Angstadt v. Atlantic Mutual Co, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Maryland District Court, Case No. 1:93-cv-02023-FNS

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Keith E. Angstadt, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Foxwell Albright, Sr +1 410 244 0350 +1 410 823 5453 dalbright@verizon.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Benjamin W. Glass, III & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Benjamin Weaver Glass, III +1 703 591 9829 +1 703 783 0686 ben@benglasslaw.com
No Logo Atlantic Mutual Companies, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by PARLER & WOBBER, L.L.P.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William C. Parler, Jr. +1 410 832 1800 +1 410 832 2536 w.parler@parlerwobber.com
No Logo National Union Fire Ins. Co. of Pittsburgh, PA., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Scott R Adams +1 864 298 8417 +1 864 298 8520

Toggle Switch Represented by Dombroff & Gilmore

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark A. Dombroff +1 703 336 8700 +1 202 625 3150 mdombroff@dglitigators.com

Toggle Switch Represented by PARLER & WOBBER, L.L.P.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William C. Parler, Jr. +1 410 832 1800 +1 410 832 2536 w.parler@parlerwobber.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Schnader Harrison Segal & Lewis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan Michael Stern +1 202 419 4202 +1 202 419 3454 jstern@schnader.com
v.
No Logo Atlantic Mutual Companies, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by PARLER & WOBBER, L.L.P.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William C. Parler, Jr. +1 410 832 1800 +1 410 832 2536 w.parler@parlerwobber.com
No Logo National Union Fire Ins. Co. of Pittsburgh, PA., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Scott R Adams +1 864 298 8417 +1 864 298 8520

Toggle Switch Represented by Dombroff & Gilmore

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark A. Dombroff +1 703 336 8700 +1 202 625 3150 mdombroff@dglitigators.com

Toggle Switch Represented by PARLER & WOBBER, L.L.P.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William C. Parler, Jr. +1 410 832 1800 +1 410 832 2536 w.parler@parlerwobber.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Schnader Harrison Segal & Lewis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan Michael Stern +1 202 419 4202 +1 202 419 3454 jstern@schnader.com
No Logo Keith E. Angstadt, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Foxwell Albright, Sr +1 410 244 0350 +1 410 823 5453 dalbright@verizon.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Benjamin W. Glass, III & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Benjamin Weaver Glass, III +1 703 591 9829 +1 703 783 0686 ben@benglasslaw.com
No Logo Atlantic Mutual Companies, Cross-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by PARLER & WOBBER, L.L.P.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William C. Parler, Jr. +1 410 832 1800 +1 410 832 2536 w.parler@parlerwobber.com
No Logo National Union Fire Ins. Co. of Pittsburgh, PA., Cross-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Scott R Adams +1 864 298 8417 +1 864 298 8520

Toggle Switch Represented by Dombroff & Gilmore

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark A. Dombroff +1 703 336 8700 +1 202 625 3150 mdombroff@dglitigators.com

