Tojo Sea Below, LLC v. Boat Lights US, LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit Florida Middle District Court, Case No. 3:18-cv-00731

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 4, 2019 at 6:57 AM ST (2.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Tojo Sea Below, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by abelbeanlaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Michael A. Abel +1 904 516 5486 mabel@abelbeanlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Daniel Kearney Bean +1 904 516 5423 +1 904 887 4277 dbean@abelbeanlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hill Kertscher & Pixley LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Martha Logan Decker +1 770 953 0995 +1 770 953 1358 mh@hkw-law.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Steven G. Hill +1 770 953 0995 +1 770 953 1358 sgh@hkw-law.com
v.
No Logo Boat Lights US, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Jeffrey S. Flanders, Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1338
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/17/2018, Entered: None *Order pdf
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/16/2018, Entered: None Notice of voluntary dismissal
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/8/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/16/2018, Entered: None Certificate of counsel
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/16/2018, Entered: None Appear - Pro Hac Vice
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/2/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/14/2018, Entered: 6/14/2018 Related case order and track 2 noticeCourt Filing
              NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 6/14/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Case Management Report form, # 2 Consent to US Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction letter and form)(MD)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/7/2018, Entered: 6/7/2018 Patent/Trademark report
                Patent Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (TMC)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/7/2018, Entered: 6/7/2018 Summons issued
                  SUMMONS issued as to Boat Lights US, LLC and Jeffrey S. Flanders. (TMC)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/7/2018, Entered: 6/7/2018 Complaint
                    COMPLAINT against Boat Lights US, LLC, Jeffrey S. Flanders with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number JAX028020) filed by Tojo Sea Below, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet)(TMC)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 3 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?