GORDON v. CANADA
Federal Civil Lawsuit Pennsylvania Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:18-cv-02651

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 25, 2019 at 4:19 AM EST (2.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit Real Property: Other
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/26/2018, Entered: None USCA Notice of Docketing ROA
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/23/2018, Entered: None Notice of appeal
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/27/2018, Entered: None Memorandum and/or Opinion Order
      MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS GRANTED. GORDON'S COMPLAINT IS DISMISSED FOR THE REASONS SET FORTH IN THE COURT'S MEMORANDUM. MOORE'S CLAIMS SEEKING REVIEW OF THE ORDER APPOINTING CANADA AS EXECTRIX OF H IS FATHER'S ESTATE ARE DISMISSED FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION PURSUANT TO THE ROOKER-FELDMAN DOCTRINE. TO THE EXTENT GORDON RAISES CLAIMS THAT ARE NOT BARRED BY ROOKER-FELDMAN, THOSE CLAIMS ARE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO GORDON'S RIGHT TO PURSUE THEM IN STATE COURT. GORDON MAY NOT FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT. CLERK OF COURT SHALL CLOSE THIS CASE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 6/27/18. 6/27/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO GORDON.(rf, )
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/27/2018, Entered: None Memorandum and/or Opinion
        MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 6/27/18. 6/27/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE PLAINTIFF.(rf, )
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/26/2018, Entered: None Notice re: Pro Se Guidelines
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/26/2018, Entered: None Complaint
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/26/2018, Entered: None Proceed In Forma Pauperis
                Request RequestSpace LREF

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 2 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?