Caranchini v. Peck
Federal Civil Lawsuit Kansas District Court, Case No. 2:18-cv-02249

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated May 6, 2021 at 6:45 PM DT (5.5 days ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1396
Nature of Suit Assault Libel & Slander
  Entries (226) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 5/6/2021, Entered: None Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 5/6/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 5/3/2021, Entered: None Letter
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 5/3/2021, Entered: None Letter
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 4/30/2021, Entered: None Letter
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 4/30/2021, Entered: None Recusal
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 4/29/2021, Entered: None Notice of Intent to Issue Subpoena
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 4/23/2021, Entered: None Sealed Document
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 4/21/2021, Entered: None Response
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 4/19/2021, Entered: None Response to Order to Show Cause
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 4/14/2021, Entered: None extension of time
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 4/14/2021, Entered: None Letter
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 4/14/2021, Entered: None Letter
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 4/14/2021, Entered: None Letter
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 4/14/2021, Entered: None Reply
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 4/9/2021, Entered: None Reply
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 4/6/2021, Entered: None Reply
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 4/5/2021, Entered: None Order
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 4/5/2021, Entered: None Order
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 4/2/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Review
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 4/2/2021, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 4/2/2021, Entered: None Review
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 4/2/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 4/2/2021, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 4/2/2021, Entered: None Review
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 4/1/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 4/1/2021, Entered: None Reply/Objection to Response to Order to Show Cause
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 4/1/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion to Substitute Party
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 4/1/2021, Entered: None SEALED Exhibits in Support of Motion
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 4/1/2021, Entered: None Review
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 4/1/2021, Entered: None SEALED Exhibits in Support of Motion
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 3/31/2021, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 3/31/2021, Entered: None Review
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 3/30/2021, Entered: None Substitute Party
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 3/30/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion to Substitute Party
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 3/28/2021, Entered: None Substitute Party
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 3/26/2021, Entered: None Show Cause
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 3/26/2021, Entered: None order on motion to stay case
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 3/26/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion to Show Cause
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 3/22/2021, Entered: None Supplement
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 3/18/2021, Entered: None Supplement
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 3/17/2021, Entered: None Response to Order
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 3/15/2021, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 3/15/2021, Entered: None Stay Case
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 3/15/2021, Entered: None Certificate of Service
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 3/12/2021, Entered: None Substitute Party
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 3/5/2021, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 3/4/2021, Entered: None Notice Of Assignment Of Judgment
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 3/3/2021, Entered: None order on motion to stay case
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 3/2/2021, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 3/2/2021, Entered: None Stay Case
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 3/2/2021, Entered: None order on motion to stay case
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 3/1/2021, Entered: None Notice of Intent to Issue Subpoena
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 2/25/2021, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 2/25/2021, Entered: None Stay Case
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 2/22/2021, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 1/25/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 12/21/2020, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 12/21/2020, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 12/1/2020, Entered: None Hearing
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 11/30/2020, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 10/15/2020, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 10/13/2020, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 9/30/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Judgment Debtor Exam
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 3/11/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Recusal
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 3/3/2020, Entered: None Mandate
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 10/4/2019, Entered: None Preliminary Record on Appeal Sent
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 10/4/2019, Entered: None Amended Notice of Appeal
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 10/3/2019, Entered: None Appeal Number Information
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 10/3/2019, Entered: None Judgment
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 10/3/2019, Entered: None Preliminary Record on Appeal Sent
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 10/3/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 10/3/2019, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 10/3/2019, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 10/2/2019, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 10/2/2019, Entered: None Strike
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 10/2/2019, Entered: None Recusal
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 10/2/2019, Entered: None Hearing
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 10/2/2019, Entered: None Stay Case
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 9/30/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Recusal
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 9/28/2019, Entered: None Judgment Debtor Exam
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 9/26/2019, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 9/26/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 9/24/2019, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 9/16/2019, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 9/16/2019, Entered: None Response to Order
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 9/16/2019, Entered: None Recusal
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 9/12/2019, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 9/11/2019, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 9/11/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 9/9/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 9/4/2019, Entered: None Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 9/3/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Attorney Fees
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 5/20/2019, Entered: None Notice of Related Case
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 2/1/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 1/18/2019, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 1/18/2019, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 1/2/2019, Entered: None Attorney Fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: None Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 12/5/2018, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 12/2/2018, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 12/1/2018, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 11/29/2018, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 11/28/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: None Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 11/26/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 11/9/2018, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 11/8/2018, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 11/8/2018, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 11/7/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 11/2/2018, Entered: None Memorandum & Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 11/2/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Review
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 10/31/2018, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 10/29/2018, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 10/29/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 10/26/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for sanctions
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 10/24/2018, Entered: None Response to order to show cause