Toggle Switch Represented by PARLER & WOBBER, L.L.P.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William C. Parler, Jr. +1 410 832 1800 +1 410 832 2536 w.parler@parlerwobber.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Schnader Harrison Segal & Lewis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan Michael Stern +1 202 419 4202 +1 202 419 3454 jstern@schnader.com
Office Baltimore
Filed 7/12/1993
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $3000000
Nature of Suit 110 - Contract - Insurance
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Judgment - Motion Before Trial
County 88888
Terminated 9/29/1993
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case 93173038[Baltimore City]
Def Custody Status
Flags APPEAL, CLOSED, TSTUDY
  Entries (59) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 48 Filed: 12/8/1997, Entered: 12/9/1997 Order
ATTESTED COPY OF THE ORDER of the (U.S. Court of Appeals, for the Fourth Circut) "DISMISSING" the Appeal. (c/s) (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
    LREF
    Blank 47 Filed: 10/21/1997, Entered: 10/22/1997 Stipulation of Dismissal
    STIPULATION of dismissal with Prejudice and "APPROVAL" ( signed by Frederic N. Smalkin 10/21/97 ) (c/m 10/21/97-skp) (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
      LREF
      Blank 46 Filed: 9/18/1997, Entered: 9/18/1997 MemorandumCourt Filing
      MEMORANDUM "ADVISING" Counsel of Receiving a Rule 41 Order Dismissing this case within the next 30 days, or, if no order is filed, a further Status Update within the same time period. ( signed by Judge Frederic N. Smalkin 9/18/97 ) (c/m 9/18/97-Chambers) (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
        LREF
        Blank 45 Filed: 9/18/1997, Entered: 9/18/1997 Status Report
        STATUS REPORT by Defendants. (jlb, Deputy Clerk)
          LREF
          Blank 44 Filed: 1/22/1996, Entered: 1/24/1996, Terminated: 1/22/1996 OrderCourt Filing
          ORDER granting [44-1] motion for the law firm of Owens, Robertson & Parler, P.A. to Withdraw as Attorney. ( signed by Judge Frederic N. Smalkin 1/22/96 ) (c/m 1/22/96) (cag, Deputy Clerk)
            LREF
            Blank 44 Filed: 1/22/1996, Entered: 1/24/1996, Terminated: 1/22/1996 Motion to Withdraw
            MOTION by Atlantic Mutual Co for Owens, Robertson & Parler, P.A to Withdraw as Attorney . (cag, Deputy Clerk)
              LREF
              Blank 43 Filed: 5/16/1994, Entered: 5/12/1994 Certificate of Clerk
              Supplemental Certificate of Clerk certifying record as complete for appeal purposes for [37-1] appeal (copy) (jmk, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 05/16/1994
                LREF
                Blank 42 Filed: 5/10/1994, Entered: 5/12/1994 Order
                ORDER (copy) of the U.S. Court of Appeals, for the Fourth Circuit, "GRANTING" motion of Appellant to supplement the record on appeal, with attachment. (jmk, Deputy Clerk)
                  LREF
                  Blank 41 Filed: 5/10/1994, Entered: 5/12/1994 Order
                  ORDER (copy) of the U.S. Court of Appeals, for the Fourth Circuit, "GRANTING" motion of Appellee to supplement the record on appeal, and "GRANTING" motion of Appellee to further supplement the record, with attachments. (jmk, Deputy Clerk)
                    LREF
                    Blank 40 Filed: 11/22/1993, Entered: 11/22/1993 Status Report
                    STATUS REPORT by Atlantic Mutual Co, National Union Fire (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                      LREF
                      Blank 39 Filed: 11/8/1993, Entered: 11/8/1993 Remark
                      Copy of docketing statement of plaintiff with attachments. (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                        LREF
                        Blank 38 Filed: 10/29/1993, Entered: 10/29/1993 Certificate of Clerk
                        Copy of Certificate of Clerk certifying record as complete for appeal purposes for [37-1] appeal (has, Deputy Clerk)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 10/29/1993, Entered: 10/29/1993 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet
                          Notice of appeal and certified copy of docket to USCA: [37-1] appeal by Keith E. Angstadt (d/s mailed to Counsel) (has, Deputy Clerk)
                            LREF
                            Blank 37 Filed: 10/26/1993, Entered: 10/29/1993 Notice of Appeal
                            NOTICE OF APPEAL by Keith E. Angstadt . Fee Status: (Paid) (c/s 10/28/93 akc) (has, Deputy Clerk)
                              LREF
                              Blank 36 Filed: 10/18/1993, Entered: 10/19/1993 Correspondence
                              CORRESPONDENCE from defendant Atlantic Mutual, RE: Crossclaim filed against my client, and Order that case has been stayed and administratively closed and defendant need not respond until stay is lifted as therein set forth. (J. Smalkin) (c/m Chambers) . (c/m Chambers) (slf, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 05/13/1994
                                LREF
                                Blank 35 Filed: 10/15/1993, Entered: 10/18/1993 OrderCourt Filing
                                ORDER dated 10/15/93, denying [33-1] motion for Reconsideration of [31-1] order ( signed by Judge Frederic N. Smalkin ) (c/m Chambers) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 34 Filed: 10/15/1993, Entered: 10/18/1993 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                  MEMORANDUM ( signed by Judge Frederic N. Smalkin ) (c/m Chambers) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 33 Filed: 10/14/1993, Entered: 10/15/1993, Terminated: 10/15/1993 Motion for Reconsideration
                                    MOTION with memorandum in support by Keith E. Angstadt for Reconsideration of [31-1] order (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 32 Filed: 10/12/1993, Entered: 10/12/1993 Crossclaim
