Myers v. Mr. Cooper Mortgage, LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit North Carolina Western District Court, Case No. 3:18-cv-00283

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 11, 2019 at 2:09 AM EST (2.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit Real Property: Foreclosure
  Entries (12) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/13/2018, Entered: None Judgment-Clerk
CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated 9/13/2018. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(chh)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/13/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss/Failure to State a ClaimCourt Filing
    ORDER granting 7 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; affirming 10 Memorandum and Recommendations.. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 9/13/2018. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(chh)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/24/2018, Entered: None Memorandum and Recommendations
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/13/2018, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/17/2018, Entered: None Order Setting Response Deadline
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/16/2018, Entered: None Dismiss/Failure to State a Claim
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/16/2018, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/10/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for TROCourt Filing
                ORDER denying 4 Motion for TRO. The Clerk of Court is instructed to assign a United States Magistrate Judge as the referral judge in this action. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 7/10/2018. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(chh)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/5/2018, Entered: None Temporary Restraining Order
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/3/2018, Entered: None summons returned executed
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/31/2018, Entered: None Summons issued
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/31/2018, Entered: None Complaint
                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                          Statistics

                          This case has been viewed 8 times.

                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                          Space
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                           
                          PlainSite
                          Sign Up
                          Need Password Help?