Sparrow Fund Management LP v. Mimedx Group, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:18-cv-04921-PGG-KHP
District Judge Paul G. Gardephe, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 7, 2021 at 4:12 PM DT (2.3 weeks ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Sparrow Fund Management Lp, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nikolas S Komyati +1 212 425 9300 +1 212 425 9337 nkomyati@bressler.com
v.
No Logo John 1-10 Does, Defendant
MiMedx Group Inc. MiMedx Group Inc., Defendant
Petit, Parker H. Petit, Parker H., Defendant
Officially listed as "Parker H. Petit"
Unknown Role, Logility, Inc.
Office Foley Square
Filed 6/4/2018
Jury Demand None
Demand $100000000000
Nature of Suit 320 - Personal Injury: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity Action
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition
County NewYork
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
  Entries (263) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 237 Filed: 7/7/2021, Entered: None Memorandum & Opinion
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 7/6/2021, Entered: None Certificate of Service Other
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 7/6/2021, Entered: None Certificate of Service Other
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 7/2/2021, Entered: None Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 7/2/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Discovery
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 7/2/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Discovery
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 6/30/2021, Entered: None Discovery
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 6/30/2021, Entered: None Seal
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 6/29/2021, Entered: None Discovery
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 6/28/2021, Entered: None Response (non-motion)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 6/25/2021, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 6/24/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion to Seal
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 6/23/2021, Entered: None Discovery
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 6/23/2021, Entered: None Discovery
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 6/23/2021, Entered: None Seal
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 6/15/2021, Entered: None Notice of Filing Transcript
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 6/15/2021, Entered: None Transcript
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 6/11/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 6/4/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 6/3/2021, Entered: None extension of time
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 6/3/2021, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 6/3/2021, Entered: None Declaration in Support of Motion
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 6/3/2021, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 6/2/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 6/2/2021, Entered: None Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 5/28/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion to Compel
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 5/27/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 5/26/2021, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 5/25/2021, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 5/21/2021, Entered: None Compel
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 5/13/2021, Entered: None Memorandum & Opinion
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 5/6/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion to Seal
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 4/22/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 4/21/2021, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 4/19/2021, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 4/16/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Conference
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 4/14/2021, Entered: None Conference
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 4/12/2021, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 4/9/2021, Entered: None Response (non-motion)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 4/5/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Blank 173 Filed: 11/13/2020, Entered: 11/13/2020 Order on motion for extension of timeCourt Filing
                                                                                  ORDER terminating [167] Motion for Extension of Time (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker)(Text Only Order) (Parker, Katharine)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 4/2/2021, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 11/10/2020, Entered: 11/10/2020 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                                                                                      MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: [171] Status Report filed by Mimedx Group, Inc. ENDORSEMENT: The Court thanks the parties for this update. The parties shall file another joint status letter by no later than December 9, 2020 to update the Court on the progress of discovery and any issues that the parties are unable to resolve through the meet and confer process. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 11/10/2020) (mro)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 4/2/2021, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 11/9/2020, Entered: 11/9/2020 Status report
                                                                                          STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Mimedx Group, Inc...(Shapiro, Peter)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 3/31/2021, Entered: None Discovery
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Blank 170 Filed: 10/8/2020, Entered: 10/8/2020 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                              SCHEDULING ORDER EXTENDING DISCOVERY: Fact Discovery due by 5/31/2021. Expert Discovery due by 5/31/2021. Joint Status Letter due by 11/9/2020. The parties shall identify any discovery issues that have not been resolved through a meet-and-confer process. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker) (Text Only Order) (Parker, Katharine)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 3/31/2021, Entered: None Seal
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Blank  Status Conference
                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker: telephonic Status Conference held on 10/8/2020. AT&T Conference Line. (ca)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 3/18/2021, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Blank  Notice - other
                                                                                                      NOTICE TO COUNSEL: REMINDER of the telephonic Status Conference in scheduled for Thursday, October 8, 2020 at 11:30 a.m. Counsel is directed to call Judge Parker's teleconference line at the scheduled time. Please dial (866) 434-5269, Access code: 4858267 re: [166] Order.(ca)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 3/17/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document 169 Filed: 9/25/2020, Entered: 9/25/2020 protective orderCourt Filing
                                                                                                          CONFIDENTIALITY STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material...So Ordered. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 9/25/20) (yv)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 3/17/2021, Entered: None Response in Support of Motion
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 9/25/2020, Entered: 9/25/2020 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                              LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker from Katherine H. Parker dated September 25, 2020 re: Proposed Confidentiality Stipulation and Protective Order. Document filed by Mimedx Group, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Confidentiality Stipulation and Protective Order).(Shapiro, Peter)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 9/18/2020, Entered: 9/18/2020, Terminated: 11/13/2020 MOTION for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker from Adam S. Heder dated September 18, 2020. Document filed by Sparrow Fund Management LP..(Heder, Adam)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 3/11/2021, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document 166 Filed: 9/11/2020, Entered: 9/11/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    ORDER SCHEDULING TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE, A telephonic Status Conference in this matter is hereby scheduled for Thursday, October 8, 2020 at 11:30 a.m. Counsel is directed to call Judge Parker's teleconference line at the scheduled time. Please dial (866) 434-5269, Access code: 4858267. SO ORDERED., ( Telephone Conference set for 10/8/2020 at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 9/11/20) (yv)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 3/10/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 9/8/2020, Entered: 9/8/2020 Status report
