Telegram Messenger Inc v. Lantah, LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:18-cv-02811

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 19, 2021 at 10:34 AM DT (4.2 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Telegram Messenger Inc, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick Maben Hammon +1 650 470 4500 patrick.hammon@skadden.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John M. Neukom +1 650 470 4500 +1 650 470 4570 John.Neukom@skadden.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Y Pak +1 212 735 2546 +1 917 777 2546 James.Pak@skadden.com
No Logo Lantah, LLC, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 500

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Donald A. Thompson +1 415 506 8105 don@tco.law
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1125
Nature of Suit 840 - Property Rights: Trademark
  Entries (93) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 3/19/2021, Entered: None Patent/Trademark Report
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 3/18/2021, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 3/18/2021, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 1/19/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Attorney Fees
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 1/12/2021, Entered: None Notice (Other)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 1/4/2021, Entered: None Response ( Non Motion )
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 1/4/2021, Entered: None Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 12/23/2020, Entered: None Reply to Opposition/Response
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 12/23/2020, Entered: None Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 12/17/2020, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 12/4/2020, Entered: None Exhibits
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 12/4/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 12/4/2020, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 12/4/2020, Entered: None Remove Incorrectly Filed Document
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 12/2/2020, Entered: None Attorney Fees
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 11/2/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 10/16/2020, Entered: None Reply to Opposition/Response
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 10/16/2020, Entered: None Reply to Opposition/Response
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 10/9/2020, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 10/9/2020, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 9/26/2020, Entered: None Dismiss
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 9/26/2020, Entered: None Attorney Fees
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 9/14/2020, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 8/24/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 7/22/2020, Entered: None Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 7/10/2020, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 6/22/2020, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 6/18/2020, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 6/9/2020, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 4/27/2020, Entered: None Joint Case Management Statement
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 3/13/2020, Entered: None Case Management Statement
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 12/13/2019, Entered: None Order Setting Settlement Conference
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 12/10/2019, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 11/15/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Appear by Telephone
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 11/13/2019, Entered: None Appear by Telephone
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 11/8/2019, Entered: None Case Management Statement
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 10/2/2019, Entered: None USCA Mandate
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 9/25/2019, Entered: None USCA Order
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 8/5/2019, Entered: None USCA Order
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 7/19/2019, Entered: None USCA Memorandum
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 10/23/2018, Entered: None USCA Order
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 9/26/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 9/20/2018, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: None Transcript Order
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 9/11/2018, Entered: None USCA Case Number
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 9/7/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appeal
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 9/7/2018, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 8/14/2018, Entered: 8/14/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                NOTICE by Telegram Messenger Inc re 40 Preliminary Injunction UNDERTAKING ON PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION (Neukom, John) (Filed on 8/14/2018)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 8/10/2018, Entered: 8/10/2018 Order on Motion for Partial Summary JudgmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                  ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer vacating hearing and denying 20 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2018)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 8/8/2018, Entered: 8/8/2018 Preliminary InjunctionCourt Filing
                                                                                                    PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 8/8/2018. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2018)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 8/8/2018, Entered: 8/8/2018 Order on Motion for Preliminary InjunctionCourt Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 16 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2018)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 8/7/2018, Entered: 8/7/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                        Transcript of Proceedings held on August 3, 2018, before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Court Reporter Belle Ball, CSR, CRR, RDR, telephone number (415)373-2529, belle_ball@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 37 Transcript Order, 36 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/5/2018. (Related documents(s) 37, 36 ) (ballbb15S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2018)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 8/6/2018, Entered: 8/6/2018 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 08/03/18 before Judge Charles R. Breyer by Lantah, LLC, for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Thompson, Donald) (Filed on 8/6/2018)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 8/6/2018, Entered: 8/6/2018 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 08/03/2018 before Judge Charles R. Breyer by Telegram Messenger Inc, for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Neukom, John) (Filed on 8/6/2018)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 8/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Charles R. Breyer: Motion Hearing held on 8/3/2018 - Re 16 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Telegram Messenger Inc. - Motion Granted. Court will issue an order. Case Management Conference set for August 10, 2018 is vacated. Court ordered a Bond posting in the amount of $25,000.00. (Total Time in Court: 24 Minutes) Court Reporter: Belle Ball. Plaintiff Attorney: John M. Neukom and James Y. Pak. Defendant Attorney: Donald A. Thompson. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/3/2018) (Entered: 08/03/2018)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 8/2/2018, Entered: 8/2/2018 Refund Status
