City of Springfield, Missouri v. Purdue Pharma, L.P.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Missouri Western District Court, Case No. 6:18-cv-03167

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 10, 2019 at 4:55 AM DT (2.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Actavis Pharma, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Actavis PLC, Defendant
No Logo Actavis Inc., Defendant
No Logo ACTAVIS LLC, Defendant
Allergan PLC Allergan PLC, Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Cardinal Health 100, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Cardinal Health 108, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Cardinal Health 110, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Cardinal Health 113, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Cardinal Health 122, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Cardinal Health 132, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Cardinal Health 200, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Cardinal Health 201, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Cardinal Health 414, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Cardinal Health 5, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Caremark PCS, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Caremark Rx, L.l.c., Defendant
No Logo Caremark, L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo CaremarkPCS Health, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Cephalon, Inc., Defendant
Unknown Role, Acusphere, Inc.
No Logo CVS HEALTH CORPORATION, Defendant
No Logo Endo Health Solutions Inc., Defendant
No Logo Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Envision Pharmaceutical Services, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Express Scripts Holding Company, Defendant
No Logo Express Scripts, Inc., Defendant
No Logo H. D. Smith Wholesale Drug Company, Defendant
No Logo H. D. Smith, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Insys Pharma, Inc., Defendant
Insys Therapeutics, Inc. Insys Therapeutics, Inc., Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Johnson & Johnson, Defendant
Mallinckrodt Enterprises LLC Mallinckrodt Enterprises LLC, Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC Mallinckrodt LLC, Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC Mallinckrodt PLC, Defendant
McKesson Corporation McKesson Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Medtrak Services, LLC, Defendant
No Logo MIAMI-LUKEN, INC., Defendant
No Logo Noramco, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Optum Inc., Defendant
No Logo OptumRx, Inc., Defendant
Ortho-mcneil-janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Ortho-mcneil-janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., The, Defendant
Purdue Pharma LP Purdue Pharma LP, Defendant
PURDUE PHARMA, INC. PURDUE PHARMA, INC., Defendant
No Logo Riteaid Corp., Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd. Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Defendant
No Logo The Harvard Drug Group, LLC d/b/a Major Pharmaceuticals d/b/a Rugby Laboratories, Defendant
No Logo UnitedHealth Group, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "United Health Group Incorporated"
No Logo Wal-Mart Pharmacy Warehouse #45, Defendant
No Logo Wal-Mart Stores East, LP d/b/a Wal-Mart Pharmacy Warehouse #1, Defendant
No Logo Watson Laboratories, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Defendant
Unknown Role, Andrx Corp
No Logo City of Springfield, Missouri, plaintiff/appellant

Toggle Switch Represented by Turner, Reid, Duncan, Loomer & Patton

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey T. Davis +1 417 883 2102 +1 417 883 5024 jdavis@trdlp.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 367 - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/30/2018, Entered: 7/30/2018 MDL Conditional Transfer Order
MDL CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER, CTO-46, from Jeffery N. Luthi, Clerk of the Panel, transferring case to Ohio Northern to be included in MDL No. 2804. Signed on 7/27/18. Case electronically transferred. (James, Carrie)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/27/2018, Entered: 7/27/2018 waiver of service executed
    RETURN OF WAIVER OF SERVICE filed by City of Springfield, Missouri. Waiver sent to Noramco, Inc. on 7/11/2018, answer due 9/10/2018. (Davis, Jeffrey)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/19/2018, Entered: 7/19/2018 waiver of service executed
      RETURN OF WAIVER OF SERVICE filed by City of Springfield, Missouri. Waiver sent to Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. on 7/11/2018, answer due 9/10/2018. (Davis, Jeffrey)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/19/2018, Entered: 7/19/2018 waiver of service executed
        RETURN OF WAIVER OF SERVICE filed by City of Springfield, Missouri. Waiver sent to Endo Health Solutions, Inc on 7/11/2018, answer due 9/10/2018. (Davis, Jeffrey)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/17/2018, Entered: 7/17/2018 waiver of service executed
          RETURN OF WAIVER OF SERVICE filed by City of Springfield, Missouri. Waiver sent to McKesson Corporation on 7/11/2018, answer due 9/10/2018. (Davis, Jeffrey)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/16/2018, Entered: 7/16/2018 waiver of service executed
            RETURN OF WAIVER OF SERVICE filed by City of Springfield, Missouri. Waiver sent to H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Company on 7/11/2018, answer due 9/10/2018; H.D. Smith, LLC on 7/11/2018, answer due 9/10/2018. (Davis, Jeffrey)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/31/2018, Entered: 5/31/2018 Notice of MAPN
              NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: # 1 MAP General Order)(Siegert, Karen)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/30/2018, Entered: 5/30/2018 Complaint
                COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Jeffrey T. Davis on behalf of City of Springfield, Missouri. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-5795619. Service due by 8/28/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court.(Davis, Jeffrey) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/30/2018: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Siegert, Karen).
                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 12 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?