Hunter v. Purdue Pharma LP
Federal Civil Lawsuit Oklahoma Western District Court, Case No. 5:18-cv-00574

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 4, 2019 at 4:08 AM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Mike Hunter, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Nix Patterson & Roach LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Jeffrey John Angelovich +1 512 328 5333 +1 512 328 5335 jangelovich@npraustin.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Bradley Earl Beckworth +1 903 645 7333 +1 903 645 4415 bbeckworth@nixlawfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by OKLAHOMA OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Charlotte A Dillsaver +1 405 521 3921 +1 405 522 0669 abby.dillsaver@oag.ok.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Michael J Hunter +1 405 522 4390 +1 405 522 0669 mike.hunter@oag.ok.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Ethan A Shaner +1 405 522 3060 +1 405 522 0085 ethan.shaner@oag.ok.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by SUITE 101

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY V Glenn Coffee, II +1 405 521 3912 +1 405 521 2031 gcoffee@glenncoffee.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Whitten Burrage Priest Fulmer Anderson & Eisel

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Michael Burrage +1 405 516 7800 +1 405 516 7859 mburrage@whittenburragelaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Reggie N Whitten +1 405 516 7800 +1 405 516 7859 rwhitten@whittenburragelaw.com
v.
No Logo ACTAVIS LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gable Gotwals-OKC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Robert G McCampbell +1 405 235 5500 +1 405 235 2875 rmccampbell@gablelaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nicholas V Merkley +1 405 235 5500 +1 405 235 2875 nmerkley@gablelaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ashley E Quinn +1 405 235 5500 +1 405 235 2875 AQuinn@gablelaw.com
No Logo Actavis Pharma, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gable Gotwals-OKC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Robert G McCampbell +1 405 235 5500 +1 405 235 2875 rmccampbell@gablelaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nicholas V Merkley +1 405 235 5500 +1 405 235 2875 nmerkley@gablelaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ashley E Quinn +1 405 235 5500 +1 405 235 2875 AQuinn@gablelaw.com
Allergan PLC Allergan PLC, Defendant
No Logo Cephalon, Inc., Defendant
Unknown Role, Acusphere, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Gable Gotwals-OKC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Robert G McCampbell +1 405 235 5500 +1 405 235 2875 rmccampbell@gablelaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nicholas V Merkley +1 405 235 5500 +1 405 235 2875 nmerkley@gablelaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ashley E Quinn +1 405 235 5500 +1 405 235 2875 AQuinn@gablelaw.com
Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Odom Sparks & Jones PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Benjamin H Odom +1 405 701 1863 +1 405 310 5394
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Michael W Ridgeway +1 405 701 1863 +1 405 310 5394 ridgewaym@odomsparks.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY John H Sparks +1 405 701 1863 +1 405 272 5958 sparksj@odomsparks.com
Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Odom Sparks & Jones PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Benjamin H Odom +1 405 701 1863 +1 405 310 5394
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Michael W Ridgeway +1 405 701 1863 +1 405 310 5394 ridgewaym@odomsparks.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY John H Sparks +1 405 701 1863 +1 405 272 5958 sparksj@odomsparks.com
No Logo Johnson and Johnson, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Odom Sparks & Jones PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Benjamin H Odom +1 405 701 1863 +1 405 310 5394
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Michael W Ridgeway +1 405 701 1863 +1 405 310 5394 ridgewaym@odomsparks.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY John H Sparks +1 405 701 1863 +1 405 272 5958 sparksj@odomsparks.com
Ortho-mcneil-janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Ortho-mcneil-janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Odom Sparks & Jones PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Benjamin H Odom +1 405 701 1863 +1 405 310 5394
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Michael W Ridgeway +1 405 701 1863 +1 405 310 5394 ridgewaym@odomsparks.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY John H Sparks +1 405 701 1863 +1 405 272 5958 sparksj@odomsparks.com
