City of Jacksonville v. Purdue Pharma L.P.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Florida Middle District Court, Case No. 3:18-cv-00751

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 6, 2018 at 11:48 AM DT (3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo City of Jacksonville, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by City of Jacksonville

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Jon Robert Phillips +1 904 630 1609 +1 904 630 1316 jphillips@coj.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of General Counsel

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Tiffiny Douglas Safi +1 904 630 1728 +1 904 630 1731 tsafi@coj.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Scott + Scott, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Donald A. Broggi +1 212 223 6444 +1 212 223 6334 dbroggi@scott-scott.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Joseph G. Cleemann +1 212 223 6444 jcleemann@scott-scott.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Judy Scolnick +1 212 223 6444 +1 212 223 6334 jscolnick@scott-scott.com
v.
No Logo ACTAVIS LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Brian Michael Ercole +1 305 415 3416 +1 325 415 3001 brian.ercole@morganlewis.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Steven Andrew Reed +1 215 963 5000 +1 215 963 5001 steven.reed@morganlewis.com
No Logo Actavis Pharma, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Brian Michael Ercole +1 305 415 3416 +1 325 415 3001 brian.ercole@morganlewis.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Steven Andrew Reed +1 215 963 5000 +1 215 963 5001 steven.reed@morganlewis.com
No Logo Actavis, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kirkland & Ellis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Timothy William Knapp +1 312 862 7426 +1 312 862 2200 tknapp@kirkland.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Jennifer Gardner Levy +1 202 879 5000 +1 202 879 5200 jennifer.levy@kirkland.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Martin Louis Roth +1 312 862 7170 +1 312 862 2200 martin.roth@kirkland.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Donna M. Welch +1 312 861 2441 dwelch@kirkland.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Brian Michael Ercole +1 305 415 3416 +1 325 415 3001 brian.ercole@morganlewis.com
No Logo Alec Burlakoff, Defendant
Allergan PLC Allergan PLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kirkland & Ellis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Timothy William Knapp +1 312 862 7426 +1 312 862 2200 tknapp@kirkland.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Jennifer Gardner Levy +1 202 879 5000 +1 202 879 5200 jennifer.levy@kirkland.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Martin Louis Roth +1 312 862 7170 +1 312 862 2200 martin.roth@kirkland.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Donna M. Welch +1 312 861 2441 dwelch@kirkland.com
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Reed Smith LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Sujey Scarlett Herrera +1 786 747 0200 +1 786 747 0299 sherrera@reedsmith.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Edward Maurice Mullins +1 786 747 0200 +1 786 747 0299 emullins@reedsmith.com
No Logo Anda, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Foley & Lardner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jessica Elizabeth Joseph +1 407 244 3276 +1 407 648 1743 jjoseph@foley.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Katy E Koski +1 617 502 3242 +1 617 342 4001 kkoski@foley.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY James W Matthews +1 617 502 3298 +1 617 342 4001 jmatthews@foley.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Jaclyn V. Piltch +1 617 342 4000 +1 617 342 4001 jpiltch@foley.com
Cardinal Health, Inc. Cardinal Health, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Brenna Maryann Egan +1 407 443 8879 EganBrennaM@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Williams & Connolly, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Enu Mainigi +1 202 434 5000 +1 202 434 5029 emainigi@wc.com
No Logo Cephalon, Inc., Defendant
Officer/Director, Acusphere, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Brian Michael Ercole +1 305 415 3416 +1 325 415 3001 brian.ercole@morganlewis.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Steven Andrew Reed +1 215 963 5000 +1 215 963 5001 steven.reed@morganlewis.com
No Logo Endo Health Solutions Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Arnold & Porter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Sean O. Morris +1 213 243 4000 +1 213 243 4199 Sean.Morris@arnoldporter.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Carlton Fields Jorden Burt, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Amy E. Furness +1 305 539 7253 +1 305 530 0055 afurness@carltonfields.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of RYAN Z. WATTS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Ingo W. Sprie, Jr. +1 212 715 1124 +1 212 715 1399 ingo_sprie@aporter.com
No Logo Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Arnold & Porter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Sean O. Morris +1 213 243 4000 +1 213 243 4199 Sean.Morris@arnoldporter.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Ingo W. Sprie, Jr. +1 212 715 1124 +1 212 715 1399 ingo_sprie@aporter.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Carlton Fields Jorden Burt, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Amy E. Furness +1 305 539 7253 +1 305 530 0055 afurness@carltonfields.com
Insys Therapeutics, Inc. Insys Therapeutics, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Holland & Knight, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY J. Matthew Donohue +1 503 243 2300 +1 503 241 8014 matt.donohue@hklaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY JOSEPH L. FRANCO +1 503 243 2300 +1 503 241 8014 Joe.Franco@hklaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY William Newton Shepherd william.shepherd@hklaw.com
Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Charles C. Lifland