                                                                                                                        STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Mimedx Group, Inc...(Shapiro, Peter)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 3/8/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 8/6/2020, Entered: 8/6/2020 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: [163] Letter filed by Mimedx Group, Inc. ENDORSEMENT: The court thanks the parties for the update. The parties shall file another joint status update on September 8, 2020. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 8/6/2020) (mro)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 3/2/2021, Entered: None Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 8/6/2020, Entered: 8/6/2020 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                JOINT LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker from Peter T. Shapiro dated August 6, 2020 re: Status Update Pursuant to Order dated June 8, 2020. Document filed by Mimedx Group, Inc...(Shapiro, Peter)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 3/2/2021, Entered: None Seal
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 162 Filed: 6/8/2020, Entered: 6/8/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    ORDER. The Court thanks the parties for the status update. The parties shall file another joint status update by August 7, 2020. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker) (Text Only Order) (Parker, Katharine)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 6/5/2020, Entered: 6/5/2020 Status report
                                                                                                                                      STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Mimedx Group, Inc...(Shapiro, Peter)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 2/12/2021, Entered: None Compel
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 4/20/2020, Entered: 4/20/2020 Answer to amended complaint
                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to [155] Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Mimedx Group, Inc...(Shapiro, Peter)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 2/12/2021, Entered: None Compel
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 4/20/2020, Entered: 4/20/2020 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                              RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Mimedx Group, Inc...(Shapiro, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 2/8/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 4/20/2020, Entered: 4/20/2020 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ariadne Anna Panagopoulou Alexandrou on behalf of Mimedx Group, Inc...(Panagopoulou Alexandrou, Ariadne Anna)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 2/8/2021, Entered: None Compel
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 157 Filed: 4/8/2020, Entered: 4/8/2020 Order on motion for discoveryCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                      ORDER terminating [153] Motion for Discovery; terminating [153] Motion for Conference (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker)(Text Only Order) (Parker, Katharine)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 4/8/2020, Entered: 4/8/2020 Interrogatories
                                                                                                                                                        FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES to MiMedx Group, Inc..Document filed by Sparrow Fund Management LP..(Heder, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 155 Filed: 4/6/2020, Entered: 4/6/2020 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                          FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending [1] Complaint, [6] Complaint, [152] Amended Complaint, against Mimedx Group, Inc. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Sparrow Fund Management LP. Related document: [1] Complaint, [6] Complaint, [152] Amended Complaint,..(Heder, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 1/25/2021, Entered: None Response (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 154 Filed: 4/6/2020, Entered: 4/6/2020 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 5/6/2020. Joinder of Parties due by 5/6/2020. Initial disclosures due 4/30/2020. Fact Discovery due by 11/30/2020. Expert Discovery due by 11/30/2020. Joint Status Report due by 6/5/2020. The parties are encouraged to utilize technology for discovery, such as video/telephonic depositions in light of the current pandemic. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker) (Text Only Order) (Parker, Katharine)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 1/22/2021, Entered: None Compel
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Pleading
                                                                                                                                                                  ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Adam S. Heder to RE-FILE Document No. [152] Amended Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected. Re-file the pleading using the event type Amended Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (pne)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 12/11/2020, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 4/3/2020, Entered: 4/3/2020, Terminated: 4/8/2020 motion for discoveryCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER MOTION for Discovery Case Management Conference addressed to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker from Adam Heder dated 04/03/2020., LETTER MOTION for Conference Case Management addressed to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker from Adam Heder dated 04/03/2020. Document filed by Sparrow Fund Management LP..(Heder, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 12/9/2020, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 4/3/2020, Entered: 4/3/2020 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                          FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR-FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending [6] Complaint against Sparrow Fund Management LP with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Sparrow Fund Management LP. Related document: [6] Complaint..(Heder, Adam) Modified on 4/6/2020 (pne).
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 151 Filed: 3/22/2020, Entered: 3/23/2020 Order Adopting Report and RecommendationsCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER for [140] Report and Recommendations, [116] Motion for Leave to File Document filed by Sparrow Fund Management LP. The R&R is adopted in its entirety. Sparrow's motion for leave to file an amended complaint (Dkt. No. 116) is granted in part and denied in part as set forth above. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 3/22/20) (yv)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 12/19/2019, Entered: 12/19/2019 response
                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE re: [143] Objection to Report and Recommendations . Document filed by Parker H. Petit. (Laney, Dan)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 12/19/2019, Entered: 12/19/2019 response
                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE re: [140] Report and Recommendations,, . Document filed by Sparrow Fund Management LP. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Heder, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 12/19/2019, Entered: 12/19/2019 Memorandum of Law in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: [143] Objection to Report and Recommendations . Document filed by Mimedx Group, Inc.. (Shapiro, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 12/3/2019, Entered: 12/3/2019 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response / ReplyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [144] Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. The Application is granted. SO ORDERED. Responses due by 12/19/2019 (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 12/3/2019) (jca)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 12/3/2019, Entered: 12/3/2019 Order on Motion for Leave to File DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [145] LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's Supplemental Objections to Report & Recommendations. The Application is granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 12/3/2019) (jca)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 12/2/2019, Entered: 12/2/2019, Terminated: 12/3/2019 Motion for Leave to file documentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's Supplemental Objections to Report & Recommendations addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Adam Heder dated December 2, 2019. Document filed by Sparrow Fund Management LP. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit A)(Heder, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 11/26/2019, Entered: 11/26/2019, Terminated: 12/3/2019 motion for extension of time to file response/replyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [140] Report and Recommendations,, addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Adam Heder dated November 26, 2019. Document filed by Sparrow Fund Management LP.(Heder, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 11/22/2019, Entered: 11/22/2019 Objection to Report and Recommendations
                                                                                                                                                                                            OBJECTION to [140] Report and Recommendations Document filed by Sparrow Fund Management LP. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Heder, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 11/21/2019, Entered: 11/21/2019 Opposition Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                              FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU (SEE [143] Objection) - OPPOSITION BRIEF re: [140] Report and Recommendations, . Document filed by Sparrow Fund Management LP. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Heder, Adam) Modified on 11/22/2019 (db).
