Commonwealth of Kentucky v. McKesson Corporation
Federal Court Proceeding Ohio Northern District Court, Case No. 1:18-op-45682

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated May 31, 2019 at 11:16 PM DT (1.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Andy Beshear, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan & Morgan, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah Allen Foster +1 904 361 4442 +1 904 361 7242 sarahfoster@forthepeople.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE James Dennis Young +1 904 361 0012 jyoung@forthepeople.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Motley Rice, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Linda Singer +1 202 386 9625 +1 202 232 1153 lsinger@motleyrice.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Brian C. Thomas +1 502 696 5371 +1 502 573 8316

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Kentucky Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY LeeAnne Applegate +1 502 696 5503 leeanne.applegate@ag.ky.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY C. David Johnstone +1 502 696 5445 +1 502 573 7150 david.johnstone@ag.ky.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Elizabeth Ungar Natter +1 502 696 5389 +1 502 573 8317 liz.natter@ag.ky.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, (Inactive), LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Charles Wesley Rowland +1 502 696 5481 charlie.rowland@ky.gov
No Logo Commonwealth of Kentucky, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan & Morgan, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah Allen Foster +1 904 361 4442 +1 904 361 7242 sarahfoster@forthepeople.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE James Dennis Young +1 904 361 0012 jyoung@forthepeople.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Motley Rice, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Linda Singer +1 202 386 9625 +1 202 232 1153 lsinger@motleyrice.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Brian C. Thomas +1 502 696 5371 +1 502 573 8316

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Kentucky Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY LeeAnne Applegate +1 502 696 5503 leeanne.applegate@ag.ky.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY C. David Johnstone +1 502 696 5445 +1 502 573 7150 david.johnstone@ag.ky.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Elizabeth Ungar Natter +1 502 696 5389 +1 502 573 8317 liz.natter@ag.ky.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, (Inactive), LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Charles Wesley Rowland +1 502 696 5481 charlie.rowland@ky.gov
v.
McKesson Corporation McKesson Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Covington