PURDUE PHARMA, INC. PURDUE PHARMA, INC., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Crowe & Dunlevy, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Joshua D Burns +1 405 239 6681 joshua.burns@crowedunlevy.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Sanford C Coats +1 405 235 7700 +1 405 239 6651 sandy.coats@crowedunlevy.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Cullen D Sweeney +1 405 235 7721 +1 405 272 5201 cullen.sweeney@crowedunlevy.com
Purdue Pharma LP Purdue Pharma LP, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Crowe & Dunlevy, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Joshua D Burns +1 405 239 6681 joshua.burns@crowedunlevy.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Sanford C Coats +1 405 235 7700 +1 405 239 6651 sandy.coats@crowedunlevy.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Cullen D Sweeney +1 405 235 7721 +1 405 272 5201 cullen.sweeney@crowedunlevy.com
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gable Gotwals-OKC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Robert G McCampbell +1 405 235 5500 +1 405 235 2875 rmccampbell@gablelaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nicholas V Merkley +1 405 235 5500 +1 405 235 2875 nmerkley@gablelaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ashley E Quinn +1 405 235 5500 +1 405 235 2875 AQuinn@gablelaw.com
No Logo THE PURDUE FREDERICK COMPANY, INC., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Crowe & Dunlevy, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Joshua D Burns +1 405 239 6681 joshua.burns@crowedunlevy.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Sanford C Coats +1 405 235 7700 +1 405 239 6651 sandy.coats@crowedunlevy.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Cullen D Sweeney +1 405 235 7721 +1 405 272 5201 cullen.sweeney@crowedunlevy.com
No Logo Watson Laboratories, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gable Gotwals-OKC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Robert G McCampbell +1 405 235 5500 +1 405 235 2875 rmccampbell@gablelaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nicholas V Merkley +1 405 235 5500 +1 405 235 2875 nmerkley@gablelaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ashley E Quinn +1 405 235 5500 +1 405 235 2875 AQuinn@gablelaw.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit 367 - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
  Entries (56) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 8/3/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Remand to State Court
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 7/6/2018, Entered: None Entry of Appearance
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 7/6/2018, Entered: None Entry of Appearance
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 7/6/2018, Entered: None Reply to Response to motion
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 7/6/2018, Entered: None response in opposition to motion
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 7/5/2018, Entered: None response in opposition to motion
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 7/3/2018, Entered: None Response to Non-Motion
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 6/29/2018, Entered: None Notice - other
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 6/25/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for reconsideration
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 6/22/2018, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 6/22/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to appear pro hac vice
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 6/21/2018, Entered: None reply
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 6/21/2018, Entered: None Receipt
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 6/21/2018, Entered: None Receipt
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 6/21/2018, Entered: None response in opposition to motion
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 6/21/2018, Entered: None Entry of Appearance
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 6/21/2018, Entered: None Entry of Appearance
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 6/21/2018, Entered: None Entry of Appearance
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 6/21/2018, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 6/21/2018, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 6/20/2018, Entered: None Disclosure Statement - Corporate
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 6/20/2018, Entered: None Entry of Appearance
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 6/20/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 6/20/2018, Entered: None Reconsideration
