United States v. Kahler
Federal Civil Lawsuit South Dakota District Court, Case No. 4:18-cv-04060

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 30, 2019 at 5:46 PM DT (1.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jordan David Howlette +1 202 353 0553 +1 202 514 6770 jordan.howlette@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Jordan David Howlette +1 202 353 0553 +1 202 514 6770 jordan.howlette@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Alex L. Kahler, Defendant
No Logo Judith A. Kahler, Defendant
Citation Section 26 U.S.C. § 7401
Nature of Suit 870 - Federal Tax Suits: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/30/2019, Entered: None Judgment - Default
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/29/2019, Entered: None Proposed Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/29/2019, Entered: None Declaration
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/21/2019, Entered: None Declaration
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/21/2019, Entered: None Declaration
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/21/2019, Entered: None Memorandum in Support of Motion
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/21/2019, Entered: None Default Judgment
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/27/2018, Entered: 9/27/2018 Clerks Entry of Default*
                Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Alex L. Kahler, Judith A. Kahler. (MWT)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/27/2018, Entered: 9/27/2018 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                  AFFIDAVIT in Support re 5 MOTION for Entry of Default Against Alex L. Kahler and Judith A. Kahler filed by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Proofs of Service, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Active Duty Military Status Report for Alex Kahler, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Active Duty Military Status Report for Judith Kahler) (Howlette, Jordan)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/27/2018, Entered: 9/27/2018 Entry of Default
                    MOTION for Entry of Default Against Alex L. Kahler and Judith A. Kahler by United States of America. (Howlette, Jordan)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/7/2018, Entered: 8/7/2018 summons returned executed
                      SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Alex L. Kahler served on 7/30/2018, answer due 8/20/2018; Judith A. Kahler served on 7/30/2018, answer due 8/20/2018. (Howlette, Jordan)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/30/2018, Entered: 5/30/2018 Summons issued
                        Summons Issued as to Alex L. Kahler, Judith A. Kahler. Two electronic summons, one A085 form and one Rule 73 memo delivered to Plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery. (Attachments: # 1 Alex L. Kahler Summons, # 2 Judith A. Kahler Summons, # 3 AO85)(DJP)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/30/2018, Entered: 5/30/2018 Civil Cover Sheet
                          CIVIL COVER SHEET. (DJP)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document 1 Filed: 5/30/2018, Entered: 5/30/2018 Complaint (COURT USE ONLY)
                            COMPLAINT TO REDUCE FEDERAL INCOME TAX LIABILITIES AND CIVIL PENALTY LIABILITIES TO JUDGMENT filed by United States of America in shell case on 5/30/18. (DJP)
                              LREF

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 3 times.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?