                                      CROSSCLAIM by National Union Fire against Atlantic Mutual Co (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 32 Filed: 10/12/1993, Entered: 10/12/1993 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                        Amended and Supplemental ANSWER by National Union Fire to amended complaint (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 31 Filed: 9/29/1993, Entered: 9/30/1993 OrderCourt Filing
                                          ORDER granting [18-1] motion of Defendant Atlantic Mutual to Stay Proceedings; "STAYING" this case pending conclusion of the underlying proceedings in the Virginia state court for Arlington County; "ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING" this case subject to reopening, by motion of any party, upon conclusion of the Virginia state proceedings. ( signed by Judge Frederic N. Smalkin ) (c/m 9/28/93, skp) Microfilmed 9/30/93 (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 30 Filed: 9/29/1993, Entered: 9/30/1993 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                            MEMORANDUM ( signed by Judge Frederic N. Smalkin, dated 9/29/93 ) (c/m 9/28/93, skp) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank -- Filed: 9/29/1993, Entered: 9/30/1993 Terminated Case
                                              Case closed (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 29 Filed: 9/28/1993, Entered: 9/28/1993 Response in Support of Motion
                                                SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM by Atlantic Mutual Co. in support of its [18-1] motion to Stay Proceedings, and Exhibit A. (c/s) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 28 Filed: 9/27/1993, Entered: 9/28/1993 Response in Opposition
                                                  RESPONSE by Keith E. Angstadt in opposition to [18-1] motion of defendant Atlantic Mutual Companies to Stay Proceedings. (c/s) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 27 Filed: 9/27/1993, Entered: 9/28/1993 Response in Opposition
                                                    BRIEF by National Union Fire in opposition to [18-1] motion of Atlantic Mutual to Stay Proceedings, and Exhibit A. (c/s) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 26 Filed: 9/27/1993, Entered: 9/28/1993 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                      MOTION by National Union Fire For Separate Trial (c/s) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 26 Filed: 9/27/1993, Entered: 9/28/1993 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                        REPLY by National Union Fire to Opposition of Atlantic Mutual to [22-1] motion of National Union Fire for Leave to File A Cross-Claim. (c/s) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 25 Filed: 9/23/1993, Entered: 9/23/1993 OrderCourt Filing
                                                          ORDER dated 9/22/93 granting [22-1] motion for Leave to File An Amended and Supplemental Answer Adding a Cross-claim and withdrawing its counterclaim ( signed by Judge Frederic N. Smalkin ) (c/m Chambers) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 24 Filed: 9/22/1993, Entered: 9/22/1993, Terminated: 9/29/1993 Response in Opposition
                                                            RESPONSE by Atlantic Mutual Co in opposition to [22-1] motion for Leave to File An Amended and Supplemental Answer Adding a Cross-claim and withdrawing its counterclaim (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 23 Filed: 9/22/1993, Entered: 9/22/1993 Response in Support of Motion
                                                              Supplemental MEMORANDUM by Atlantic Mutual Co in support of [18-1] motion to Stay Proceedings (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 22 Filed: 9/20/1993, Entered: 9/21/1993, Terminated: 9/23/1993 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                MOTION with memorandum in support by National Union Fire for Leave to File An Amended and Supplemental Answer Adding a Cross-claim and withdrawing its counterclaim and Exhibit A (rank, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 21 Filed: 9/16/1993, Entered: 9/20/1993 Response in Support of Motion
                                                                  SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM by Atlantic Mutual Co in support of [18-1] motion to Stay Proceedings and Exhibit A (rank, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 20 Filed: 9/10/1993, Entered: 9/10/1993, Terminated: 9/29/1993 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                    ANSWER by Atlantic Mutual Co to amended complaint (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 19 Filed: 9/10/1993, Entered: 9/10/1993 Counterclaim
                                                                      COUNTERCLAIM by Atlantic Mutual Co against Keith E. Angstadt (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 18 Filed: 9/10/1993, Entered: 9/10/1993, Terminated: 9/29/1993 Motion to Stay
                                                                        MOTION with memorandum in support by Atlantic Mutual Co to Stay Proceedings and request for hearing. and Attachment (Attachment rec'd 9/17/93) (slf, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 09/20/1993
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 17 Filed: 8/24/1993, Entered: 8/24/1993, Terminated: 9/29/1993 Answer to Counterclaim
                                                                          ANSWER by Keith E. Angstadt to [15-1] counter claim (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 16 Filed: 8/16/1993, Entered: 8/18/1993 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                            MEMORANDUM AND ORDER dated 8/13/93, denying [10-1] motion of defendant Atlantic Mutual to Dismiss, and that defendants are hereby directed to answer the amended complaint within 30 days of the date hereof. ( signed by Judge Frederic N. Smalkin ) (c/m Chambers) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 15 Filed: 8/13/1993, Entered: 8/18/1993 Counterclaim