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 6/20/2018, Entered: None Entry of Appearance
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 6/19/2018, Entered: None Entry of Appearance
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/15/2018, Entered: 6/15/2018 Order on Motion for Hearing
                                                      ORDER denying 14 plaintiff's Emergency Motion to Set an Expedited Briefing Schedule and Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Remand (as more fully set out). Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 6/15/2018. (ks)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/15/2018, Entered: 6/15/2018 Disclosure Statement - Corporate
                                                        DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Johnson and Johnson, Ortho-McNeil- Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc . (Ridgeway, Michael)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/15/2018, Entered: 6/15/2018 Order on Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                          ORDER granting 15, 16 and 17 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Bert L. Wolff, Sheila L. Birnbaum, and Mark S. Cheffo are admitted to practice before this Court for the limited purpose of participating in this case on behalf of defendants Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., and The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., provided counsel each submits an ECF registration form and files an entry of appearance, consistent with LCvR 83.4. Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 6/15/2018. (ks)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/15/2018, Entered: 6/15/2018 Response to motion
                                                            RESPONSE to Motion re 14 EMERGENCY MOTION to Expedite Briefing ScheduleEMERGENCY MOTION for Hearing re 13 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma LP, The Purdue Frederick Company Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Order in USDC, Middle District of Louisiana Case No. 3:17-CV-01766-JWD-RLB, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Order Regarding St. Ct. Coordination in ND Ohio Case No. 1:17-MD-2804-DAP, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Order in USDC WDOK Case No. 5:14-CV-00583-R, # 4 Exhibit 3 - Dkt. 13-Ex. 2 in USDC WDOK Case No. 5:14-CV-00583-R)(Coats, Sanford)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/15/2018, Entered: 6/15/2018 Entry of Appearance
                                                              ENTRY of Appearance by Benjamin H Odom on behalf of Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Johnson and Johnson, Ortho McNeil Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc (Odom, Benjamin)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/15/2018, Entered: 6/15/2018 Entry of Appearance
                                                                ENTRY of Appearance by Michael W Ridgeway on behalf of Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Johnson and Johnson, Ortho McNeil Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc (Ridgeway, Michael)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/15/2018, Entered: 6/15/2018 Entry of Appearance
                                                                  ENTRY of Appearance by John H Sparks on behalf of Ortho McNeil Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc (Sparks, John)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/15/2018, Entered: 6/15/2018 Entry of Appearance
                                                                    ENTRY of Appearance by John H Sparks on behalf of Johnson and Johnson (Sparks, John)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/15/2018, Entered: 6/15/2018 Entry of Appearance
                                                                      ENTRY of Appearance by John H Sparks on behalf of Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc (Sparks, John)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/15/2018, Entered: 6/15/2018 Disclosure Statement - Corporate
                                                                        DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc . (Sparks, John)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/15/2018, Entered: 6/15/2018 Entry of Appearance
                                                                          ENTRY of Appearance by John H Sparks on behalf of Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc (Sparks, John)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/15/2018, Entered: 6/15/2018 Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)