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 11/21/2019, Entered: 11/21/2019 Objection to Report and Recommendations
                                                                                                                                                                                                OBJECTION to [140] Report and Recommendations Document filed by Mimedx Group, Inc.. (Shapiro, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 11/7/2019, Entered: 11/7/2019 Report and RecommendationsCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS AND OPINION AND ORDER re: [116] MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint . filed by Sparrow Fund Management LP. For the reasons set forth above, this Court respectfully recommends that Sparrow's Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint (Doc. No. 116) be GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Sparrows Motion should be granted to the extent it seeks to assert a malicious prosecution claim and defamation claim premised on Statements 1, 2, and 3 against MiMedx. Sparrow's Motion should be denied in all other respects. Objections to R&R due by 11/21/2019 (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 11/7/2019) (kv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 10/21/2019, Entered: 10/22/2019 Order on Motion for conferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [115] LETTER MOTION for Conference re: [112] Order Adopting Report and Recommendations, Set Deadlines, addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Adam S. Heder dated 4/12/2019. Document filed by Sparrow Fund Management LP. The Application is granted. So ordered. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion (Dkt. No. 115). (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 10/21/2019) (rjm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 138 Filed: 6/14/2019, Entered: 6/14/2019 Response to motionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker from Dan F. Laney dated 06/14/2019 re: [135] LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Document in Support of Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint addressed to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker from Adam S. Heder dated June 7, 2019. . Document filed by Parker H. Petit. (Laney, Dan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 6/13/2019, Entered: 6/13/2019 Response to motionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker from Peter T. Shapiro dated June 13, 2019 re: [135] LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Document in Support of Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint addressed to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker from Adam S. Heder dated June 7, 2019. . Document filed by Mimedx Group, Inc.. (Shapiro, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 136 Filed: 6/10/2019, Entered: 6/10/2019 Order on Motion for Leave to File DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [135] Letter Motion for Leave to File Document. The Court will accept Plaintiff's supplemental filing. Defendant may file a response (no more than 2 pages) by no later than June 14, 2019. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker)(Text Only Order) (Parker, Katharine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 6/7/2019, Entered: 6/7/2019, Terminated: 6/10/2019 Motion for Leave to file documentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Document in Support of Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint addressed to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker from Adam S. Heder dated June 7, 2019. Document filed by Sparrow Fund Management LP.(Heder, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE TO THE PARTIES OF TELEPHONE CONFERENCE: Counsel for the parties are directed to call Judge Parker's Chambers on Wednesday, June 12, 2019 at 9:30 a.m. with counsel for all parties on the line. Please dial 212-805-0234. re: [134] Scheduling Order. (ca)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 134 Filed: 5/30/2019, Entered: 5/30/2019 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 6/12/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 17D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker. (Parker, Katharine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  settlement conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker: Settlement Conference held on 5/30/2019. (ca)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 5/23/2019, Entered: 5/24/2019 Order on Motion for Leave to File DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER terminating [130] Letter Motion for Leave to File Document. The Court is in receipt of Plaintiff's request to file a sur-sur reply and will consider it when it decides Plaintiff's Motion to Amend. No further briefing on this Motion will be considered. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 5/23/2019) (rj)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 5/23/2019, Entered: 5/24/2019 Order on Motion for Leave to File DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER terminating [129] Letter Motion for Leave to File Document. The Court is in receipt of Defendant Petit's sur-reply and will consider it when deciding Plaintiff's Motion to Amend. The parties should refrain from making any additional filings in connection with this Motion. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 5/23/2019) (rj)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 5/23/2019, Entered: 5/24/2019 Order on Motion for Oral ArgumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER denying [128] Letter Motion for Oral Argument. The undersigned has been referred to handle all pretrial matters, including non-dispositive motions. Accordingly, the undersigned will be deciding Plaintiff's Motion to Amend the Complaint. Plaintiff's request for oral argument is denied. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 5/23/2019) (rj)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 5/23/2019, Entered: 5/23/2019, Terminated: 5/23/2019 Motion for Leave to file documentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Sur-sur Reply in Support of Motion for Leave to Amend addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Adam S. Heder dated 5/23/2019. Document filed by Sparrow Fund Management LP. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Proposed Sur-sur reply)(Heder, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 5/22/2019, Entered: 5/22/2019, Terminated: 5/23/2019 Motion for Leave to file documentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Sur-reply Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend the Complaint addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Dan F. Laney dated 05/22/2019. Document filed by Parker H. Petit. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Sur-reply Brief)(Laney, Dan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 5/17/2019, Entered: 5/17/2019, Terminated: 5/23/2019 Motion for Oral ArgumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER MOTION for Oral Argument addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Adam S. Heder dated May 17, 2019. Document filed by Sparrow Fund Management LP.(Heder, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 5/17/2019, Entered: 5/17/2019 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [116] MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint . . Document filed by Sparrow Fund Management LP. (Heder, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 5/3/2019, Entered: 5/3/2019 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [124] LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages and requesting clarification of Order (ECF No. 123). The Application is granted. Plaintiff's reply is due May 20, 2019. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 5/3/2019) (jca)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  ***Set/Reset Deadlines
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Set/Reset Deadlines: Replies due by 5/20/2019. (jca)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 5/1/2019, Entered: 5/1/2019 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Peter T. Shapiro dated May 1, 2019 re: Briefing Schedule. Document filed by Mimedx Group, Inc..(Shapiro, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 5/1/2019, Entered: 5/1/2019, Terminated: 5/3/2019 Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages and requesting clarification of Order (ECF No. 123) addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Adam S. Heder dated 5/1/2019. Document filed by Sparrow Fund Management LP.(Heder, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 5/1/2019, Entered: 5/1/2019 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: [118] Letter filed by Mimedx Group, Inc. ENDORSEMENT: The Application is granted. ( Responses due by 5/6/2019, Replies due by 5/20/2019.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 4/30/2019) (mro)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 4/29/2019, Entered: 4/29/2019 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: [116] MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint . . Document filed by Parker H. Petit. (Laney, Dan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 4/29/2019, Entered: 4/29/2019 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: [116] MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint . . Document filed by Mimedx Group, Inc.. (Shapiro, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 120 Filed: 4/18/2019, Entered: 4/18/2019 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court is in receipt of Plaintiff's letter dated today [ECF No. 119]. The Settlement Conference previously scheduled for May 30, 2019 remains scheduled. That date, as well as the date for pre-settlement submissions, have not been vacated. The deadline for filing of amended pleadings is vacated in light of Judge Gardephe's order setting the date for the filing of a motion for leave to amend. (Parker, Katharine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 4/18/2019, Entered: 4/18/2019 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker from Adam S. Heder dated April 18, 2019 re: requesting clarification of order. Document filed by Sparrow Fund Management LP.