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Charles Lifland +1 213 430 6000
No Logo John Kapoor, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by abelbeanlaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Michael A. Abel +1 904 516 5486 mabel@abelbeanlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Daniel Kearney Bean +1 904 516 5423 +1 904 887 4277 dbean@abelbeanlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nixon Peabody LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Brian T. Kelly +1 617 345 1000 bkelly@nixonpeabody.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Mark Knights +1 603 628 4027
No Logo Johnson & Johnson, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Charles C. Lifland

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Charles Lifland +1 213 430 6000
No Logo Joseph Rowan, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by att.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Eric Niles McKay +1 904 651 8256 +1 904 273 2661 eric@ericmckaylaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 600

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Denise H. Rowan +1 850 215 4155 +1 850 215 4158 drowan@dhrlegal.com
No Logo Karen Hill, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Delegal Law Offices, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Thomas A. Delegal, III +1 904 633 5000 +1 904 358 2850 tad@delegal.net
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY James C. Poindexter +1 904 633 5000 james@delegal.net
McKesson Corporation McKesson Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Clarke Silverglate, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Francisco Ramos, Jr. +1 305 377 0700 +1 305 377 3001 framos@csclawfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Spencer Hal Silverglate +1 305 377 0700 +3773 377 377 3001 ssilverglate@csclawfirm.com
No Logo Michael Babich, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by King & Spalding LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Joseph Sedwick Sollers, III +1 202 737 0500 +1 202 626 3737 wsollers@kslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Trombley & Hanes, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Phillip Matthew Luka +1 813 229 7918 mluka@trombleyhaneslaw.com
Ortho-mcneil-janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Ortho-mcneil-janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Charles C. Lifland

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Charles Lifland +1 213 430 6000
PURDUE PHARMA, INC. PURDUE PHARMA, INC., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Glenn A Gundersen

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Mark Steven Cheffo +1 212 849 7000 +1 212 849 7100 markcheffo@quinnemanuel.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Hayden A. Coleman +1 212 698 3500 +1 212 698 3599
Purdue Pharma LP Purdue Pharma LP, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Glenn A Gundersen

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Hayden A. Coleman +1 212 698 3500 +1 212 698 3599

Toggle Switch Represented by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Mark Steven Cheffo +1 212 849 7000 +1 212 849 7100 markcheffo@quinnemanuel.com
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Brian Michael Ercole +1 305 415 3416 +1 325 415 3001 brian.ercole@morganlewis.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Steven Andrew Reed +1 215 963 5000 +1 215 963 5001 steven.reed@morganlewis.com
No Logo THE PURDUE FREDERICK COMPANY, INC., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Glenn A Gundersen