                                                                            MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Mark S. Cheffo Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1087-2720829 by Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma LP, The Purdue Frederick Company Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Request for Admission Pro Hac Vice - Mark S. Cheffo)(Coats, Sanford)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/15/2018, Entered: 6/15/2018 Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)
                                                                              MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Sheila L. Birnbaum Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1087-2720822 by Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma LP, The Purdue Frederick Company Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Request for Admission Pro Hac Vice - Sheila L. Birnbaum)(Coats, Sanford)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/15/2018, Entered: 6/15/2018 Appear Pro Hac Vice (ONE motion per attorney)
                                                                                MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Bert L. Wolff Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1087-2720817 by Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma LP, The Purdue Frederick Company Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Wolff Request for Admission)(Coats, Sanford)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/14/2018, Entered: 6/14/2018 Expedite
                                                                                  EMERGENCY MOTION to Expedite Briefing Schedule, EMERGENCY MOTION for Hearing re 13 MOTION to Remand to State Court by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Hearing Transcript, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Order Regarding State Court Coordination, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Case Management Order)(Burrage, Michael)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/14/2018, Entered: 6/14/2018 Remand to State Court
                                                                                    MOTION to Remand to State Court by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Stipulation, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Order, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Memorandum Opinion and Order, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Delaware Memorandum, # 5 Exhibit 5 - Plaintiff's Discovery Responses to Purdue, # 6 Exhibit 6 - Purdue's Motion to Dismiss, # 7 Exhibit 7 - Order of Motion to Dismiss, # 8 Exhibit 8 - NY Times Ad, # 9 Exhibit 9 - Coats E-mail, # 10 Exhibit 10 - Order Appointing Settlement Master, # 11 Exhibit 11 - Order of Special Discovery Master)(Burrage, Michael)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/14/2018, Entered: 6/14/2018 Entry of Appearance
                                                                                      ENTRY of Appearance by Nicholas V Merkley on behalf of Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc, Cephalon Inc, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc (Merkley, Nicholas)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/14/2018, Entered: 6/14/2018 Entry of Appearance
                                                                                        ENTRY of Appearance by Ashley E Quinn on behalf of Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc, Cephalon Inc, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc (Quinn, Ashley)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/14/2018, Entered: 6/14/2018 Entry of Appearance
                                                                                          ENTRY of Appearance by Robert G McCampbell on behalf of Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc, Cephalon Inc, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc (McCampbell, Robert)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/14/2018, Entered: 6/14/2018 Disclosure Statement - LLC
                                                                                            DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by Purdue Pharma LP . (Coats, Sanford)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/14/2018, Entered: 6/14/2018 Disclosure Statement - Corporate
                                                                                              DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by The Purdue Frederick Company Inc . (Coats, Sanford)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/14/2018, Entered: 6/14/2018 Disclosure Statement - Corporate
