United States v. DeBacco
Federal Civil Lawsuit Ohio Northern District Court, Case No. 1:18-cv-01314

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 18, 2019 at 4:43 PM DT (2.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bradley Sarnell +1 202 307 1038 +1 202 514 5238 bradley.a.sarnell@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bradley Sarnell +1 202 307 1038 +1 202 514 5238 bradley.a.sarnell@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Thomas DeBacco, Defendant
Citation Section 26 U.S.C. § 7401
Nature of Suit 870 - Federal Tax Suits: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
  Entries (22) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/18/2019, Entered: None Consent Judgment
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/18/2019, Entered: None Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 3/13/2019, Entered: None Extension (Other)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/1/2019, Entered: None Order
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 2/27/2019, Entered: None Judgment under Rule 54(b)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/14/2019, Entered: None Extension (of deadlines)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/13/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to extend deadlines
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/13/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time-Other
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/7/2018, Entered: None Extension of Deadlines
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/7/2018, Entered: None Extension (Other)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/18/2018, Entered: None Case Management Conference Plan/Order
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/12/2018, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/27/2018, Entered: None Amend Complaint
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/23/2018, Entered: None Continue
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/23/2018, Entered: None Excuse Appearance
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/10/2018, Entered: None Case Management Conference Scheduling Order
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/9/2018, Entered: None Extension (answer complaint)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/24/2018, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Thomas DeBacco. (Attachments: # 1 Magistrate Consent Form) (W,Jo) (Entered: 06/11/2018)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/8/2018, Entered: 6/8/2018 Complaint
                                        Complaint against Thomas DeBacco.. Filing fee exempt. Filed by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons for Defendant Thomas DeBacco) (Sarnell, Bradley)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          Judge James S. Gwin assigned to case, (W,Jo)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr.. (W,Jo)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                              Statistics

                                              This case has been viewed 5 times.

                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                              Space
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                               
                                              PlainSite
                                              Sign Up
                                              Need Password Help?