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Mark Steven Cheffo +1 212 849 7000 +1 212 849 7100 markcheffo@quinnemanuel.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Hayden A. Coleman +1 212 698 3500 +1 212 698 3599
No Logo Watson Laboratories, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Brian Michael Ercole +1 305 415 3416 +1 325 415 3001 brian.ercole@morganlewis.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Steven Andrew Reed +1 215 963 5000 +1 215 963 5001 steven.reed@morganlewis.com
Citation Section 21 U.S.C. § 801
Nature of Suit 360 - Personal Injury: Other
  Entries (55) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 10/4/2018, Entered: None Multidistrict litigation out
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 9/4/2018, Entered: 9/4/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    ORDER denying 44 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's August 22, 2018 Order. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan on 9/4/2018. (SEJ)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 8/31/2018, Entered: 8/31/2018 response in opposition to motion
      RESPONSE in Opposition re 44 MOTION for Reconsideration of 43 the Court's August 22, 2018 Order filed by Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Michael Babich, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Karen Hill, Insys Therapeutics, Inc., McKesson Corporation, Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Joseph Rowan, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Silverglate, Spencer)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 8/31/2018, Entered: 8/31/2018 Notice - other
        NOTICE by McKesson Corporation of Filing in JPML, Opposition to Plaintiff's Statement on Oral Argument (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Silverglate, Spencer)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 8/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          ENDORSED ORDER directing Defendants to file a response to Plaintiff's 44, 45 motion for reconsideration by 8/31/18 at 5:00 P.M. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan on 8/27/2018. (SEJ) (Entered: 08/27/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 8/24/2018, Entered: 8/24/2018 Notice - other
            NOTICE of Filing Exhibit E to 44 MOTION for Reconsideration by City of Jacksonville (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit E: Orders Vacating Cond'tl Transfer Orders)(Scolnick, Judith) Modified on 8/27/2018 to edit text. (TMC)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 8/24/2018, Entered: 8/24/2018 Reconsideration
              MOTION for Reconsideration of 43 the Court's August 22, 2018 Order, by City of Jacksonville. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A: August Transfer Order, # 2 Exhibit B: June Transfer Order, # 3 Exhibit C: April Transfer Order, # 4 Exhibit D: December Transfer Order, # 5 Exhibit F: Notice of Hearing Session, # 6 Exhibit G: Statement)(Scolnick, Judith) Modified on 8/27/2018 to edit text. (TMC)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 8/22/2018, Entered: 8/22/2018 Order on Motion to stayCourt Filing
                ORDER deferring ruling on 19 and 36 Plaintiff's motions to remand; finding as moot 32 Defendants' Joint Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to MDL. A conditional hearing on Plaintiff's motions to remand is set for October 24, 2018 at 10:00 A.M. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan on 8/22/2018. (SEJ)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 8/21/2018, Entered: 8/21/2018 Memorandum in opposition
                  MEMORANDUM in opposition re 36 Motion to Remand to State Court filed by Actavis Pharma, Inc.. (Ercole, Brian)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 8/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                    ENDORSED ORDER granting 40 Moving Defendants' Joint Motion for Leave to File Reply on Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to MDL. Defendants shall file a reply of no more than 5 pages by 8/29/18. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan on 8/21/2018. (SEJ) (Entered: 08/21/2018)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 8/20/2018, Entered: 8/20/2018 Leave to File Document
                      Joint MOTION for leave to file Reply to 32 Motion to Stay, by Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Michael Babich, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Karen Hill, Insys Therapeutics, Inc., McKesson Corporation, Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Joseph Rowan, The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc.. (Silverglate, Spencer) Modified on 8/21/2018 to create docket entry relationship and edit text. (TMC)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 8/9/2018, Entered: 8/9/2018 response in opposition to motion
                        RESPONSE in Opposition re 32 Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to MultiDistrict Litigation filed by City of Jacksonville. (Scolnick, Judith)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 8/9/2018, Entered: 8/9/2018 Reply to Response to motion
                          REPLY to Response to Motion re 19 MOTION to remand to State Court filed by City of Jacksonville. (Scolnick, Judith)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 8/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                            ENDORSED ORDER granting 34 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File a Reply Brief. Plaintiff shall file its reply of no more than 8 pages by 8/24/18. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan on 8/7/2018. (SEJ) (Entered: 08/07/2018)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 8/7/2018, Entered: 8/7/2018 Remand to State Court
                              MOTION to Remand to State Court re 22 NOTICE by City of Jacksonville (Scolnick, Judith). Modified on 8/7/2018 to create docket entry relationship and edit text (JSG).
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 8/6/2018, Entered: 8/6/2018 Remand to State Court
                                MOTION to remand to State Court by City of Jacksonville. (Scolnick, Judith) Modified on 8/7/2018 - document filed in error per counsel (JSG).
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 8/3/2018, Entered: 8/3/2018 Leave to File Document
                                  MOTION for Leave to File Reply to 31 RESPONSE in Opposition to 19 MOTION to remand by City of Jacksonville (Scolnick, Judith). Modified on 8/6/2018 to edit text and docket entry relationship (JSG).
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 8/3/2018, Entered: 8/3/2018 supplement
                                    SECOND SUPPLEMENT re 19 MOTION to remand to State Court by City of Jacksonville (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Safi, Tiffiny). Modified on 8/6/2018 to edit text and to notify counsel to use correct case number on future pleadings (JSG).
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/31/2018, Entered: 7/31/2018 Stay