                                                                                                DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Purdue Pharma Inc . (Coats, Sanford)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/14/2018, Entered: 6/14/2018 Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                  ENTRY of Appearance by Cullen D Sweeney on behalf of Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma LP, The Purdue Frederick Company Inc (Sweeney, Cullen)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/14/2018, Entered: 6/14/2018 Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                    ENTRY of Appearance by Joshua D Burns on behalf of Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma LP, The Purdue Frederick Company Inc (Burns, Joshua)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/14/2018, Entered: 6/14/2018 Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                      ENTRY of Appearance by Sanford C Coats on behalf of Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma LP, The Purdue Frederick Company Inc (Coats, Sanford)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/14/2018, Entered: None Notice of Removal
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/13/2018, Entered: None notice of removalCourt Filing
                                                                                                          NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Cleveland County, case number CJ-2017-816 filed by Purdue Pharma Inc, The Purdue Frederick Company Inc, Purdue Pharma LP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Purdue Pharma Inc.s First Interrogatories, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Plaintiffs Responses to Purdue Pharmas First Interrogatories, # 3 Exhibit 3 - OxyContin Labeling, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Stipulation, # 5 Exhibit 5-Petition, # 6 Exhibit 6-Schumacher EOA, # 7 Exhibit 7-Affidavit of Service - Teva Pharmaceuticals, # 8 Exhibit 8-Affidavit of Service - Johnson & Johnson, # 9 Exhibit 9-Affidavit of Service - Purdue Pharma, Inc., # 10 Exhibit 10-Affidavit of Service - Cephalon, Inc, # 11 Exhibit 11-Affidavit of Service - Actavis LLC, # 12 Exhibit 12-Affidavit of Service - Actavis Pharma Inc, # 13 Exhibit 13-Affidavit of Service - Ortho-McNeil, # 14 Exhibit 14-Affidavit of Service - Purdue Pharma LP, # 15 Exhibit 15-Affidavit of Service - Purdue Frederick Company, # 16 Exhibit 16-Affidavit of Service - Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc, # 17 Exhibit 17-Affidavit of Service - Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., # 18 Exhibit 18-Affidavit of Service - Watson Laboratories, # 19 Exhibit 19-Stipulation, # 20 Exhibit 20-Purdue EOA, # 21 Exhibit 21-J&J EOA, # 22 Exhibit 22-Teva Defendants EOA, # 23 Exhibit 23-Defs' Motion for Protective Order, # 24 Exhibit 24-Defendants' Joint Mot. to Dismiss-Failure to State a Claim, # 25 Exhibit 25-Purdue Def. Mot. to Dismiss-Failure to State a Claim, # 26 Exhibit 26-Teva Defendants Motion to Dismiss - Part 1, # 27 Exhibit 27-Teva Defendants Motion to Dismiss - Part 2, # 28 Exhibit 28-Appendix to Teva Defendants Motion to Dismiss, # 29 Exhibit 29-Joint Motion to Stay - Part 1, # 30 Exhibit 30-Joint Motion to Stay - Part 2, # 31 Exhibit 31-Joint Motion to Stay - Part 3, # 32 Exhibit 32-Joint Motion to Stay - Part 4, # 33 Exhibit 33-Joint Motion to Stay - Part 5, # 34 Exhibit 34-Joint Motion to Stay - Part 6, # 35 Exhibit 35-Joint Motion to Stay - Part 7, # 36 Exhibit 36-Joint Motion to Stay - Part 8, # 37 Exhibit 37-Joint Motion to Stay - Part 9, # 38 Exhibit 38-EOA - Ben Odom, # 39 Exhibit 39-Janssen J&J Mot. to Dismiss-Failure to State a Claim, # 40 Exhibit 40-Plaintiff Resp. to Def. Motion for Protective Order, # 41 Exhibit 41-Order for Status and Case Mgmt Conf, # 42 Exhibit 42-Motion to Associate Counsel - Brody, # 43 Exhibit 43-State's 1st Omnibus Response, # 44 Exhibit 44-State's 2nd Omnibus Response, # 45 Exhibit 45-Summary Order, # 46 Exhibit 46-Motion to Associate Counsel - Reed, # 47 Exhibit 47-Order Admitting Stephen Brody to Practice, # 48 Exhibit 48-Order Admitting Reed to Practice, # 49 Exhibit 49-Motion to Associate Counsel - Cardelus, # 50 Exhibit 50-Order Admitting Jennifer D. Cardelus to Practice, # 51 Exhibit 51-Motion to Associate Counsel - Charles C. Lifland, # 52 Exhibit 52-Order Admitting Charles C. Lifland to Practice, # 53 Exhibit 53-Reply in Support of Mot. for Protective Order, # 54 Exhibit 54-Summary Order, # 55 Exhibit 55-Motion to Associate R. Ryan Stoll as Counsel, # 56 Exhibit 56-Order Admitting R. Ryan Stoll to Practice, # 57 Exhibit 57-Motion to Associate Patrick Joseph Fitzgerald, # 58 Exhibit 58-Order Admitting Patrick Joseph Fitzgerald to Practice, # 59 Exhibit 