(Heder, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 4/18/2019, Entered: 4/18/2019 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Peter T. Shapiro dated April 18, 2019 re: Requesting that the Court So Order a Briefing Schedule for Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend. Document filed by Mimedx Group, Inc..(Shapiro, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 117 Filed: 4/15/2019, Entered: 4/15/2019 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [116] MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint . . Document filed by Sparrow Fund Management LP. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1)(Heder, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 4/15/2019, Entered: 4/15/2019, Terminated: 3/22/2020 Motion for Leave to file document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint . Document filed by Sparrow Fund Management LP.(Heder, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 4/12/2019, Entered: 4/12/2019, Terminated: 10/21/2019 Motion for ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER MOTION for Conference re: [112] Order Adopting Report and Recommendations,,,, Set Deadlines,,, addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Adam S. Heder dated 4/12/2019. Document filed by Sparrow Fund Management LP.(Heder, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 4/5/2019, Entered: 4/5/2019 Order on motion for discoveryCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [113] Letter Motion for Discovery. In light of Judge Gardephe's decision adopting my Report & Recommendation in part and dismissing all of the claims against Defendants, discovery is hereby stayed. The Court will discuss a discovery schedule with the parties if and when an amended complaint is filed. So Ordered. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 4/5/2019) (yv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 113 Filed: 4/4/2019, Entered: 4/4/2019, Terminated: 4/5/2019 motion for discoveryCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER MOTION for Discovery addressed to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker from Peter T. Shapiro dated April 4, 2019. Document filed by Mimedx Group, Inc..(Shapiro, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 112 Filed: 3/31/2019, Entered: 4/1/2019 Order Adopting Report and RecommendationsCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER adopting Report and Recommendation for [84] Report and Recommendations [46] Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Parker H. Petit, [44] Motion to Dismiss filed by Parker H. Petit, Mimedx Group, Inc. The Court adopts Judge Parker's R&R as set forth above. Defendants' motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim is granted. Defendant Petit's motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction is granted. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motions (Dkt. Nos. 44, 46). Any motion for leave to amend will be filed by April 15, 2019. The proposed Amended Complaint will be attached to the motion as an exhibit. SO ORDERED. (Amended Pleadings due by 4/15/2019.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 3/31/2019) (anc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 3/27/2019, Entered: 3/27/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Peter T. Shapiro on behalf of Mimedx Group, Inc.. (Shapiro, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 3/26/2019, Entered: 3/26/2019 Notice of Substitution of Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Substitution of Attorney. Old Attorney: David M. Pernini, New Attorney: Peter T. Shapiro, Address: Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP, 77 Water Street, Suite 2100, New York, New York, 10005, 212-232-1300. Document filed by Mimedx Group, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order to Substitute Counsel)(Shapiro, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 109 Filed: 3/1/2019, Entered: 3/1/2019 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Dan F. Laney dated March 1, 2019 re: Mr. Heders February 22, 2019 Letter. Document filed by Parker H. Petit.(Laney, Dan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 108 Filed: 3/1/2019, Entered: 3/1/2019 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 4/19/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 4/19/2019. Fact Discovery due by 6/28/2019. Expert Discovery due by 6/28/2019. Settlement Conference set for 5/30/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 17D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker. Pre-conference submissions must be received by the Court no later than May 23, 2019 by 5:00 p.m. Any party that wishes to file a motion for summary judgment shall file a pre-motion letter with the Hon. Paul G. Gardephe by no later than July 12, 2019 in accordance with Judge Gardephe's Individual practices. See http://www.nysd.uscourts.gov/judge/Gardephe. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 3/1/19) (yv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Telephone Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker: Case Management - Telephone Conference held on 2/28/2019. (ca)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 107 Filed: 2/27/2019, Entered: 2/27/2019 Order on Motion for conferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [105] Letter Motion for Conference. The Case Management Conference in this matter that is scheduled for Thursday, February 28, 2019 at 11:30 a.m. is hereby converted to a telephone conference. Counsel for the parties are directed to call Judge Parker's Chambers at the scheduled time with counsel for all parties on the line. Please dial 212-805-0234. So Ordered. (Telephone Conference set for 2/28/2019 at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 2/27/19) (yv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 2/26/2019, Entered: 2/26/2019 Order on Motion to withdraw as attorneyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [104] Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that John C. Matthews is granted leave to withdraw as counsel of record in the above referenced matter and that such withdrawal is effective immediately. SO ORDERED. Attorney John Charles Matthews terminated. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 2/26/2019) (kv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 2/26/2019, Entered: 2/26/2019, Terminated: 2/27/2019 Motion for ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER MOTION for Conference /appear telephonically at Case Management Conference addressed to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker from Nikolas Komyati dated 02/26/2019. Document filed by Sparrow Fund Management LP.(Komyati, Nikolas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 2/25/2019, Entered: 2/25/2019, Terminated: 2/26/2019 Motion to withdraw as attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for John C. Matthews to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Mimedx Group, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Pernini, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 103 Filed: 2/22/2019, Entered: 2/22/2019 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Adam S. Heder dated February 22, 2019 re: pending motions to dismiss. Document filed by Sparrow Fund Management LP.(Heder, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Notice Regarding Deleted Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number [103] Memo Endorsement. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. Duplicate of entry #102 (ca)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 102 Filed: 2/19/2019, Entered: 2/19/2019 Order on Motion for conferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [101] Letter Motion for Conference. APPLICATION GRANTED: Counsel is directed to email Judge Parker's chambers with a telephone where they can be connected to the courtroom on the day of the conference. APPLICATION GRANTED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 2/19/19) (yv) (Main Document 102 replaced on 2/19/2019) (yv).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 2/18/2019, Entered: 2/18/2019, Terminated: 2/19/2019 Motion for ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER MOTION for Conference /Requesting Permission to Participate by Telephone addressed to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker from Dan F. Laney dated 02/18/2019. Document filed by Parker H. Petit.(Laney, Dan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 100 Filed: 2/8/2019, Entered: 2/11/2019 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: [99] Letter re Case Management Conference Set for February 28, 2019 filed by Sparrow Fund Management LP. ENDORSEMENT: The initial case management conference in this proceeding will go forward on February 28, 2019 at 11:30 am in Courtroom 17D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 as scheduled. (Doc. No. 88). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 2/8/2019) (rj)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 2/7/2019, Entered: 2/7/2019 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker from Adam S. Heder dated February 7, 2019 re: Case Management Conference Set for February 28, 2019. Document filed by Sparrow Fund Management LP.(Heder, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 98 Filed: 2/1/2019, Entered: 2/1/2019 response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE re: [93] Objection to Report and Recommendations . Document filed by Parker H. Petit. (Laney, Dan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 97 Filed: 2/1/2019, Entered: 2/1/2019 response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY (SEE [98] Response) - RESPONSE re: [93] Objection to Report and Recommendations . Document filed by Parker H. Petit. (Laney, Dan) Modified on 2/4/2019 (db).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 2/1/2019, Entered: 2/1/2019 response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE re: [94] Objection to Report and Recommendations, [92] Objection to Report and Recommendations and Order on Motions to Dismiss. Document filed by Sparrow Fund Management LP. (Heder, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 2/1/2019, Entered: 2/1/2019 response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE re: [93] Objection to Report and Recommendations . Document filed by Mimedx Group, Inc.. (Pernini, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 1/18/2019, Entered: 1/18/2019 Objection to Report and Recommendations
