BONNER v. HUBER et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New Jersey District Court, Case No. 3:18-cv-09187-PGS-LHG
District Judge Peter G. Sheridan, presiding

Tags
Last Updated October 24, 2019 at 11:22 AM DT (1.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ANDREW K. BONNER, JR., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by ANDREW K. BONNER, JR.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space ANDREW K. BONNER, JR. +1 609 805 4878
v.
No Logo Justia, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "JUSTIA INCORPORATED"

Toggle Switch Represented by Lewis, Brisbois, Bisgaard & Smith, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space RYAN FRANCIS MICHALESKI +1 215 977 4062 +1 215 977 4101 ryan.michaleski@lewisbrisbois.com
No Logo JUSTIA.COM, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lewis, Brisbois, Bisgaard & Smith, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ERIC J. BRONSTEIN +1 215 977 4100 Eric.Bronstein@lewisbrisbois.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED RYAN FRANCIS MICHALESKI +1 215 977 4062 +1 215 977 4101 ryan.michaleski@lewisbrisbois.com
No Logo MARISSA HUBER, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the New Jersey Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/26/2018 BRETT JOSEPH HAROLDSON +1 609 658 8652 brett.haroldson@law.njoag.gov
No Logo NJ COURT OF APPEALS CLERKS OFFICE, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the New Jersey Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/26/2018 BRETT JOSEPH HAROLDSON +1 609 658 8652 brett.haroldson@law.njoag.gov
No Logo EUGENE VOLOKH, Intervenor
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 320 - Personal Injury: Assault Libel & Slander
Office Trenton
Filed 5/14/2018
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Judgment - Motion Before Trial
County Mercer
Terminated 8/19/2019
Origin 4
Reopened 1/28/2019
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (65) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 45 Filed: 8/19/2019, Entered: 8/19/2019 Order on motion to interveneCourt Filing
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the motion for leave to appear pro se and to intervene [33] filed by Eugene Volokh is granted; the application to seal the Appellate Division's Opinion filed by Plaintiff [26] is denied; the motion to dismiss the Amended Complaint filed by Justia [24] is granted with prejudice; the clerk is directed to close the file. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 8/19/2019. (jem)
    LREF
    Legal Document 44 Filed: 7/31/2019, Entered: 8/2/2019 Motion HearingCourt Filing
    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Peter G. Sheridan: Motion Hearing held on 7/31/2019 re: [33] motion to intervene by Eugene Volokh, and [24] motion to dismiss by JUSTIA. Ordered [33] motion to intervene is granted. Order to be filed. Ordered [24] motion to dismiss is taken under advisement. (Court Reporter: GABLE.) (eh, )
      LREF
      Legal Document 43 Filed: 5/2/2019, Entered: 5/2/2019 OrderCourt Filing
      LETTER ORDER that the Motion is adjourned to 7/31/2019; and will be heard with the Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's issues with Prof. Volokh may be addressed at the hearing. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 5/2/2019. (mps)
        LREF
        Legal Document 42 Filed: 5/2/2019, Entered: 5/2/2019 letter
        Letter from Justia, Inc. in Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Adjourn Oral Argument. (MICHALESKI, RYAN)
          LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 10/24/2019, Entered: None Letter
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Blank  Set/Reset Motion and R and R Deadlines/Hearings
            ORAL ARGUMENT REQUIRED for the [24] MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. Motion set for 7/31/2019 at 2:00 PM in Trenton - Courtroom 4E before Judge Peter G. Sheridan. (dh, )
              LREF
              Legal Document 41 Filed: 4/30/2019, Entered: 4/30/2019 letter
              Letter submission from ANDREW K. BONNER, JR. containing Motion to Seal and Dismiss the Requests of Intervenor Eugene Volokh (mps)
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 4/24/2019, Entered: 4/24/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                LETTER ORDER that all the parties to this suit shall participate by telephone, using the number within this Order. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 4/24/2019. (mps)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document 39 Filed: 4/16/2019, Entered: 4/16/2019 response in opposition to motion
                  RESPONSE in Opposition filed by JUSTIA INCORPORATED re [33] MOTION to Intervene and Response In Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Seal #18 (MICHALESKI, RYAN)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 38 Filed: 4/11/2019, Entered: 4/12/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                    ORDER that the Court shall consider Professor Volokh's [33] Brief. Subsequent submissions filed by any party (or non-party) must be double spaced in compliance with Local Civil Rule 7.2(d). Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 4/11/2019. (mps)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 37 Filed: 4/11/2019, Entered: 4/12/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                      LETTER ORDER that the Clerk is directed to file this letter brief. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 4/11/2019. (mps)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 36 Filed: 4/10/2019, Entered: 4/10/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                        LETTER ORDER denying Professor Volokh's [34] request for an adjournment. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 4/9/2019. (mps)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 35 Filed: 4/9/2019, Entered: 4/9/2019 letter
