Need Password Help?