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        OBJECTION to [84] Report and Recommendations on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Document filed by Parker H. Petit. (Laney, Dan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 93 Filed: 1/18/2019, Entered: 1/18/2019 Objection to Report and Recommendations
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          OBJECTION to [84] Report and Recommendations and Order on Motions to Dismiss Document filed by Sparrow Fund Management LP. (Heder, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 92 Filed: 1/18/2019, Entered: 1/18/2019 Objection to Report and Recommendations
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            OBJECTION to [84] Report and Recommendations on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Document filed by Mimedx Group, Inc.. (Pernini, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 1/2/2019, Entered: 1/2/2019 Consent OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CONSENT ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY, The substitution of attorney is hereby approved and so ORDERED. So Ordered. (Attorney William Weinreb; William Anthony Burck and Kaitlyn Michaud O'Connor terminated.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 1/2/19) (yv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 12/27/2018, Entered: 12/27/2018 Order on motion for extension of timeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [89] Letter Motion for Extension of Time. The Application is granted. SO ORDERED. (Objections to R&R due by 1/18/2019) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 12/27/2018) (jca)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: 12/21/2018, Terminated: 12/27/2018 MOTION for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File FRCP 72(b)(2) Objections addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Adam S. Heder dated 12/21/2018. Document filed by Sparrow Fund Management LP.(Heder, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 88 Filed: 12/20/2018, Entered: 12/20/2018 Order on Motion to continueCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [87] Letter Motion to Continue Initial Conference set for 2/28/2019 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 17D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker)(Text Only Order) (Parker, Katharine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 12/20/2018, Entered: 12/20/2018, Terminated: 12/20/2018 Motion to ContinueCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER MOTION to Continue January 15, 2019 Case Management Conference addressed to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker from DAVID PERNINI dated 12/20/2018. Document filed by Mimedx Group, Inc..(Pernini, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 12/18/2018, Entered: 12/18/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Dan Foster Laney, III on behalf of Parker H. Petit. (Laney, Dan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: 12/17/2018 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SCHEDULING ORDER: A case management conference is hereby scheduled for Tuesday, January 15, 2019 at 2:15 p.m. in Courtroom 17-D, United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York. SO ORDERED. (Case Management Conference set for 1/15/2019 at 02:15 PM in Courtroom 17D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 12/17/18) (yv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 12/14/2018, Entered: 12/14/2018 Report and Recommendations
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 12/4/2018, Entered: 12/4/2018 Order on Motion for Oral ArgumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER denying [81] Letter Motion for Oral Argument. Plaintiff's request (Doc. No. 81) that the Court hold oral argument on the pending Motions to Dismiss in this action is DENIED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 12/4/18) (yv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 11/30/2018, Entered: 11/30/2018 Notice of Substitution of Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Substitution of Attorney. Old Attorney: William Burck, William Weinreb and Kaitlyn O'Connor, New Attorney: Dan F. Laney, Address: Rogers & Hardin LLP, 2700 International Tower, 229 Peachtree Street NE, Atlanta, Georgia, USA 30303, (404) 420-4624. Document filed by Parker H. Petit. (Weinreb, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 11/9/2018, Entered: 11/9/2018, Terminated: 12/4/2018 Motion for Oral ArgumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER MOTION for Oral Argument re: motions to dismiss addressed to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker from Adam S. Heder dated 11/9/2018. Document filed by Sparrow Fund Management LP.(Heder, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 11/9/2018, Entered: 11/9/2018 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: [78] Letter Case management conference and motions to dismiss, filed by Sparrow Fund Management LP. ENDORSEMENT : The Case Management Conference in this matter previously scheduled for November 13, 2018 is hereby adjourned sine die in light of the pending motions to dismiss that have been referred to the undersigned and for which the Court does not require oral argument. So Ordered. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 11/9/18) (yv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 11/9/2018, Entered: 11/9/2018 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE: granting [77] Motion for Kaitlyn M. O'Connor to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The motion of Kaitlyn M. O'Connor for admission to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned action is GRANTED. So Ordered. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 11/9/2018) (js) Modified on 11/9/2018 (js).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 11/8/2018, Entered: 11/8/2018 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker from Adam S. Heder dated 11/8/2018 re: Case management conference and motions to dismiss. Document filed by Sparrow Fund Management LP.(Heder, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 11/8/2018, Entered: 11/8/2018, Terminated: 11/9/2018 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Kaitlyn M. O'Connor to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-15882828. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Parker H. Petit. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Kaitlyn M. O'Connor in Support of Admission to Practice Pro Hac Vice, # (2) Certificate of Good Standing, # (3) Proposed Order)(O'Connor, Kaitlyn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. [77] MOTION for Kaitlyn M. O'Connor to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-15882828. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (ma)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 11/5/2018, Entered: 11/5/2018 Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Case Management Conference proceeding held on 8/20/2018 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.(aea)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 11/5/2018, Entered: 11/5/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Case Management Conference held on 8/20/2018 before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Carole Ludwig, (212) 420-0771. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/26/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/6/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/3/2019.(aea)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 11/1/2018, Entered: 11/1/2018 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting [73] Motion for William D. Weinreb to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 11/1/2018) (rro)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 10/31/2018, Entered: 10/31/2018, Terminated: 11/1/2018 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for William D. Weinreb to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-15839107. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Parker H. Petit. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of William D. Weinreb in Support of Admission to Practice Pro Hac Vice, # (2) Certificate of Good Standing, # (3) Proposed Order)(Weinreb, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 10/31/2018, Entered: 10/31/2018 Amended Order Referring Case to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AMENDED ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Dispositive Motion (i.e., motion requiring a Report and Recommendation). Particular Motion: Dkt. Nos. 44 & 46. Referred to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker. Motions referred to Katharine H. Parker. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 10/31/2018) (anc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. [73] MOTION for William D. Weinreb to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-15839107. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (jc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 71 Filed: 10/26/2018, Entered: 10/29/2018 Consent OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CONSENT ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY, The substitution of attorney is hereby approved and so ORDERED. (Attorney David M. Pernini and John Charles Matthews terminated.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 10/26/18) (yv) Transmission to Attorney Services/Help Desk. Modified on 10/31/2018 (yv).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 10/26/2018, Entered: 10/26/2018 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [44] MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint for Failure to State A Claim. . Document filed by Mimedx Group, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Matthews, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 10/26/2018, Entered: 10/26/2018 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [46] MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . . Document filed by Parker H. Petit. (Burck, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 10/26/2018, Entered: 10/26/2018 Proposed Order for Substitution of Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PROPOSED ORDER FOR SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY. Document filed by Parker H. Petit. (Burck, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 10/26/2018, Entered: 10/26/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by William Anthony Burck on behalf of Parker H. Petit. (Burck, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 10/26/2018, Entered: 10/26/2018 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of Nathan Koppikar in Support re: [24] MOTION to Expedite Discovery on an Emergency Basis., [15] MOTION to Expedite Discovery on an Emergency Basis.. Document filed by Sparrow Fund Management LP. (Heder, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 10/26/2018, Entered: 10/26/2018 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of Adam S Heder in Support re: [24] MOTION to Expedite Discovery on an Emergency Basis., [15] MOTION to Expedite Discovery on an Emergency Basis.. Document filed by Sparrow Fund Management LP. (Heder, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 10/26/2018, Entered: 10/26/2018 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [24] MOTION to Expedite Discovery on an Emergency Basis., [15] MOTION to Expedite Discovery on an Emergency Basis. Plaintiff's Omnibus Reply in Support of its Motions for Expedited Discovery. Document filed by Sparrow Fund Management LP. (Heder, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 63 Filed: 10/22/2018, Entered: 10/23/2018 Order on Motion for Leave to File DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [61] LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Opposition to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State of Claim addressed to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker from Adam S. Heder dated 10/19/2018. Document filed by Sparrow Fund Management LP. Application granted. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 10/22/2018) (rjm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 10/22/2018, Entered: 10/22/2018 Notice of change of address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Adam S. Heder on behalf of Sparrow Fund Management LP. New Address: Harris Berne Christensen LLP, 15350 SW Sequoia Parkway, Suite 250, Portland, OR, US 97224, 503-968-1475. (Heder, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 61 Filed: 10/19/2018, Entered: 10/19/2018, Terminated: 10/22/2018 Motion for Leave to file documentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Opposition to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State of Claim addressed to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker from Adam S. Heder dated 10/19/2018. Document filed by Sparrow Fund Management LP. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit draft Supplemental Opposition Brief)(Komyati, Nikolas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 9/25/2018, Entered: 9/25/2018 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response / ReplyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [59] Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re [46] MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , [44] MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint for Failure to State A Claim addressed to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker from David M. Pernini dated September 24, 2018. Document filed by Mimedx Group, Inc., Parker H. Petit. (Pernini, David) APPLICATION GRANTED: Briefing deadlines extended. The Case Management Conference in this matter that is scheduled for Tuesday, October 30, 2018 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 17D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 is hereby rescheduled to Tuesday, November 13, 2018 at 10:00 a.m. (Replies due by 10/26/2018.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 9/25/2018) (jca)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  set/reset hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Set/Reset Hearings: Case Management Conference set for 11/13/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 17D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker. (jca)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  set/reset hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Set/Reset Hearings: Case Management Conference set for 11/13/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 17D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker. (jca)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: 9/24/2018, Terminated: 9/25/2018 motion for extension of time to file response/replyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [46] MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ., [44] MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint for Failure to State A Claim. addressed to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker from David M. Pernini dated September 24, 2018. Document filed by Mimedx Group, Inc., Parker H. Petit.(Pernini, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 58 Filed: 9/17/2018, Entered: 9/17/2018 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: [44] MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint for Failure to State A Claim. . Document filed by Sparrow Fund Management LP. (Heder, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 10/26/2018, Entered: None Consent OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CONSENT ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY, The substitution of attorney is hereby approved and so ORDERED. (Attorney David M. Pernini and John Charles Matthews terminated.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 10/26/18) (yv) Transmission to Attorney Services/Help Desk. Modified on 10/31/2018 (yv). (Entered: 10/29/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 9/17/2018, Entered: 9/17/2018 Order Striking Document from RecordCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER. In light of this Court's Order (Doc. No. 56) denying Plaintiff's request for an extension of the page limit for its Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Complaint for Failure to State a Claim, Plaintiff is directed to file a memorandum of law not to exceed 25 pages which shall replace the document filed at Doc. No. 52. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to remove ECF # 52 from the docket in this action. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 9/17/18) (yv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 9/17/2018, Entered: 9/17/2018 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER denying [55] Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. APPLICATION DENIED. So Ordered. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 9/17/18) (yv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: 9/14/2018, Terminated: 9/17/2018 Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages addressed to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker from Adam S Heder dated 9/14/2018. Document filed by Sparrow Fund Management LP.(Heder, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Note Regarding Stricken Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ***STRICKEN DOCUMENT. Deleted document number [52] from the case record. The document was stricken from this case pursuant to [57] Order Striking Document from Record,. (yv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: 9/14/2018 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: [46] MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . . Document filed by Sparrow Fund Management LP. (Heder, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: 9/14/2018 Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of Nathan Koppikar in Opposition re: [44] MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint for Failure to State A Claim.. Document filed by Sparrow Fund Management LP. (Heder, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: 9/14/2018 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re: [24] MOTION to Expedite Discovery on an Emergency Basis., [15] MOTION to Expedite Discovery on an Emergency Basis. . Document filed by Mimedx Group, Inc., Parker H. Petit. (Pernini, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Note Regarding Stricken Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ***STRICKEN DOCUMENT. Deleted document number [52] from the case record. The document was stricken from this case pursuant to [57] Order Striking Document from Record,. (yv) Modified on 1/23/2019 (yv).