                                      Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to MultiDistrict Litigation, by Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Michael Babich, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Karen Hill, Insys Therapeutics, Inc., McKesson Corporation, Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Joseph Rowan, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Silverglate, Spencer) Modified on 8/1/2018 to edit text. (TMC)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 7/31/2018, Entered: 7/31/2018 Response to motion
                                        RESPONSE in Opposition to 19 MOTION to remand to State Court Certain Defendants' Omnibus Brief in Opposition filed by Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Michael Babich, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Karen Hill, McKesson Corporation, Joseph Rowan, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit CTO-41, # 2 Exhibit Statement of Interest of US)(Silverglate, Spencer) Modified on 8/1/2018 to edit text. (TMC)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/20/2018, Entered: 7/20/2018 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                          ORDER granting 27, 28, 29, the plaintiff's unopposed motions asking the Court to allow Donald Groggi, Joseph Cleemann, and Judith Scolnick to specially appear to represent it in this case and directing them to expeditiously register with the Court's electronic case filing (ECF) system by completing the E-Filer Registration Form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale on 7/20/2018. (ASL)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/19/2018, Entered: 7/19/2018 Appear - Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                            Unopposed MOTION for Judith Scolnick to appear pro hac vice by City of Jacksonville. (Safi, Tiffiny) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale.
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/19/2018, Entered: 7/19/2018 Appear - Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                              Unopposed MOTION for Joseph Cleemann to appear pro hac vice by City of Jacksonville. (Safi, Tiffiny) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale.
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/19/2018, Entered: 7/19/2018 Appear - Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                Unopposed MOTION for Donald Broggi to appear pro hac vice by City of Jacksonville. (Safi, Tiffiny) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale.
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/18/2018, Entered: 7/18/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica Elizabeth Joseph on behalf of Anda, Inc. (Joseph, Jessica)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/11/2018, Entered: 7/11/2018 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER granting 24 Sean Morris's unopposed motion asking the Court to allow him to specially appear to represent Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and Endo Health Solutions, Inc., and directing him to expeditiously register with the Court's electronic case filing (ECF) system by completing the E-Filer Registration Form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale on 7/11/2018. (ASL)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/6/2018, Entered: 7/6/2018 Appear - Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Sean O. Morris to appear pro hac vice by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Furness, Amy) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale. Modified on 7/9/2018 - counsel notified of correct case caption and case number for future pleadings. (TMC)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/6/2018, Entered: 7/6/2018 supplement
                                                        SUPPLEMENT re 19 MOTION to remand to State Court by City of Jacksonville. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Safi, Tiffiny)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/6/2018, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/5/2018, Entered: None Notice - other
                                                            NOTICE by Actavis Pharma, Inc. re 1 Notice of Removal Joinder In And Supplement To Notice Of Removal (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Ercole, Brian) (Entered: 07/05/2018)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/5/2018, Entered: 7/5/2018 *Order pdfCourt Filing
                                                              ORDER granting 14, 15, 16, 18, and 20 Defendants' motions for extensions, to the extent that Defendants need not respond to the complaint until further Order of this Court. To the extent any deadline has previously been set by the United States Magistrate Judge for Defendants to respond to the complaint, those deadlines are VACATED. Defendants shall file a single, omnibus response to the motion to remand by July 31, 2018. Other than the deadlines set in this Order, the Court STAYS all deadlines, including pretrial compliance deadlines, pending further Order. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan on 7/5/2018. (SEJ)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/29/2018, Entered: 6/29/2018 Extension of Time to File AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 2 Complaint by Defendants Purdue Pharma L.P; Purdue Pharma Inc.; The Purdue Frederick Company Inc.; Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.; Cephalon, Inc.; Johnson & Johnson; Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. N/K/A Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; Endo Health Solutions Inc.; Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.; Allergan plc F/K/A Actavis plc ; Actavis, Inc. F/K/A Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; Watson Laboratories, Inc.; Actavis LLC; Actavis Pharma, Inc. F/K/A Watson Pharma, Inc.; Insys Therapeutics, Inc., and Anda, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ercole, Brian) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale. Modified on 7/2/2018 to correct filing defendants. Counsel notified of correct case caption and case number for future pleadings. (TMC)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/29/2018, Entered: 6/29/2018 Remand to State Court
                                                                  MOTION to remand to State Court by City of Jacksonville. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K)(Safi, Tiffiny)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/29/2018, Entered: 6/29/2018 Extension of Time to File
                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to 2 Complaint by Michael Babich. (Luka, Philip) Modified on 7/2/2018 to create docket entry relationship. (TMC)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/29/2018, Entered: 6/29/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Philip Matthew Luka on behalf of Michael Babich (Luka, Philip)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/28/2018, Entered: 6/28/2018 Extension of Time to File AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                        Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Joseph Rowan. (McKay, Eric) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale.
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/28/2018, Entered: 6/28/2018 Extension of Time to File Response/ReplyCourt Filing
