Wagner v. Colonial National Mortgage
Federal Civil Lawsuit Florida Middle District Court, Case No. 8:18-cv-01386

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 11, 2019 at 3:26 AM EST (2.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 2201
Nature of Suit Real Property: Other
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/26/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Reopen Case
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: None Reopen Case
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: None Reconsideration
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/27/2018, Entered: None Affidavit
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/27/2018, Entered: None Extend Time
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/3/2018, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
            ORDER: Plaintiff Steven Wagner's Complaint (Doc. # 1 ) is DISMISSED. Wagner may file an Amended Complaint by August 3, 2018. Failure to do so will result in dismissal of this action without further notice. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 7/3/2018. (AHG)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/12/2018, Entered: None Order
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/12/2018, Entered: None Related case order and track 2 notice
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/11/2018, Entered: None Complaint
                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 2 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?