                          Letter from Ryan Michaleski, Esquire re [34] Letter. (MICHALESKI, RYAN)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 34 Filed: 4/5/2019, Entered: 4/5/2019 letter
                            Letter from EUGENE VOLOKH requesting adjournment. (mps)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 33 Filed: 4/5/2019, Entered: 4/5/2019, Terminated: 8/19/2019 Motion to intervene
                              MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Se; MOTION for Leave to Intervene; and Proposed Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Seal by EUGENE VOLOKH. (mps)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 32 Filed: 4/5/2019, Entered: 4/5/2019 MEMORANDUMCourt Filing
                                MEMORANDUM OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 4/5/2019. (mps)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank  Set/Reset Motion and R and R Deadlines/Hearings
                                  Set Deadlines as to the [33] MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Se; MOTION for Leave to Intervene. Motion set for 5/6/2019 before Judge Peter G. Sheridan. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mps)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank  QC - Incorrect Entry made by Clerk's Office Staff
                                    CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please note the [32] Memorandum Opinion filed by the Clerk's office on 4/5/2019 was docketed in error. Please disregard. (mps)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/3/2019, Entered: 4/3/2019 Exhibit
                                      Exhibit (Additional Attachment) to [29] Response in Opposition to Motion by ANDREW K. BONNER, JR. (mps)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/3/2019, Entered: 4/3/2019 response in opposition to motion
                                        RESPONSE in Opposition filed by ANDREW K. BONNER, JR re [24] MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint (Attachments: # (1) Attachments (Part 1), # (2) Attachments (Part 2))(mps)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 4/2/2019, Entered: 4/3/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                                          SCHEDULING ORDER that Plaintiff's emergent request to seal the documents and Professor Volokh's request to appear pro se are to be filed as motions and the Court shall consider same on an expedited basis. Professor Volokh shall file his brief on both issues by 4/9/2019. Mr. Bonner and Justia may file an opposition brief on both issues by 4/16/2019. The court shall hold argument on the motion by telephone on 5/6/2019, at 2:00 PM. Professor Volokh is responsible for initiating the conference call with all parties into chambers. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 4/2/2019. (mps)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/1/2019, Entered: 4/1/2019 Response (NOT Motion)
                                            RESPONSE re [26] Order. (MICHALESKI, RYAN)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/21/2019, Entered: 3/21/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                                              LETTER ORDER that in order for Mr. Volokh's letter to be considered he must be represented by Counsel or be retained as an expert by a party to the action. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 3/20/2019. (mmh)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/12/2019, Entered: 3/12/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                                                LETTER ORDER that Defendant may respond to this letter by 4/1/2019. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 3/11/2019. (mps)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Blank 25 Filed: 1/28/2019, Entered: 1/28/2019 Order Reopening CaseCourt Filing
                                                  TEXT ORDER REOPENING CASE. So Ordered by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 1/28/2019. (dh, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank  Set/Reset Motion and R and R Deadlines/Hearings
                                                    Set Deadlines as to the [24] MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. Motion set for 2/19/2019 before Judge Peter G. Sheridan. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mps)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/15/2019, Entered: 1/15/2019, Terminated: 8/19/2019 Motion to Dismiss
                                                      MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by JUSTIA INCORPORATED. (Attachments: # (1) Brief, # (2) Text of Proposed Order, # (3) Certificate of Service, # (4) Exhibit Exhibits A-C)(MICHALESKI, RYAN)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document 23 Filed: 12/26/2018, Entered: 12/26/2018 Amended Complaint
                                                        AMENDED COMPLAINT against JUSTIA INCORPORATED, filed by ANDREW K. BONNER, JR. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet, # (2) Application IFP)(mps) Modified on 12/26/2018 to correct Defendant's name (mps).