59-Reply in Support of Motion of Teva Def Motion to Dismiss, # 60 Exhibit 60-Defendants' Joint Reply-in Support of Mot. to Dismiss, # 61 Exhibit 61-Janssen Defendants Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, # 62 Exhibit 62-Def. Joint Reply in Support of Joint Mot to Dismiss-Preeemption, # 63 Exhibit 63-Purdue Defendants Reply in Support of Their Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, # 64 Exhibit 64-Motion to Associate Mark S. Cheffo as Counsel, # 65 Exhibit 65-Order Admitting Mark S. Cheffo to Practice, # 66 Exhibit 66-Order Allowing Withdrawal of Tracy Schumacher, # 67 Exhibit 67-Def. Mot. for Appointment of Discovery Master, # 68 Exhibit 68-Order on Motions to Dismiss and Motion to Stay, # 69 Exhibit 69-Certificate of Compliance With Discovery, # 70 Exhibit 70-States Motion for S.O. and Obj. to Discovery Master, # 71 Exhibit 71-EOA-Quinn, # 72 Exhibit 72-Answer of Watson Laboratories, Actavis fka Watson, # 73 Exhibit 73-Answer of Defendant Cephalon, # 74 Exhibit 74-Answer of Teva Pharmaceuticals, # 75 Exhibit 75-Answer of Janssen Pharmaceuticals and Johnson and Johnson, # 76 Exhibit 76-Answer of Purdue Defendants, # 77 Exhibit 77-Def. Opp. to Mot. for S.O. and Cross Mot. for S.O, # 78 Exhibit 78-Def. Reply in Support of Mot. for Discovery Master, # 79 Exhibit 79-Supp. to Def. Opp. to Mot. for S.O, # 80 Exhibit 80-Summary Order, # 81 Exhibit 81-Notice to Judge Balkman, # 82 Exhibit 82-Scheduling Order, # 83 Exhibit 83-Order Appointing Discovery Master, # 84 Exhibit 84-Motion for Appointment of Settlement Master, # 85 Exhibit 85-Summary Order-Hetherington Sworn in as Discovery Master, # 86 Exhibit 86-Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Settlement Master, # 87 Exhibit 87-Motion to Associate Hayden Adam Coleman, # 88 Exhibit 88-Motion to Associate Sheila L. Birnbaum, # 89 Exhibit 89-Order Admitting Sheila L. Birnbaum to Practice, # 90 Exhibit 90-Order Admitting Hayden Adam Coleman to Practice, # 91 Exhibit 91-Summary Order, # 92 Exhibit 92-EOA-Lloyd Nolan Duck, III, # 93 Exhibit 93-Motion to Associate Counsel - Andrew G. Pate, # 94 Exhibit 94-Order Admitting Pate to Practice, # 95 Exhibit 95-Entry of Appearance - Nicholas Merkley, # 96 Exhibit 96-Janssen and J and J Initial Witness Disclosures, # 97 Exhibit 97-Commission - Alford, # 98 Exhibit 98-Subpoena - Daniel Alford, # 99 Exhibit 99-Commission - FSMB, # 100 Exhibit 100 - Subpoena - FSMB, # 101 Exhibit 101 - Plaintiff's First Motion to Compel, # 102 Exhibit 102 - Certificate of Compliance With Discovery, # 103 Exhibit 103 - Protective Order, # 104 Exhibit 104 - Janssen Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's First Motion to Compel Discovery, # 105 Exhibit 105 - Purdue's Opposition to State's Motion to Compel and Purdue's Motion to Strike, # 106 Exhibit 106 - Teva Defendants' Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery, # 107 Exhibit 107 - Plaintiff's Notice of Parties' Agreement on Setlement Master, # 108 Exhibit 108 - State of Oklahoma's Objection to and Motion to Modify Protective Order, # 109 Exhibit 109 - Entry of Appearance - Lisa Baldwin, # 110 Exhibit 110 - Motion to Associate Paul A. LaFata As Counsel, # 111 Exhibit 111 - Order Admitting Paul A. LaFata as Counsel, # 112 Exhibit 112 - Motion to Associate Counsel - Harvey Bartle IV, # 113 Exhibit 113 - Order Appointing Settlement Master, # 114 Exhibit 114 - Order Admitting to Practice - Harvey Bartle IV, # 115 Exhibit 115 - Defendants' Response to State's Objection to and Motion to Modify Protective Order, # 116 Exhibit 116 - Order of Special Discovery Master on State's First Motion to Compel, # 117 Exhibit 117 - Purdue's Motion to Compel Production of Documents, # 118 Exhibit 118 - Plaintiff's Second Motion to Compel Discovery and Brief in Support, # 119 Exhibit 119 - Janssen Defendants Motion for Protective Order and to Quash Deposition, # 120 Exhibit 120 - Defendants' Response to State's Objection to and Motion to Modify Protective Order, # 121 Exhibit 121 - Agreed Qualified Protective Order for Protected Health Information, # 122 Exhibit 122 - Johnson and Johnson Defendants Objection to or Motion to Amend Special Master's Order on State's Motion to Compel, # 123 Exhibit 123 - Johnson and Johnson Def. Opp. to 2nd Motin to Compel, # 124 Exhibit 124 - Purdue Objection to Special Discovery Master's Order on State's Motion to Compel and Purdue's Motion to Strike - Part 1, # 125 Exhibit 125 - Purdue Objection to Special Discovery Master's Order on State's Motion to Compel and Purdue's Motion to Strike - Part 2, # 126 Exhibit 126 - Plaintiff's Opposition to Janssen's Motion for Protective Order and to Quash Depositions, # 127 Exhibit 127 - Plaintiff's Opposition and Motion to Strike Purdue's Motion to Compel Production of