Kirk v. Allergan Sales, LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit Florida Middle District Court, Case No. 3:18-cv-00745

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 14, 2018 at 4:44 AM DT (2.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Belinda S. Kirk, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Terrell Hogan, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher Nemat Shakib +1 904 632 2424 +1 904 632 2027 shakib@terrellhogan.com
v.
Allergan Sales, LLC Allergan Sales, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Shook Hardy & Bacon LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian T. Guthrie +1 813 202 7100 +1 813 221 8837 bguthrie@shb.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer M. Voss +1 813 202 7100 +1 813 221 8837 jvoss@shb.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 367 - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/13/2018, Entered: None Stay
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/13/2018, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/12/2018, Entered: None Complaint
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/11/2018, Entered: None Complaint
        COMPLAINT against Allergan Sales, LLC with Jury Demand filed by Belinda S. Kirk. (Filed in State Court on 05/15/2018)(TMC) (Entered: 06/12/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/12/2018, Entered: None Notice of Removal
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/11/2018, Entered: None notice of removal
            NOTICE OF REMOVAL from the Fourth Judicial Circuit, in and for Duval County, case number 16-2016-CA-4048 filed in State Court on 06/16/2016. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number JAX028045 filed by Allergan Sales, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 2 - State Court Record, # 2 Exhibit State Court Docket Sheet as of 06/12/2018, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(TMC) (Entered: 06/12/2018)
              Request RequestSpace LREF

              Statistics

              This case has been viewed 2 times.

              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
              Space
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
               
              PlainSite
              Sign Up
              Need Password Help?