Greydanus v. Benway
Federal Civil Lawsuit Idaho District Court, Case No. 2:18-cv-00248

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 11, 2019 at 7:44 PM DT (1.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 241
Nature of Suit Assault Libel & Slander
  Entries (13) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/11/2019, Entered: None USCA Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/10/2019, Entered: None USCA Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/22/2019, Entered: None USCA Scheduling Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/22/2019, Entered: None USCA Case Number
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/14/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appeal
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/14/2019, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/24/2019, Entered: None Judgment
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/24/2019, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/6/2018, Entered: None Memorandum DecisionCourt Filing
                  MEMORANDUM DECISION & ORDER Plaintiff's Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Dkt. 1 ) is GRANTED. Plaintiff's Complaint (Dkt. 2 ) is DISMISSED with leave to amend. Plaintiff may file an amended complaint within 14 days of the date of this Order curing the deficiencies noted above. If Plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint which resolves those deficiencies, this case will be dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/5/2018, Entered: None Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/5/2018, Entered: None Order of Conditional Filing
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/5/2018, Entered: None Complaint
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/5/2018, Entered: None application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis
                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                            Statistics

                            This case has been viewed 8 times.

                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                            Space
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                             
                            PlainSite
                            Sign Up
                            Need Password Help?