Documents As Moot, # 128 Exhibit 128 - Purdue's Joinder to the Janssen Defendants' Motion to Quash, # 129 Exhibit 129 - Purdue's Opposition to State's Motion to Compel 3230(C)(5) Depositions, # 130 Exhibit 130 - Teva Defendants' Objection to and or Motion to Amend Special Discovery Master's Order on Plaintiff's Motion to Compel, # 131 Exhibit 131 - Teva Defendants' Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Second Motion to Compel Discovery, # 132 Exhibit 132 - Letter from Hall Estill, # 133 Exhibit 133 - Order on State's Objection to and Motion to Modify Protective Order, # 134 Exhibit 134 - Notice to Take Videotaped Deposition - Stephen A. Ives, # 135 Exhibit 135 - Non-Party Stephen A. Ives' Objection and Motion to Quash Plaintiff's Subpoena for Deposition Testimony, # 136 Exhibit 136 - Motion to Associate Jonathan S. Tam as Counsel, # 137 Exhibit 137 - Entry of Appearance - Joshua D. Burns, # 138 Exhibit 138 - Order Admitting Jonathan S. Tam to Practice, # 139 Exhibit 139 - Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Objections to Order of Special Discovery Master on State's First Motion to Compel, # 140 Exhibit 140 - Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Objections to Order of Special Discovery Master on State's First Motion to Compel - Part 2, # 141 Exhibit 141 - Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Objections to Order of Special Discovery Master on State's First Motion to Compel - Part 3, # 142 Exhibit 142 - Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Objections to Order of Special Discovery Master on State's First Motion to Compel - Part 4, # 143 Exhibit 143 - Purdue's Motion to Quash and Motion for Protective Order in Response to State's Deposition Notice, # 144 Exhibit 144 - Motion to Associate Robert S. Hoff as Counsel, # 145 Exhibit 145 - Order Admitting Robert S. Hoff to Practice, # 146 Exhibit 146 - Orders of Special Discovery Master on April 19 2018 Motion Requests, # 147 Exhibit 147 - Plaintiff's Third Motion to Compel Discovery and Brief in Support, # 148 Exhibit 148 - Plaintiff's Fourth Motion to Compel Discovery and Brief in Support, # 149 Exhibit 149 - Motion to Associate Counsel David K. Roberts Pro Hac Vice, # 150 Exhibit 150-Order Admitting David K. Roberts to Practice, # 151 Exhibit 151-State's Opposition to Stephen A. Ives' Motion to Quash Deposition Subpoena, # 152 Exhibit 152-Plaintiff's Objection To and Motion to Modify Orders of Special Discovery Master, # 153 Exhibit 153-Teva Defendants Motion to Compel Discovery, # 154 Exhibit 154-Purdue's Response in Opposition to State's Motion to Compel Response to Interrog No. 2, # 155 Exhibit 155-Teva Defendants Response to Plaintiff's Third Motion to Compel, # 156 Exhibit 156-State's Opposition to Purdue's Motion to Quash and Motion for Protective Order, # 157 Exhibit 157-Motion to Amend Answers and Brief in Support, # 158 Exhibit 158-Purdue Resp. to State's Obj. to and Motion to Modify Order, # 159 Exhibit 159.1 PART 1 - State's Opposition to Motion to Compel, # 160 Exhibit 159.2 PART 2 - State's Opposition to Motion to Compel, # 161 Exhibit 159.3 PART 3 - State's Opposition to Motion to Compel, # 162 Exhibit 159.4 PART 4 - State's Opposition to Motion to Compel, # 163 Exhibit 160 - Settlement Master's Oath, # 164 Exhibit 161 - Orders of Special Discovery Master on May 17 2018 Motion Requests, # 165 Exhibit 162 - State's Response to Defendants' Motion to Amend Answers, # 166 Exhibit 163 - Entry of Appearance - Michael Ridgeway, # 167 Exhibit 164 - Non-Party Ashley Rice Feliciano's Objection and Motion to Quash Deposition Subpoena Duces Tecum, # 168 Exhibit 165 - Purdue Defendants and Non-Parties Tyler Bradley, Eric Wayman and Cullen Bryant Objections and Motions to Quash, # 169 Exhibit 166 - Teva Motion to Quash Subpoena to Jonathan Heil, # 170 Exhibit 167 - Teva Motion to Quash Subpoena to Rachel Gragg, # 171 Exhibit 168-Cleveland County Docket Sheet, # 172 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmt) (Entered: 06/14/2018)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/14/2018, Entered: 6/14/2018 Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                            ENTRY of Appearance by Michael Burrage on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Burrage, Michael)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/14/2018, Entered: 6/14/2018 Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                              ENTRY of Appearance by Reggie N Whitten on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Whitten, Reggie)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2720034. (Coats, Sanford)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 12 times.

                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?