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 8/21/2018, Entered: 8/21/2018 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response / ReplyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [48] Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re [44] MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint for Failure to State A Claim., [15] MOTION to Expedite Discovery on an Emergency Basis., [48] LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [46] MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ., [45] Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion, [47] Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion, [44] MOTION to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 8/20/2018, Entered: 8/20/2018 Case Management ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker: Case Management Conference held on 8/20/2018 : See Transcript for details. A transcript of this proceeding is available by utilizing the attached order form. (ca)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 8/17/2018, Entered: 8/17/2018, Terminated: 8/21/2018 motion for extension of time to file response/replyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [46] MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ., [45] Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion, [47] Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion, [44] MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint for Failure to State A Claim. addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Adam S. Heder dated 8/17/18. Document filed by Sparrow Fund Management LP.(Heder, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 8/13/2018, Entered: 8/13/2018 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [46] MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . . Document filed by Parker H. Petit. (Pernini, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 8/13/2018, Entered: 8/13/2018, Terminated: 3/31/2019 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Document filed by Parker H. Petit.(Pernini, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 8/13/2018, Entered: 8/13/2018 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [44] MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint for Failure to State A Claim. . Document filed by Mimedx Group, Inc., Parker H. Petit. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Pernini, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 8/13/2018, Entered: 8/13/2018, Terminated: 3/31/2019 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint for Failure to State A Claim. Document filed by Mimedx Group, Inc., Parker H. Petit.(Pernini, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 8/9/2018, Entered: 8/9/2018 Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a conference proceeding held on 7/19/18 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 8/9/2018, Entered: 8/9/2018 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: conference held on 7/19/2018 before Judge John G. Koeltl. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Martha Martin, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/30/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/10/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/7/2018.(McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 7/20/2018, Entered: 7/20/2018 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SCHEDULING ORDER: A case management conference is hereby scheduled for Monday, August 20, 2018 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 17-D, United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York. SO ORDERED. Case Management Conference set for 8/20/2018 at 09:45 AM in Courtroom 17D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 7/20/2018) (ama)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 7/20/2018, Entered: 7/20/2018 Order Referring Case to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 7/19/18) (yv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 7/20/2018, Entered: 7/20/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER. This case will be referred to the magistrate judge for general pretrial. The response to the pending motions to expedite discovery is stayed until the magistrate judge sets a briefing schedule. The time to move against or answer the complaint is also stayed until Judge Gardephe resolves whether the case is related to 17-cv-7568 pending before him. If the case stays with this Court, the defendants should answer or move against the complaint within twenty one days following Judge Gardephe's resolution of the related case determination; the plaintiff shall respond to any motion twenty one days after the motion is filed; the defendants shall reply ten days after the plaintiff's response. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 7/19/18) (yv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 9/15/2018, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 52 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Judge John G. Koeltl is no longer assigned to the case. (jc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Case Accepted as Related
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:17-cv-07568-PGG-KHP. Notice of Assignment to follow. (jc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Pre-Motion Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John G. Koeltl: Pre-Motion Conference held on 7/19/2018. (Fletcher, Donnie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 7/18/2018, Entered: 7/18/2018 Order on Motion for conferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [36] Letter Motion for Conference. The July 19, 2018 conference can be a pre-motion conference. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 7/17/18) (yv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 7/18/2018, Entered: 7/18/2018 order on motion for miscellaneous reliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [31] Motion for Appear Telephonically. Application Granted. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 7/18/18) (yv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/17/2018, Entered: 7/17/2018, Terminated: 7/18/2018 Motion for ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from David M. Pernini dated 7/17/2018. Document filed by Mimedx Group, Inc..(Pernini, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/17/2018, Entered: 7/17/2018 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER ON MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting [34] Motion for David M. Pernini to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 7/17/18) (yv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/17/2018, Entered: 7/17/2018, Terminated: 7/17/2018 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for David M. Pernini to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15330241. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Mimedx Group, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, # (2) Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing, # (3) Text of Proposed Order)(Pernini, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. [34] MOTION for David M. Pernini to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15330241. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/16/2018, Entered: 7/16/2018 Order on motion for extension of timeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [30] Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Response is stayed pending the conference scheduled for 7/19/18. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 7/16/18) (yv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/16/2018, Entered: 7/16/2018 Statement of Relatedness
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 1:17-cv-07568. Document filed by Sparrow Fund Management LP.(Heder, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 7/16/2018, Entered: 7/16/2018, Terminated: 7/18/2018 motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION Appear Telephonically re: [29] Order for Initial Pretrial Conference, Letter request to appear telephonically. Document filed by Sparrow Fund Management LP.(Heder, Adam) Modified on 7/30/2018 (db).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/13/2018, Entered: 7/13/2018, Terminated: 7/16/2018 MOTION for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Second Motion for Expedited Discovery on Emergency Basis addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from John C. Matthews dated July 13, 2018. Document filed by Mimedx Group, Inc., Parker H. Petit.(Matthews, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/13/2018, Entered: 7/13/2018 Order for Initial Pretrial ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER: The conference scheduled for Monday, September 10, 2018, at 4:30pm is advanced to Thursday, July 19, 2018, at 3:00pm. SO ORDERED. (Initial Conference set for 7/19/2018 at 03:00 PM before Judge John G. Koeltl.) (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 7/12/18) (yv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/12/2018, Entered: 7/12/2018 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response / ReplyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [27] Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. APPLICATION GRANTED. SO ORDERED. Responses due by 8/31/2018. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 7/12/2018) (ne)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/12/2018, Entered: 7/12/2018, Terminated: 7/12/2018 motion for extension of time to file response/replyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Adam Heder dated July 11, 2018. Document filed by Sparrow Fund Management LP. (Attachments: # (1) email confirming agreement)(Komyati, Nikolas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/11/2018, Entered: 7/11/2018 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of Nathan Koppikar in Support re: [24] MOTION to Expedite Discovery on an Emergency Basis.. Document filed by Sparrow Fund Management LP. (Komyati, Nikolas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/11/2018, Entered: 7/11/2018 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [24] MOTION to Expedite Discovery on an Emergency Basis. . Document filed by Sparrow Fund Management LP. (Komyati, Nikolas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/11/2018, Entered: 7/11/2018, Terminated: 12/14/2018 Motion to Expedite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Expedite Discovery on an Emergency Basis. Document filed by Sparrow Fund Management LP.(Komyati, Nikolas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/9/2018, Entered: 7/9/2018 Notice of hearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF COURT CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 9/10/2018 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 14A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge John G. Koeltl. (anc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/3/2018, Entered: 7/3/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Adam S. Heder on behalf of Sparrow Fund Management LP. (Heder, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/2/2018, Entered: 7/2/2018 Order on motion for extension of timeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [19] Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Application Granted. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 6/29/18) (yv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  ***Set/Reset Deadlines
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 7/20/2018 (yv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/29/2018, Entered: 6/29/2018 Order on motion for extension of timeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [14] Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Application Granted. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 6/28/18) (yv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/29/2018, Entered: 6/29/2018, Terminated: 7/2/2018 MOTION for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Motion for Expedited Discovery on an Emergency Basis addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from John C. Matthews dated June 29, 2018. Document filed by Mimedx Group, Inc..(Matthews, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  ***Set/Reset Deadlines
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Set/Reset Deadlines: Mimedx Group, Inc. answer due 7/20/2018; Parker H. Petit answer due 7/20/2018. (yv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/27/2018, Entered: 6/27/2018 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE [13] Motion for Adam S. Heder to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 6/27/2018) (cf)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/27/2018, Entered: 6/27/2018 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Nathan Koppikar in Support re: [15] MOTION to Expedite Discovery on an Emergency Basis.. Document filed by Sparrow Fund Management LP. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1)(Komyati, Nikolas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 16 Filed: 6/27/2018, Entered: 6/27/2018 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [15] MOTION to Expedite Discovery on an Emergency Basis. . Document filed by Sparrow Fund Management LP. (Komyati, Nikolas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/27/2018, Entered: 6/27/2018, Terminated: 12/14/2018 Motion to Expedite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Expedite Discovery on an Emergency Basis. Document filed by Sparrow Fund Management LP.(Komyati, Nikolas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/27/2018, Entered: 6/27/2018, Terminated: 6/29/2018 MOTION for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to file Responsive Pleading addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from John C. Matthews dated June 27, 2018. Document filed by Mimedx Group, Inc., Parker H. Petit.(Matthews, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/26/2018, Entered: 6/26/2018, Terminated: 6/27/2018 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Adam S. Heder to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Sparrow Fund Management LP. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit of Adam Heder, # (2) Text of Proposed Order)(Komyati, Nikolas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. [13] MOTION for Adam S. Heder to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/25/2018, Entered: 6/25/2018 Affidavit of Service Other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Complaint, Summons, Civil Cover Sheet, Rule 7.1 Statement served on Parker H. "Pete" Petit on 6/8/2018. Service was accepted by Parker H. "Pete" Petit. Document filed by Sparrow Fund Management LP. (Komyati, Nikolas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/25/2018, Entered: 6/25/2018 Affidavit of Service Other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Complaint, Summons, Civil Cover Sheet, Rule 7.1 Statement served on MiMedx Group, Inc. on 6/8/2018. Service was accepted by Alexandra Hayden, Lawyer. Document filed by Sparrow Fund Management LP. (Komyati, Nikolas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/8/2018, Entered: 6/8/2018, Terminated: 6/8/2018 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Adam S. Heder to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15176266. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Sparrow Fund Management LP. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit of Adam Heder, # (2) Text of Proposed Order)(Komyati, Nikolas) Modified on 6/8/2018 (jc).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Notice Regarding Deficient Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. [10] MOTION for Adam S. Heder to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15176266. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificates of Good Standing from Supreme Courts of California and Oregon (our court does not accept state bar certificates). Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Attorney Affidavit - attach Proposed Order. (jc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/6/2018, Entered: 6/6/2018 Summons issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Parker H. Petit. (dnh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/5/2018, Entered: 6/5/2018 Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Parker H. "Pete" Petit, re: [6] Complaint. Document filed by Sparrow Fund Management LP. (Komyati, Nikolas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/5/2018, Entered: 6/5/2018 Summons issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Mimedx Group, Inc.. (pne)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/5/2018, Entered: 6/5/2018 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT against John Does 1-10, Mimedx Group, Inc., Parker H. Petit. Document filed by Sparrow Fund Management LP.(Komyati, Nikolas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Nikolas S Komyati to RE-FILE Document No. [5] Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason: the second party name following the name of the defendant in the 'To' field must include care of ('c/o') or 'via'. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pne)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Pleading
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Nikolas S Komyati to RE-FILE Document No. [1] Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reasons: party name was modified for defendant John Does 1-10 due to a typographical error; the name of the party is incorrect on the docket entry of Document No. [1]. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (pne)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Nikolas S Komyati. The party information for the following parties has been modified: Parker H. Petit, JOHN 1-10 DOES. The information for the parties has been modified for the following reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party name was entered in all caps; alias party name was omitted. (pne)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Case Designated ECF.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Case Designated ECF. (pne)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Case Designation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John G. Koeltl. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/4/2018, Entered: 6/4/2018 Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Parker H. "Pete" Petit, re: [1] Complaint. Document filed by Sparrow Fund Management LP. (Komyati, Nikolas) Modified on 6/5/2018 (pne).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/4/2018, Entered: 6/4/2018 Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Mimedx Group, Inc., re: [1] Complaint. Document filed by Sparrow Fund Management LP. (Komyati, Nikolas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/4/2018, Entered: 6/4/2018 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Sparrow Fund Management LP.(Komyati, Nikolas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/4/2018, Entered: 6/4/2018 Civil Cover Sheet
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Komyati, Nikolas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 1 Filed: 6/4/2018, Entered: 6/4/2018 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR -COMPLAINT against JOHN 1-10 DOES, Mimedx Group, Inc., Parker H. Petit. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-15150137)Document filed by Sparrow Fund Management LP.(Komyati, Nikolas) Modified on 6/5/2018 (pne).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 646 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?