                                                                              COUNTERCLAIM by National Union Fire against Keith E. Angstadt (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 15 Filed: 8/13/1993, Entered: 8/18/1993 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                ANSWER by National Union Fire (Attorney Jonathan M. Stern, Mark A. Dombroff, Scott R. Adams) to amended complaint (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 14 Filed: 8/12/1993, Entered: 8/12/1993, Terminated: 9/29/1993 Response in Opposition
                                                                                  RESPONSE by Keith E. Angstadt in opposition to [10-1] motion to Dismiss (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 13 Filed: 8/5/1993, Entered: 8/6/1993 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                    ORDER dated 8/5/93 granting [11-1] motion for Benjamin W. Glass, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( signed by Judge Herbert N. Maletz ) (c/m Chambers) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 12 Filed: 8/5/1993, Entered: 8/5/1993 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                      NOTICE of attorney appearance for Keith E. Angstadt by Benjamin W. Glass III, Esq. (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 11 Filed: 8/5/1993, Entered: 8/5/1993, Terminated: 8/5/1993 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                        MOTION by Keith E. Angstadt for Benjamin W. Glass, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 10 Filed: 7/27/1993, Entered: 7/27/1993, Terminated: 8/16/1993 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                          MOTION with memorandum in support by Atlantic Mutual Co to Dismiss , and/or to Stay and attachments. (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 9 Filed: 7/23/1993, Entered: 7/23/1993 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                            Letter ORDER dated 7/22/93 to Mr. Archibald in respond to Status Report of 7/20/94, as therein set forth. ( signed by Judge Frederic N. Smalkin ) (c/m Chambers) (slf, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 05/13/1994
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 8 Filed: 7/23/1993, Entered: 7/23/1993 Status Report
                                                                                              STATUS REPORT dated 7/20/93 by James K. Archibald. (slf, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 05/13/1994
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 7 Filed: 7/19/1993, Entered: 7/20/1993 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to Atlantic Mutual Co, National Union Fire 6/25/93 (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 6 Filed: 7/19/1993, Entered: 7/20/1993 Summons Issued
                                                                                                  SUMMONS(ES) issued for Atlantic Mutual Co, National Union Fire (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 5 Filed: 7/19/1993, Entered: 7/20/1993 Jury Demand
                                                                                                    DEMAND for jury trial by Keith E. Angstadt (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 5 Filed: 7/19/1993, Entered: 7/20/1993 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                      AMENDED COMPLAINT by Keith E. Angstadt , amending [3-1] complaint (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 4 Filed: 7/19/1993, Entered: 7/20/1993 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                        Letter ORDER, dated 7/19/93, to Counsel of Record RE: Rule 12(b)(6) as therein set forth. ( signed by Judge Frederic N. Smalkin ) (c/m Chambers) (slf, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 05/13/1994
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 7/19/1993, Entered: 7/20/1993 Remark
                                                                                                          Pleadings Nos. 5 thru 7 received from plaintiff and filed in the Circuit Court for Baltimore City, Md. (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 7/15/1993, Entered: 7/15/1993 Remark
                                                                                                            Notice of Removal mailed to Counsel. (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 3 Filed: 7/12/1993, Entered: 7/15/1993 Jury Demand
                                                                                                              DEMAND for jury trial by Keith E. Angstadt (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 3 Filed: 7/12/1993, Entered: 7/15/1993 Complaint
                                                                                                                COMPLAINT filed; (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 2 Filed: 7/12/1993, Entered: 7/15/1993 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Filing of Notice of Removal by Atlantic Mutual Co, National Union Fire (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 1 Filed: 7/12/1993, Entered: 7/15/1993 Notice of Removal
                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF REMOVAL; FILING FEE $ 120.00 RECEIPT # 014698 (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 7/12/1993, Entered: 7/15/1993 Remark
                                                                                                                      Above pleadings are all copies of papers filed in the Circuit Court for Baltimore City Md. (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                        LREF

                                                                                                                        Space Space

                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 98 times.

                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?