                                                                          Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 2 Complaint by Karen Hill. (Delegal, Thomas) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale.
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/26/2018, Entered: 6/26/2018 Extension of Time to File Response/ReplyCourt Filing
                                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 2 Complaint filed Jointly with Cardinal Health, Inc. and AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation by McKesson Corporation. (Silverglate, Spencer) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale. Modified on 6/27/2018 - counsel contacted regarding correct case caption and case number for all future pleadings. (TMC)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/25/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                              ENDORSED ORDER directing defendant Joseph Rowan by June 29, 2018, to supplement 6 the motion for extension, 11 as supplemented, with a certificate required by Local Rule 3.01(g). Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale on 6/25/2018. (ASL) (Entered: 06/25/2018)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                ENDORSED ORDER granting 10 defendant Karen Hill's unopposed motion for an extension of time to respond to 2 the complaint. Ms. Hill must respond to the complaint by June 29, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale on 6/22/2018. (KNR) (Entered: 06/22/2018)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/22/2018, Entered: 6/22/2018 response
                                                                                  SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF in Support of 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 2 Complaint, filed by Joseph Rowan. (Rowan, Denise) Modified on 6/22/2018 to edit text as to docket entry event type. Counsel notified regarding correct case caption and use of federal court case number on all future pleadings. (TMC)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/21/2018, Entered: 6/21/2018 Extension of Time to File Response/ReplyCourt Filing
                                                                                    Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 2 Complaint by Karen Hill. (Delegal, Thomas) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale.
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                      ENDORSED ORDER granting 5 John Kapoor's unopposed motion for an extension of time to respond to 2 the complaint, as supplemented under Local Rule 4.02 by 7 the memorandum of law. Mr. Kapoor must respond to the complaint by July 16, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale on 6/20/2018. (KNR) (Entered: 06/20/2018)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                        ENDORSED ORDER granting 4 the consent motion for an extension of time to respond to 2 the complaint. The movants must respond to the complaint by June 29, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale on 6/20/2018. (KNR) (Entered: 06/20/2018)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/19/2018, Entered: 6/19/2018 Memorandum In Support
                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in support re 5 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by John Kapoor. (Bean, Daniel) Modified on 6/20/2018 - counsel contacted regarding use of full, correct case number on all future pleadings. (TMC)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/19/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/12/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/ReplyCourt Filing
                                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 2 Complaint by Joseph Rowan. (Filed in State Court on 06/07/2018) (TMC) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale. (Entered: 06/19/2018)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/19/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/12/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/ReplyCourt Filing
                                                                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 2 Complaint by John Kapoor. (Filed in State Court on 05/31/2018) (TMC) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale. (Entered: 06/19/2018)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/18/2018, Entered: 6/18/2018 Extension of Time to File AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                                    Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 2 Complaint by Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc.. (Ercole, Brian) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale.
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/18/2018, Entered: 6/18/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                      NOTICE by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation re 1 Notice of Removal DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF FILING ALL PLEADING, MOTIONS AND PAPERS FILED IN THE CITY OF JACKSONVILLE V. PURDUE PHARMA, L.P., ET AL., FOURTH JUDICIAL CIRCUIT, IN AND FOR DUVAL COUNTY, FLORIDA (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Herrera, Sujey)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/14/2018, Entered: None Complaint
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/12/2018, Entered: None Complaint
                                                                                                          COMPLAINT against Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Allergan PLC, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Anda, Inc., Michael Babich, Alec Burlakoff, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Karen Hill, Insys Therapeutics, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, John Kapoor, McKesson Corporation, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Joseph Rowan, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. with Jury Demand filed by City of Jacksonville. (Filed in State Court on 02/27/2018)(TMC) (Entered: 06/14/2018)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/14/2018, Entered: None Notice of Removal
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/12/2018, Entered: None notice of removal
                                                                                                              NOTICE OF REMOVAL from the Fourth Judicial Circuit, in and for Duval County, case number 16-2018-CA-1233 filed in State Court on 02/27/2018. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number JAX028064 filed by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - State Court Record, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit State Court Docket Sheet as of 06/13/2018, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet)(TMC) (Entered: 06/14/2018)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                Space Space

                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 27 times.

                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                Need Password Help?