Irving v. Palmer
Federal Civil Lawsuit Michigan Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:18-cv-11617

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 3, 2019 at 3:32 PM DT (1.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit Assault Libel & Slander
  Entries (41) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 10/3/2019, Entered: None Dismissing Case - Stipulated Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 9/5/2019, Entered: None Appear*
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 8/28/2019, Entered: None Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 8/27/2019, Entered: None Order
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 7/23/2019, Entered: None Protective Order
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 6/10/2019, Entered: None Vacate
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 6/5/2019, Entered: None Appear*
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 3/20/2019, Entered: None Response to Motion
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 3/15/2019, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 3/14/2019, Entered: None Referring Motion to Magistrate Judge*
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 3/14/2019, Entered: None Objection - Free
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 3/6/2019, Entered: None Reconsideration
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 3/4/2019, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 3/4/2019, Entered: None Reference to Mediation Tribunal*
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 3/4/2019, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 2/28/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Compel
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 2/22/2019, Entered: None Referring Motion to Magistrate Judge*
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/29/2019, Entered: None Compel
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/14/2018, Entered: None Appear
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/14/2018, Entered: None Appear
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/26/2018, Entered: None Referring Other Matters to Magistrate Judge*
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/26/2018, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/11/2018, Entered: None Appearance
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/1/2018, Entered: None Memorandum Opinion and OrderCourt Filing
                                                OPINION and ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 3 Ex Parte MOTION for Permanent Injunction and Setting Scheduling Conference, ( Scheduling Conference set for 10/10/2018 at 10:00 AM before District Judge Gershwin A. Drain). Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (TMcg)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/27/2018, Entered: None Preliminary InjunctionCourt Filing
                                                  AMENDED ORDER Granting 3 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (JOwe)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/3/2018, Entered: None Reply to Response to motion
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/22/2018, Entered: None Answer
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/21/2018, Entered: None Answer
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/14/2018, Entered: None Response to motion
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/1/2018, Entered: None Hearing on Motion*
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/1/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/31/2018, Entered: None Appearance
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/26/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/19/2018, Entered: None Notice - other
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/18/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Alternate Service
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/11/2018, Entered: None Alternate Service
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/11/2018, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
                                                                          ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SERVE DEFENDANT WITH THE SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT, THE ORDER GRANTING TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER [#4], AND THE INSTANT ORDER [#6]. Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (TBan)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/29/2018, Entered: None Hearing on Motion*
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/29/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for TRO
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/24/2018, Entered: None Temporary Restraining Order
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/22/2018, Entered: None Civil Case - Complaint
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                    This case has been viewed 3 times.

                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                    Space
                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                     
                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                    Need Password Help?