Angstadt v. Atlantic Mutual Ins., et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Maryland District Court, Case No. 1:93-cv-02022-FNS

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Keith Edward Angstadt, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Foxwell Albright, Sr +1 410 244 0350 +1 410 823 5453 dalbright@verizon.net
v.
No Logo Multicomm Telecommunications, Defendant
No Logo Raymond C. Rask, Defendant
No Logo Atlantic Mutual Ins., Garnishee

Toggle Switch Represented by PARLER & WOBBER, L.L.P.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William C. Parler, Jr. +1 410 832 1800 +1 410 832 2536 w.parler@parlerwobber.com
No Logo National Union Fire Ins. Co. of Pittsburgh, PA., Garnishee

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Scott R Adams +1 864 298 8417 +1 864 298 8520

Toggle Switch Represented by Dombroff & Gilmore

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark A. Dombroff +1 703 336 8700 +1 202 625 3150 mdombroff@dglitigators.com

Toggle Switch Represented by PARLER & WOBBER, L.L.P.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William C. Parler, Jr. +1 410 832 1800 +1 410 832 2536 w.parler@parlerwobber.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Schnader Harrison Segal & Lewis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan Michael Stern +1 202 419 4202 +1 202 419 3454 jstern@schnader.com
Office Baltimore
Filed 7/12/1993
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $2000000
Nature of Suit 110 - Contract - Insurance
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Dismissed - Other
County 88888
Terminated 12/5/1997
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case 93140027/CL164953[Baltimore City]
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, TSTUDY
  Entries (19) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 15 Filed: 12/5/1997, Entered: 12/5/1997 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER dated 12/5/97, that this case is hereby "DISMISSED", and that the Clerk of Court "CLOSE" this Case. ( signed by Judge Frederic N. Smalkin ) (c/m & microfilmed 121/5/97) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 12/5/1997, Entered: 12/11/1997 Terminated Case
    Case closed (slf, Deputy Clerk)
      LREF
      Blank 14 Filed: 7/23/1993, Entered: 7/23/1993, Terminated: 12/5/1997 Response in Opposition
      Affidavit RESPONSE by Raymond C. Rask in opposition to [4-1] motion to Dismiss, [4-2] motion to Stay (slf, Deputy Clerk)
        LREF
        Blank 13 Filed: 7/23/1993, Entered: 7/23/1993 OrderCourt Filing
        Letter ORDER dated 7/22/93 informing Counsel for plaintiff that I do not intend to convene a scheduling conference, but scheduling orders will be entered in due course as therein set forth. ( signed by Judge Frederic N. Smalkin ) (c/m Chambers) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
          LREF
          Blank 12 Filed: 7/23/1993, Entered: 7/23/1993 Status Report
          STATUS REPORT by Keith Edward Angstadt (slf, Deputy Clerk)
            LREF
            Blank 11 Filed: 7/21/1993, Entered: 7/21/1993, Terminated: 12/5/1997 Answer
            ANSWER to Complaint by National Union Fire (Attorney Jonathan M. Stern, Mark A. Dombroff, Scott R. Adams), (slf, Deputy Clerk)
              LREF
              Blank 10 Filed: 7/19/1993, Entered: 7/20/1993 Order
              TRIAL AND FINAL JUDGMENT ORDER (J. Kendrick) entering its verdict in favor of the plaintiff and against both defendants for $1,650,000.00 compensatory damages; $350,000.00 punitive damages for a total of $2,000,000.00 plus interest. (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                LREF
                Blank 9 Filed: 7/19/1993, Entered: 7/20/1993 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                MOTION by Keith Edward Angstadt to file foreign judgments (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                  LREF
                  Blank 8 Filed: 7/19/1993, Entered: 7/20/1993 Affidavit
                  AFFIDAVIT of last know addresses of judgment creditor and judgment debtors. (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                    LREF
                    Blank 7 Filed: 7/19/1993, Entered: 7/20/1993 Motion to Consolidate Cases
                    MOTION by Keith Edward Angstadt to Consolidate Cases (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                      LREF
                      Blank 6 Filed: 7/19/1993, Entered: 7/20/1993 OrderCourt Filing
                      Letter ORDER dated 7/19/93, STAYING Case until further order of court, which stay will remain in force, most likely until resolution of the declaratory judgment action now pending in Virginia. ( signed by Judge Frederic N. Smalkin ) (c/m Chambers) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 7/19/1993, Entered: 7/20/1993 Remark
                        Pleadings Nos. 7 thru 10 received from Plaintiff and docketed in the Circuit Court for Baltimore City, Md. (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 7/15/1993, Entered: 7/15/1993 Remark
                          Notice of Removal mailed to Counsel. (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                            LREF
                            Blank 5 Filed: 7/12/1993, Entered: 7/15/1993 Response in Support of Motion
                            Reply MEMORANDUM by Atlantic Mutual Ins. in support of [4-1] motion to Dismiss (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                              LREF
                              Blank 4 Filed: 7/12/1993, Entered: 7/15/1993 Motion to Dismiss
                              MOTION by Atlantic Mutual Ins. to Dismiss , or to Stay (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                LREF
                                Blank 3 Filed: 7/12/1993, Entered: 7/15/1993 Order on Motion for Writ of Garnishment
                                WRIT of Garnishment of Property issued as to National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, Pa., and Atlantic Mutual Insurance Company. (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 2 Filed: 7/12/1993, Entered: 7/15/1993 ~Notice (other)
                                  NOTICE of Filing Notice of Removal by Atlantic Mutual Ins., National Union Fire (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 1 Filed: 7/12/1993, Entered: 7/15/1993 Notice of Removal
                                    NOTICE OF REMOVAL; FILING FEE $ 120.00 RECEIPT # 014697 (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank -- Filed: 7/12/1993, Entered: 7/15/1993 Remark
                                      Above pleadings are all copies of papers filed in the Circuit Court for Baltimore City, Md. (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                        LREF

                                        Space Space

                                        Statistics

                                        This case has been viewed 115 times.

                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                        Space
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                         
                                        PlainSite
                                        Sign Up
                                        Need Password Help?