United States v. California Employee s Retirement System
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 2:18-cv-05545

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 21, 2019 at 12:33 AM ST (2.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Pribe +1 213 894 6551 +1 213 894 0115 andrew.t.pribe@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo California Public Employee s Retirement System, Defendant
Citation Section 26 U.S.C. § 7401
Nature of Suit 870 - Federal Tax Suits: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
  Entries (5) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/28/2018, Entered: None Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/2/2018, Entered: None Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 filed by plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA,. (Pribe, Andrew) (Entered: 06/22/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/22/2018, Entered: 6/22/2018 Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
        CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA,. (Pribe, Andrew)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          COMPLAINT No Fee Required - US Government, filed by plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA,. (Attorney Andrew Pribe added to party UNITED STATES OF AMERICA,(pty:pla))(Pribe, Andrew) (Entered: 06/22/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF

            Statistics

            This case has been viewed 5 times.

            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
            Space
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
             
            PlainSite
            Sign Up
            Need Password Help?