United States v. Steiner
Federal Civil Lawsuit Ohio Northern District Court, Case No. 5:18-cv-01180

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 15, 2020 at 2:21 PM DT (6.9 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Northern District of Ohio

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Suzana Krstevski Koch +1 216 622 3748 +1 216 522 4982 suzana.koch@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Julie A.K. Cummings +1 202 514 8031 +1 202 514 5238 julie.cummings@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Charles J. Steiner, Defendant
No Logo Constance M. Steiner, Defendant
No Logo Holmes County Treasurer, Defendant
No Logo Sharon Shepherd, Defendant
No Logo State of Ohio, Defendant
No Logo William Shepherd, Defendant
Citation Section 26 U.S.C. § 7401
Nature of Suit 870 - Federal Tax Suits: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
  Entries (27) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 10/15/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for disbursement/distribution
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 9/10/2020, Entered: None Disbursement/Distribution
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 7/21/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 7/17/2020, Entered: None Order
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 12/30/2019, Entered: None Order Appointing Master Commissioner and Order of Sale
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 12/5/2019, Entered: None Order
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 8/30/2019, Entered: None Default Judgment
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 3/18/2019, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 3/17/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 1/28/2019, Entered: None Extension (of deadlines)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 12/6/2018, Entered: None Order
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 11/6/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 11/6/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to attend by telephone
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 11/2/2018, Entered: None Attend by Telephone
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/31/2018, Entered: None Attend by Telephone
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 10/30/2018, Entered: None Attend by Telephone
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/30/2018, Entered: None Substitute Attorney
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/23/2018, Entered: None Case Management Conference Scheduling Order
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/27/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for order
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/5/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion To Quash
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/5/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Substitute Party
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/21/2018, Entered: None Substitute Party
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/17/2018, Entered: None Quash
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/2/2018, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/30/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/24/2018, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/22/2018, Entered: 5/22/2018 Complaint
                                                      Complaint against All Defendants.. Filing fee exempt. Filed by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons State of Ohio, # 3 Summons Charles J. Steiner, # 4 Summons Constance M. Steiner, # 5 Summons Holmes County Treasurer, # 6 Summons Sharon Shepherd, # 7 Summons William Shepherd) (Cummings, Julie)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                        Statistics

                                                        This case has been viewed 5 times.

                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                        Space
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                         
                                                        PlainSite
                                                        Sign Up
                                                        Need Password Help?