United States v. Duncan
Federal Civil Lawsuit Virginia Western District Court, Case No. 7:18-cv-00290

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 21, 2019 at 12:30 AM ST (2.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Ari David Kunofsky +1 202 353 9187 ari.d.kunofsky@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Mary Beth Niday +1 202 252 5300 +1 202 252 5301
v.
No Logo John S Duncan, Defendant
No Logo Paul D. Duncan, Defendant
No Logo William M Duncan, Jr, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by William M Duncan, Jr

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William M Duncan, Jr
Citation Section 26 U.S.C. § 7402
Nature of Suit 870 - Federal Tax Suits: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/7/2019, Entered: None Abstract Issued
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of United States of America against John S Duncan, Paul D. Duncan, William M Duncan, Jr. Signed by Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 11/30/18. (mka)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/15/2018, Entered: None Default -Judgment
      MOTION for Default Judgment as to Paul Duncan and John Duncan & Consent Judgment as to William Duncan, Jr. by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration in Support of Revenue Officer Bonnie James, # 2 Text of Proposed Order /Judgment)(Kunofsky, Ari)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/5/2018, Entered: None Mail returned
        Mail Returned as Undeliverable (vacant): re 8 Clerk's Entry of Default regarding John S. Duncan; (No forwarding address given) (ck)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/2/2018, Entered: None Answer
          ANSWER to Complaint 1 by William M Duncan, Jr.(mka)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/26/2018, Entered: None Mail returned
            Mail Returned as Undeliverable: Insufficient Address, re 8 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT regarding John S. Duncan; (No forwarding address given.) (aab)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/19/2018, Entered: None Clerks Entry of Default*
              Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to John S Duncan, Paul D. Duncan, William M Duncan, Jr (ck)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/17/2018, Entered: None Entry of Default
                MOTION for Entry of Default against Defendants William Duncan, Jr., Paul Duncan, and John Duncan by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration in Support by Ari D. Kunofsky, # 2 Exhibit 1, SCRA Report for William Duncan, Jr., # 3 Exhibit 2, SCRA Report for Paul Duncan, # 4 Exhibit 3, SCRA Report for John Duncan, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Kunofsky, Ari)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/17/2018, Entered: None summons returned executed
                  SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. John S Duncan served on 8/20/2018, answer due 9/10/2018.(Kunofsky, Ari)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/17/2018, Entered: None summons returned executed
                    SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Paul D. Duncan served on 7/21/2018, answer due 8/13/2018.(Kunofsky, Ari)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/17/2018, Entered: None summons returned executed
                      SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. William M Duncan, Jr served on 7/25/2018, answer due 8/15/2018.(Kunofsky, Ari)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/11/2018, Entered: None 70 Day Notice Letter Sent
                        70 Day Notice Letter (mka)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/22/2018, Entered: None Electronic Summons Issued
                          Electronic Summons Issued as to John S Duncan, Paul D. Duncan, William M Duncan, Jr NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: # 1 Summons Issued Paul Duncan, # 2 Summons Issued William M. Duncan, Jr.)(ck)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/22/2018, Entered: None Complaint
                            COMPLAINT against John S Duncan, Paul D. Duncan, William M Duncan, Jr, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ck)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 7 times.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?