United States v. Lee
Federal Court Proceeding Virginia Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:18-mj-00018-IDD

Tags
Last Updated October 12, 2018 at 3:17 PM EDT (3.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William N. Hammerstrom, Jr. +1 703 299 3700 neil.hammerstrom@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Jerry Chun Shing Lee, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nina J. Ginsberg +1 703 684 4333 +1 703 548 3181 nginsberg@dimuro.com
Space Edward B. MacMahon +1 540 687 3902 +1 540 687 6366 ebmjr@macmahon-law.com
Jerry Chun Shing Lee (1)
Office Alexandria
Filed 1/13/2018
County Fairfax
Terminated
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Complaint
Citation
Offense Level 4
18793(e) Unlawful retention of documents relating to the national defense
Defendant Custody Status Custody This Court
  Entries (16) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank  terminate deadlines and hearings
Terminate Hearings as to Jerry Chun Shing Lee: Preliminary Hearing. (lgue, )
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/15/2018, Entered: 2/15/2018 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
    NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Nina J. Ginsberg appearing for Jerry Chun Shing Lee (Ginsberg, Nina)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/7/2018, Entered: 2/7/2018 Order of DetentionCourt Filing
      ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL as to Jerry Chun Shing Lee. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 02/07/2018. (lgue, )
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/6/2018, Entered: 2/6/2018 initial appearanceCourt Filing
        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis:Initial Appearance as to Jerry Chun Shing Lee held on 2/6/2018. US appeared through: Neil Hammerstrom. Deft appeared with counsel: Edward MacMahon. Deft informed of rights, charges, and penalties. Deft waives expeditious PH-GRANTED. Matter set for PH. Gov't is seeking detention. Deft does not contest detention at this time. Deft is remanded to the custody of the USMS due to risk on non appearance. Deft reserves the right of the courts determination as to detention based on a change of circumstances. Preliminary Hearing set for 3/19/2018 at 02:00 PM in Alexandria Courtroom 301 before Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. (Tape #FTR.)(lgue, )
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/6/2018, Entered: 2/6/2018 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
          NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Edward B. MacMahon appearing for Jerry Chun Shing Lee (MacMahon, Edward)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/24/2018, Entered: 1/25/2018 warrant returned executed
            Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 1/24/18 in case as to Jerry Chun Shing Lee. (krob)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/17/2018, Entered: 1/18/2018 Financial Affidavit-CJA 23
              CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Jerry Chun Shing Lee (jlan)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/17/2018, Entered: 1/18/2018 Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received
                Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received Eastern District of New York as to Jerry Chun Shing Lee. (jlan)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Blank  Arrest - Other District
                  Arrest of Jerry Chun Shing Lee in Eastern District of New York. (jlan)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/16/2018, Entered: 1/16/2018 Order to Unseal CaseCourt Filing
                    Order to Unseal Case as to Jerry Chun Shing Lee. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 01/16/2018. (jlan)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/13/2018, Entered: 1/16/2018 warrant issuedCourt Filing
                      Arrest Warrant Issued by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson in case as to Jerry Chun Shing Lee. (jlan)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/13/2018, Entered: 1/16/2018 Order on Motion to sealCourt Filing
                        ORDER granting [5] Motion to Seal as to Jerry Chun Shing Lee (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 01/13/2018. (jlan)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/13/2018, Entered: 1/16/2018 Motion to seal
                          MOTION to Seal by USA as to Jerry Chun Shing Lee. (jlan)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/13/2018, Entered: 1/16/2018 Redacted Criminal Case Cover Sheet
                            Redacted Criminal Case Cover Sheet (jlan)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document 2 Filed: 1/13/2018, Entered: 1/16/2018 Affidavit
                              AFFIDAVIT by USA as to Jerry Chun Shing Lee [1] Complaint (Sealed) (jlan)
                                LREF
                                Sealed Legal Document 1 Filed: 1/13/2018, Entered: 1/16/2018 Complaint (Sealed)
                                SEALED COMPLAINT as to Jerry Chun Shing Lee (1). (jlan)
                                  LREF

                                  Statistics

                                  This case has been viewed 48 times.

                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                  Space
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                   
                                  PlainSite
                                  Sign Up
                                  Need Password Help?