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/26/2018, Entered: 11/26/2018 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                          ORDER that Defendant Justia's [11] Motion to Dismiss is granted; Plaintiff's complaint against Justia is dismissed without prejudice. The [14] Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendants Huber and the Appellate Division Clerk's Office is granted; Plaintiff's complaint against the Appellate Division Clerk's Office is dismissed with prejudice and Plaintiff's complaint against Huber is dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiff has thirty (30) days from the date of this Order to file an Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 11/26/2018. (mps)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/20/2018, Entered: 11/30/2018 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Peter G. Sheridan: Motion Hearing held on 11/20/2018 re [11] MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by JUSTIA.COM. (Granted) Order filed. (Court Reporter/Recorder Frank Gable.) (dh, )
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: 10/9/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                              LETTER ORDER adjourning the [11] and [14] Motions to Dismiss to 11/20/2018. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 10/9/2018. (mps)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Blank  Set/Reset Motion and R and R Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                ORAL ARGUMENT REQUIRED for the [11] MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint, [14] First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint with prejudice. Motions reset for 11/20/2018 11:00 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 4E before Judge Peter G. Sheridan. (mps)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/4/2018, Entered: 10/4/2018 letter
                                                                  Letter from ANDREW K. BONNER, JR.. (km)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Plaintiff is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: 9/24/2018, Terminated: 11/26/2018 Motion to Seal Case
                                                                    MOTION for an Order to Seal Case by ANDREW K. BONNER, JR. (Attachments: # (1) Attachment in Support)(mps)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Blank  Set/Reset Motion and R and R Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                      Set Deadlines as to the [18] MOTION for an Order to Seal Case. Motion set for 11/5/2018 before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mps)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank  Set/Reset Motion and R and R Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                        ORAL ARGUMENT REQUIRED for the [11] MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint, [14] First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint with prejudice. Motion set for 10/15/2018 at 11:00 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 4E before Judge Peter G. Sheridan. (dh, )
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/6/2018, Entered: 9/6/2018 letter
                                                                          Letter from ANDREW K. BONNER, JR. regarding Brett J. Haroldson. (mps)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Blank  Set/Reset Motion and R and R Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                            NO ORAL ARGUMENT for the [11] MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint, [14] First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint with prejudice. Motion set for 9/4/2018 before Judge Peter G. Sheridan. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dh, )
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/24/2018, Entered: 8/24/2018 response in opposition to motion
                                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition filed by ANDREW K. BONNER, JR re [14] First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint with prejudice (mps)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/16/2018, Entered: 8/16/2018 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition filed by ANDREW K. BONNER, JR re [11] MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint (mps)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Blank  Set/Reset Motion and R and R Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                                  ORAL ARGUMENT REQUIRED for the [14] First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint with prejudice. Motion set for 9/4/2018 11:00 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 4E before Judge Peter G. Sheridan. (mps)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/8/2018, Entered: 8/8/2018, Terminated: 11/26/2018 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                    First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint with prejudice by MARISSA HUBER, NJ COURT OF APPEALS CLERKS OFFICE. Responses due by 8/21/2018 (Attachments: # (1) Brief, # (2) Certificate of Service, # (3) Text of Proposed Order)(HAROLDSON, BRETT)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/1/2018, Entered: 8/1/2018 letter
                                                                                      Submission by Andrew Bonner. (kas, )
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/31/2018, Entered: 7/31/2018 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                        Corporate Disclosure Statement by JUSTIA.COM identifying n/a as Corporate Parent.. (BRONSTEIN, ERIC)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Blank  Set/Reset Motion and R and R Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                                          ORAL ARGUMENT REQUIRED for the [11] MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. Motion set for 9/4/2018 11:00 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 4E before Judge Peter G. Sheridan. (mmh)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/30/2018, Entered: 7/30/2018, Terminated: 11/26/2018 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                            MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by JUSTIA.COM. Responses due by 8/21/2018 (Attachments: # (1) Brief, # (2) Text of Proposed Order)(BRONSTEIN, ERIC)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/20/2018, Entered: 7/20/2018 summons returned executed