                                                                                                                Refund Status re 30 Application for Refund APPROVED. (rghS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2018)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 8/2/2018, Entered: 8/2/2018 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under SealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  ORDER GRANTING LANTAH LLCS ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL AND RELATED COUNTERCLAIMS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENTby Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting 29 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2018)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 8/2/2018, Entered: 8/2/2018 Order on Ex Parte ApplicationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    ORDER DENYING EX PARTE REQUEST TO CONSOLIDATE HEARINGS by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Denying 31 Ex Parte Application. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2018)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 7/31/2018, Entered: 7/31/2018 Ex-Parte Application
                                                                                                                      Ex Parte Application re 16 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, 20 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Lantah, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Donald A Thompson in Support of Ex Parte Request to Consolidate, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Ex Parte Request to Consolidate)(Thompson, Donald) (Filed on 7/31/2018)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/31/2018, Entered: 7/31/2018 Application for Refund
                                                                                                                        Application for Refund, Receipt Number 0971-12347683 by Telegram Messenger Inc. (Neukom, John) (Filed on 7/31/2018)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/31/2018, Entered: 7/31/2018 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                          Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Reply in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Lantah, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Donald A. Thompson in Support of Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Lantah's Reply in Support of its Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Lantah's Reply in Support of its Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, # 3 Redacted Version of Lantah's Reply in Support of Its Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, # 4 Unedacted Version of Lantah's Reply in Support of Its Motion for Partial Summary Judgment)(Thompson, Donald) (Filed on 7/31/2018)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/30/2018, Entered: 7/30/2018 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under SealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF TELEGRAM MESSENGER INCS ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting 21 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2018)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/27/2018, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/26/2018, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 20 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment ) PLAINTIFF TELEGRAM MESSENGER INCS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS COUNTER-MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed byTelegram Messenger Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Neukom, John) (Filed on 7/26/2018) Modified on 7/30/2018 (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/26/2018)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/25/2018, Entered: 7/25/2018 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
                                                                                                                                  ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by Lantah LLC (Thompson, Donald) (Filed on 7/25/2018)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/25/2018, Entered: 7/25/2018 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
                                                                                                                                    ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Neukom, John) (Filed on 7/25/2018)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/25/2018, Entered: 7/25/2018 Declaration in Opposition
                                                                                                                                      SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION of Donald A. Thompson in Opposition to 16 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and in Support of MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed byLantah, LLC. (Related document(s) 16 ) (Thompson, Donald) (Filed on 7/25/2018) Modified on 7/25/2018 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/24/2018, Entered: 7/24/2018 ADR Clerk's Notice re: Non-Compliance
                                                                                                                                        ADR Clerk's Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order (ewh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2018)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/20/2018, Entered: None Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/19/2018, Entered: None Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                                                                                            REPLY (re 16 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ) filed byTelegram Messenger Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of I. Perekipsky)(Neukom, John) (Filed on 7/19/2018) (Entered: 07/19/2018)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/20/2018, Entered: None Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/19/2018, Entered: None Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Telegram Messenger Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of J. Neukom, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 UNREDACTED Version of Exhibit E to the Reply Declaration)(Neukom, John) (Filed on 7/19/2018) (Entered: 07/19/2018)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/13/2018, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/12/2018, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENTCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment AND OPPOSITION TO 16 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Lantah, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 8/24/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Responses due by 7/26/2018. Replies due by 8/2/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Daniel Jeffery in Support of Lantah's Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Telegram's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction, # 2 Declaration of Donald A. Thompson in Support of Lantah's Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Telegram's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction Part 1 of 3, # 3 Declaration of Donald A. Thompson in Support of Lantah's Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Telegram's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction Part 2 of 3, # 4 Declaration of Donald A. Thompson in Support of Lantah's Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Telegram's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction Part 3 of 3, # 5 Proposed Order Granting Lantah's Motion for Summary Judgment, # 6 Proposed Order Denying Telegram's Motion for Preliminary Injunction)(Thompson, Donald) (Filed on 7/12/2018) Modified on 7/13/2018 (mclS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 7/30/2018 (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/11/2018, Entered: 7/11/2018 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CHANGE DEADLINE TO CONFER ON CASE MANAGEMENT by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting 18 Stipulation. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/9/2018, Entered: 7/9/2018 Stipulation And [proposed} Order
                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO CHANGE DEADLINE TO CONFER ON CASE MANAGEMENT filed by Lantah, LLC. (Thompson, Donald) (Filed on 7/9/2018)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/29/2018, Entered: 6/29/2018 answer to counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to 14 Counterclaim byTelegram Messenger Inc. (Neukom, John) (Filed on 6/29/2018) Modified on 7/2/2018 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/28/2018, Entered: 6/28/2018 Preliminary InjunctionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Telegram Messenger Inc. Motion Hearing set for 8/3/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Responses due by 7/12/2018. Replies due by 7/19/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of P. Hammon, # 2 Exhibits to Declaration of P. Hammon, # 3 Declaration of I. Perekopsky, # 4 Exhibits to Declaration of I. Perekopsky, # 5 Proposed Order)(Neukom, John) (Filed on 6/28/2018)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/28/2018, Entered: 6/28/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by James Pak on behalf of Plaintiff Telegram Messenger Inc. (Pak, James) (Filed on 6/28/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/8/2018, Entered: 6/8/2018 Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                COUNTERCLAIM AND ANSWER against Telegram Messenger Inc. Filed byLantah, LLC. (Thompson, Donald) (Filed on 6/8/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/25/2018, Entered: 5/25/2018 Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures
                                                                                                                                                                  Certificate of Interested Entities by Lantah, LLC (Thompson, Donald) (Filed on 5/25/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/25/2018, Entered: 5/25/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Donald A. Thompson for Defendant Lantah LLC (Thompson, Donald) (Filed on 5/25/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                      CLERK'S NOTICE: A Joint Case Management Statement due by 8/3/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/10/2018 at 8:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2018) (Entered: 05/17/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/15/2018, Entered: 5/15/2018 Order Reassigning CaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Charles R. Breyer for all further proceedings. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd no longer assigned to the case. Reassignment Order signed by Executive Committee on 5/15/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording) (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2018) (Entered: 05/15/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/15/2018, Entered: 5/15/2018 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Telegram Messenger Inc.. (Neukom, John) (Filed on 5/15/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/14/2018, Entered: 5/14/2018 Patent/Trademark Copy
                                                                                                                                                                              REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding Trademark Infringement (cc: form mailed to register). (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/14/2018, Entered: 5/14/2018 Summons issued
                                                                                                                                                                                Summons Issued as to Lantah, LLC. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/14/2018, Entered: 5/14/2018 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
                                                                                                                                                                                  Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/7/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/14/2018 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/29/2018. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2018) (Entered: 05/14/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/11/2018, Entered: 5/11/2018 Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures
                                                                                                                                                                                      Corporate Disclosure Statement by Telegram Messenger Inc identifying Corporate Parent Telegram Group Inc., Other Affiliate TON Issuer Inc. for Telegram Messenger Inc. PLAINTIFF TELEGRAM MESSENGER INCS CERTIFICATION OF INTERESTED ENTITIES OR PERSONS AND CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (Neukom, John) (Filed on 5/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/11/2018, Entered: 5/11/2018 Proposed Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                        Proposed Summons. (Neukom, John) (Filed on 5/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/11/2018, Entered: 5/11/2018 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT FOR (1) FALSE DESIGNATION OF ORIGIN; (2) TRADEMARK INFRINGEMENT; AND (3) UNFAIR COMPETITION against Lantah, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12347797.). Filed byTelegram Messenger Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Neukom, John) (Filed on 5/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 4 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?