United States v. CHAFFEE
Federal Civil Lawsuit Michigan Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:18-cv-11559

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 9, 2020 at 5:24 PM ST (5 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Pingping Zhang +1 202 305 2165 +1 202 514 5238 pingping.zhang@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo OTSEGO COUNTY, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cummings, McClorey, Davis & Acho, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Haider A. Kazim +1 231 922 1888 +1 231 922 9888 hkazim@cmda-law.com
No Logo RANDY J. CHAFFEE, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by RANDY J. CHAFFEE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space RANDY J. CHAFFEE
No Logo STATE OF MICHIGAN, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by MI Dept Attorney General (ENRA-Lansing)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Moshe Freedman +1 248 325 8544 +1 248 967 9471 freedmanM1@michigan.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Moshe Freedman +1 248 325 8544 +1 248 967 9471 freedmanM1@michigan.gov
Citation Section 26 U.S.C. § 7401
Nature of Suit 870 - Federal Tax Suits: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
  Entries (64) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 12/9/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Reconsideration
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 11/5/2020, Entered: None Response to Motion
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 11/5/2020, Entered: None Response to Motion
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 11/5/2020, Entered: None Reconsideration
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 10/30/2020, Entered: None Notice - Other
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 10/20/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 10/5/2020, Entered: None Dismiss
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 9/15/2020, Entered: None Judgment*
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 8/20/2020, Entered: None Order
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 8/12/2020, Entered: None Vacate
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 8/11/2020, Entered: None Order
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 4/21/2020, Entered: None Response to Motion
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 4/21/2020, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 3/20/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 2/18/2020, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 2/7/2020, Entered: None Dismiss
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 1/24/2020, Entered: None Withdrawal of Attorney
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 1/24/2020, Entered: None Appearance
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 1/8/2020, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 12/31/2019, Entered: None Response - Free
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 12/26/2019, Entered: None Objection to Report and Recommendation
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 11/8/2019, Entered: None Report and Recommendation
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/31/2019, Entered: None sur-reply
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/15/2019, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/10/2019, Entered: None Leave to File
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 7/9/2019, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/9/2019, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 6/4/2019, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/4/2019, Entered: None Requiring Responsive Pleading*
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/4/2019, Entered: None Requiring Responsive Pleading*
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/4/2019, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/31/2019, Entered: None Partial Summary Judgment
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/30/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Compel
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/22/2019, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/22/2019, Entered: None Compel
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/19/2019, Entered: None Lifting Stay*
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/29/2019, Entered: None Notice - Other
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/8/2019, Entered: None Stay
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/4/2018, Entered: None Notice - Other
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/3/2018, Entered: None Notice - other
                                                                                NOTICE of Fraud, Notice of Intent to Commit Fraud, with Affidavit by RANDY J. CHAFFEE (SOso) (Entered: 10/04/2018)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/4/2018, Entered: None Notice - Other
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/27/2018, Entered: None Notice - other
                                                                                    NOTICE of Personal Jurisdiction Challenge with Affidavit by RANDY J. CHAFFEE (SOso) (Entered: 10/04/2018)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      Verified Plan Statement of Facts filed by Randy Chaffee. (KCas) (Entered: 10/03/2018)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/27/2018, Entered: 9/27/2018 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                        SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 3/27/2019 Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 9/26/2019 Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia T. Morris. (Refer to image for additional dates) (SKra)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Defendant Randy Chaffee's "Exhibit 6203") (Zhang, Pingping) (Entered: 09/20/2018)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/27/2018, Entered: 8/27/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                            ORDER Requiring Rule 26(f) Meeting and Setting Date for Initial Rule 16 Conference.(TELEPHONIC Scheduling Conference set for 9/27/2018 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Patricia T. Morris) Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia T. Morris. (KCas)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/27/2018, Entered: 8/27/2018 Referring Pretrial Matters to Magistrate Judge*Court Filing
                                                                                              ORDER Referring All Pretrial Matters to Magistrate Judge Patricia T. Morris. Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (KWin)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/27/2018, Entered: None Answer
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/23/2018, Entered: None Answer
                                                                                                  ANSWER to complaint by RANDY J. CHAFFEE. (DPer) (Entered: 08/27/2018)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/22/2018, Entered: 8/22/2018 Answer
                                                                                                    ANSWER to Complaint Defendant State of Michigan, Department of Treasury's Answer by STATE OF MICHIGAN. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Notice of State Tax Liens) (Freedman, Moe)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re 7 Answer to Complaint by OTSEGO COUNTY (Kazim, Haider) (Entered: 08/17/2018)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/17/2018, Entered: 8/17/2018 Answer
                                                                                                        ANSWER to Complaint by OTSEGO COUNTY. (Kazim, Haider)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. RANDY J. CHAFFEE served on 7/30/2018, answer due 8/20/2018. (Zhang, Pingping) (Entered: 08/08/2018)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. STATE OF MICHIGAN served on 7/30/2018, answer due 8/20/2018. (Zhang, Pingping) (Entered: 08/08/2018)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. OTSEGO COUNTY served on 7/27/2018, answer due 8/17/2018. (Zhang, Pingping) (Entered: 08/08/2018)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Haider A. Kazim appearing on behalf of OTSEGO COUNTY (Kazim, Haider) (Entered: 08/01/2018)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  SUMMONS Issued for *RANDY J. CHAFFEE, OTSEGO COUNTY, STATE OF MICHIGAN* (NAhm) (Entered: 05/18/2018)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/17/2018, Entered: 5/17/2018 Civil Case - Complaint
                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA against All Defendants. No summons requested. No Fee Required - US Government. County of 1st Plaintiff: USA - County Where Action Arose: Otsego - County of 1st Defendant: Otsego. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Zhang, Pingping)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings before Magistrate Judge Patricia T. Morris: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 9/27/2018 (Court Reporter: None Present, Not on the Record) (SKra)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                        Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 4/26/2019 (SKra)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re 14 Scheduling Order on RANDY J. CHAFFEE at 1794 McGregor Road, Vanderbilt, MI 49795. (SKra)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re 11 Order Referring Pretrial Matters to Magistrate Judge on RANDY J. CHAFFEE, 1794 McGregor Road, Vanderbilt, MI 49795. (KWin)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re 12 Order on RANDY J. CHAFFEE at 1794 McGregor Road, Vanderbilt, MI 49795. (KCas)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (NAhm)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 6 times.

                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?