                                                                                              SUMMONS Returned Executed by the USMS. MARISSA HUBER served on 7/20/2018, answer due 8/10/2018; NJ COURT OF APPEALS CLERKS OFFICE served on 7/20/2018, answer due 8/10/2018. (mps)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/6/2018, Entered: 7/6/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                ORDER that the deadline for Justia, Inc. to file a response to Plaintiff's Complaint shall be extended by twenty-one (21) days. The new deadline for Justia, Inc. to file a response to Plaintiff's Complaint is 7/30/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 7/6/2018. (mps)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/3/2018, Entered: 7/3/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by ERIC J. BRONSTEIN on behalf of JUSTIA.COM (BRONSTEIN, ERIC)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/3/2018, Entered: 7/3/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by RYAN FRANCIS MICHALESKI on behalf of JUSTIA.COM (MICHALESKI, RYAN)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document 6 Filed: 6/25/2018, Entered: 6/26/2018 summons returned executed
                                                                                                      SUMMONS Returned Executed by the USMS. JUSTIA.COM served on 6/18/2018, answer due 7/9/2018. (mps)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/25/2018, Entered: None summons returned executed
                                                                                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed by the USMS. JUSTIA.COM served on 6/18/2018, answer due 7/9/2018. (mps) (Entered: 06/26/2018)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/7/2018, Entered: 6/7/2018 Summons issued
                                                                                                          SUMMONS ISSUED as to MARISSA M. HUBER, JUSTIA.COM, NJ COURT OF APPEALS CLERKS OFFICE Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *Karen McGonigle* (km)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/7/2018, Entered: 6/7/2018 Certificate of Clerk
                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE of USMS (km)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/31/2018, Entered: 5/31/2018 Letter: re USM 285
                                                                                                              CLERK'S LETTER: Transmittal of USM 285 Forms. (mps)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/30/2018, Entered: 5/31/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                ORDER granting Application to proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk is directed to file the Complaint. The Clerk is to issue Summons and the U.S. Marshal serve a copy of the Complaint, Summons and this Order upon the Defendant(s). Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 5/30/2018. (mps)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/30/2018, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  ORDER granting Application to proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk is directed to file the Complaint. The Clerk is to issue Summons and the U.S. Marshal serve a copy of the Complaint, Summons and this Order upon the Defendant(s). Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 5/30/2018. (mps) (Entered: 05/31/2018)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Complaint
                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT against MARISSA M. HUBER, JUSTIA.COM, NJ COURT OF APPEALS CLERKS OFFICE, filed by ANDREW K. BONNER, JR.(mps)
                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/14/2018, Entered: 5/14/2018 Complaint Received
                                                                                                                      Complaint Received. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet, # (2) Exhibit, # (3) Application IFP)(ces) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/15/2018: # (4) Text of Proposed Order) (jem).
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                        ORAL ARGUMENT REQUIRED for the 11 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint, 14 First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint with prejudice. Motions reset for 11/20/2018 11:00 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 4E before Judge Peter G. Sheridan. (mps)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                        Set Deadlines as to the 18 MOTION for an Order to Seal Case. Motion set for 11/5/2018 before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mps)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          ORAL ARGUMENT REQUIRED for the 11 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint, 14 First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint with prejudice. Motion set for 10/15/2018 at 11:00 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 4E before Judge Peter G. Sheridan. (dh, )
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            NO ORAL ARGUMENT for the 11 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint, 14 First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint with prejudice. Motion set for 9/4/2018 before Judge Peter G. Sheridan. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dh, )
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              ORAL ARGUMENT REQUIRED for the 14 First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint with prejudice. Motion set for 9/4/2018 11:00 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 4E before Judge Peter G. Sheridan. (mps)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/31/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                ORAL ARGUMENT REQUIRED for the 11 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. Motion set for 9/4/2018 11:00 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 4E before Judge Peter G. Sheridan. (mmh)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 24 times.

                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?