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 10/23/2018, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 10/22/2018, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 10/23/2018, Entered: None Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 10/22/2018, Entered: None Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 10/22/2018, Entered: None Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 10/22/2018, Entered: None Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 10/22/2018, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 10/22/2018, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 10/22/2018, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 10/21/2018, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 10/19/2018, Entered: None Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 10/17/2018, Entered: None memorandum in support of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 10/17/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 10/17/2018, Entered: None Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 10/17/2018, Entered: None Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 10/16/2018, Entered: None Show Cause
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 10/15/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claimCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 11 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 10/15/18. (hw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 10/14/2018, Entered: None Dismiss Party
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 10/13/2018, Entered: None File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 10/12/2018, Entered: None File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 10/13/2018, Entered: None Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 10/12/2018, Entered: None Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: None Order on Objection to Order of Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 59 Objection to Order of Magistrate Judge. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 10/5/18. (hw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 10/8/2018, Entered: None Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 10/7/2018, Entered: None Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 10/6/2018, Entered: None protective order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 10/5/2018, Entered: None Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 10/4/2018, Entered: None Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 10/3/2018, Entered: None Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 10/3/2018, Entered: None Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 10/3/2018, Entered: None Withdraw
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 10/2/2018, Entered: None Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 10/1/2018, Entered: None Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 9/30/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 9/29/2018, Entered: None Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 9/28/2018, Entered: None Sanctions
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: None Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 9/20/2018, Entered: None Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 9/19/2018, Entered: None Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 9/20/2018, Entered: None Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 9/19/2018, Entered: None Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 9/12/2018, Entered: None memorandum in support of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 9/12/2018, Entered: None Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 9/11/2018, Entered: None Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 9/10/2018, Entered: None Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 9/9/2018, Entered: None MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 9/7/2018, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 8/29/2018, Entered: None Amended Document - NOT Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 8/29/2018, Entered: None Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 8/25/2018, Entered: None Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 8/25/2018, Entered: None Objection to Order of Magistrate Judge
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 8/24/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for extension of time to answerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 55 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead or in the Alternative Motion for Status Conference. The Court on its own motion grants the State Defendants an extension of time, to and including September 14, 2018, in which to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Rushfelt on 8/23/18. Mailed to pro se party Gwen Caranchini by regular mail. (hw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 8/16/2018, Entered: None Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 8/14/2018, Entered: None Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 8/14/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 7/28/2018, Entered: None Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 7/26/2018, Entered: None MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 7/23/2018, Entered: None Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 7/23/2018, Entered: None Clerk's Order Extending Time to Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 7/23/2018, Entered: None Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 7/22/2018, Entered: None Reassign Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 7/20/2018, Entered: None Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 7/16/2018, Entered: None Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 7/10/2018, Entered: None Order on motion to stay discoveryCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM AND ORDER deferring, pending further order of the Court that lifts the stay of discovery 27 Motion to Produce Jail Records and 35 Motion to Produce Jail Records; denying 43 Motion for Hearing; granting 15 Motion to Stay Discovery; denying 20 Motion for Hearing. See order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gerald L. Rushfelt on 7/10/18. Mailed to pro se party Gwen Caranchini by regular mail. (hw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 7/9/2018, Entered: None Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 7/6/2018, Entered: None Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 7/5/2018, Entered: None Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 7/5/2018, Entered: None Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 6/26/2018, Entered: None Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 6/21/2018, Entered: None Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 6/20/2018, Entered: None Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 6/20/2018, Entered: None Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 6/20/2018, Entered: None Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 6/20/2018, Entered: None Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 6/14/2018, Entered: None Produce
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 6/14/2018, Entered: None Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 6/13/2018, Entered: None Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 6/13/2018, Entered: None Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 6/12/2018, Entered: None Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 6/12/2018, Entered: None Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 6/12/2018, Entered: None Docket Annotation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/12/2018, Entered: None Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/11/2018, Entered: None Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/11/2018, Entered: None Produce
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/11/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/11/2018, Entered: None memorandum in support of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/11/2018, Entered: None Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/10/2018, Entered: None Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/8/2018, Entered: None Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/7/2018, Entered: None Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/7/2018, Entered: None Certified Mail Receipt Returned
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/6/2018, Entered: None Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/5/2018, Entered: None Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/4/2018, Entered: None Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/4/2018, Entered: None Stay discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/1/2018, Entered: None Leave to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/1/2018, Entered: None Leave to File Conventionally
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/1/2018, Entered: None File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/1/2018, Entered: None Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/30/2018, Entered: None Order on motion for extension of time to file Response/ReplyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to 3 MOTION to Strike 1 Complaint. Response deadline 6/4/2018. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 05/30/2018. Mailed to pro se party Gwendolyn G. Caranchini by regular mail and certified mail 7014 3490 0002 1092 2262. (tvn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/30/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None Leave
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/15/2018, Entered: None Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/14/2018, Entered: None Civil Cover Sheet
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/14/2018, Entered: None Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 4 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?