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Geoffrey E Hobart +1 202 662 6000 +1 202 662 5281 ghobart@cov.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Stites & Harbison, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Carol Dan Browning +1 502 681 0516 +1 502 779 8232 cbrowning@stites.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Jeffrey Steven Moad +1 502 587 2087 jmoad@stites.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 03/09/2018 Jennifer Ashton Pekman +1 502 587 2074 jpekman@stites.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Carolyn Purcell +1 502 681 0429 cpurcell@stites.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1441
Nature of Suit 367 - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
  Entries (28) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Certified copy of order of remand and docket sheet mailed to the Commonwealth of Kentucky, Franklin County Circuit Court with acknowledgement of receipt enclosed. (P,R) (Entered: 07/13/2018)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/13/2018, Entered: 7/13/2018 Order dismissing caseCourt Filing
    Order remanding case to the Commonwealth of Kentucky, Franklin Circuit Court. Judge Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804) on 7/13/18. (P,R)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Notice Of Consent To Remand filed by McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hobart, Geoffrey) (Entered: 07/12/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Notice of Supplemental Authority filed by McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Hobart, Geoffrey) (Entered: 07/09/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Plaintiff Commonwealth of Kentucky's Submission of Additional Authority in Support of Motion to Remand filed by All Plaintiffs. Related document(s) 23, 4 .(Singer, Linda) (Entered: 07/09/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Attorney Appearance by Linda J. Singer filed by on behalf of Andy Beshear, Commonwealth of Kentucky. (Singer, Linda) (Entered: 07/09/2018)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/28/2018, Entered: 6/28/2018 OrderCourt Filing
              Order Regarding Remand Briefing. Judge Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804) on 6/28/18. (P,R)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Kentucky Eastern. Case number 3:18-cv-00010. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 06/11/2018)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  CERTIFIED ORDER received from OHND re: Case Transfer to the MDL Panel pursuant to the Transfer Order filed in MDL Case Number 2804.(CBD) cc: COR [Transferred from kyed on 6/11/2018.] (Entered: 06/07/2018)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    INFORMATION COPY OF MDL CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER: MDL No. 2804 (SKV) [Transferred from kyed on 6/11/2018.] (Entered: 06/06/2018)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/31/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                      ORDER: 1. Motions for Admission Pro Hac Vice 15 ; 16 are GRANTED; 2-3. James D. Young and Sarah A. Foster are admitted pro hac vice as counsel for Plaintiff in the above styled action. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 5/31/2018. (CBD)cc: COR w/ copy of Mandatory ECF General Order & ECF Registration form to Foster and Young [Transferred from kyed on 6/11/2018.] (Entered: 05/31/2018)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        PRO HAC VICE Filing fee received - Sarah A. Foster - $ 125.00, receipt number 5025374. (AKR) [Transferred from kyed on 6/11/2018.] (Entered: 05/01/2018)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          PRO HAC VICE Filing fee received - James D. Young - $ 125.00, receipt number 5025373. (AKR) [Transferred from kyed on 6/11/2018.] (Entered: 05/01/2018)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            MOTION for Sarah A. Foster to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Andy Beshear, Commonwealth of Kentucky. (Attachments: # 1 Cert of Good Standing from Florida)(AKR) [Transferred from kyed on 6/11/2018.] (Entered: 05/01/2018)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              MOTION for James D. Young to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Andy Beshear, Commonwealth of Kentucky. (Attachments: # 1 Cert of Good Standing from Florida)(AKR) [Transferred from kyed on 6/11/2018.] (Entered: 05/01/2018)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                ORDER: 1. Motion for Remand 4 is DEFERRED pending a determination of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation; 2. Motion 5 to Expedite Briefing Schedule is DENIED as MOOT; 3. This action shall be STAYED 7 pending a determination of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation; and 4. The parties SHALL FILE a status report no later than one-hundred and eighty (180) days from the date of entry of this order explaining any relevant developments. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 4/12/2018. (CBD)cc: COR [Transferred from kyed on 6/11/2018.] (Entered: 04/12/2018)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  REPLY to 11, 7 in Support of Motion to Stay Pending Ruling by Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation filed by McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Transfer Order)(Browning, Carol) [Transferred from kyed on 6/11/2018.] (Entered: 04/06/2018)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    REPLY to Response to Motion re 4 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Commonwealth of Kentucky ex rel. Attorney General Andy Beshear filed by Commonwealth of Kentucky. (Natter, Elizabeth) [Transferred from kyed on 6/11/2018.] (Entered: 04/05/2018)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      RESPONSE in Opposition re 7 MOTION to Stay re 5 MOTION to Expedite by Commonwealth of Kentucky ex rel. Attorney General Andy Beshear by McKesson Corporation filed by Andy Beshear, Commonwealth of Kentucky. (Applegate, LeeAnne) [Transferred from kyed on 6/11/2018.] (Entered: 03/23/2018)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        RESPONSE in Opposition re 4 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Commonwealth of Kentucky ex rel. Attorney General Andy Beshear filed by McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - MDL-United States Statement of Interest, # 2 Proposed Order)(Browning, Carol) [Transferred from kyed on 6/11/2018.] (Entered: 03/22/2018)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          NOTICE by McKesson Corporation of Substitution of Counsel (Moad, Jeffrey) [Transferred from kyed on 6/11/2018.] (Entered: 03/09/2018)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            RESPONSE in Opposition re 5 MOTION to Expedite Briefing Schedule by Commonwealth of Kentucky ex rel. Attorney General Andy Beshear filed by McKesson Corporation. Filed pursuant to QC re 7 . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - JPML Dkt 328-Transfer Order, # 2 Exhibit 2 - EDKYT Stay Order 1-22-18, # 3 Exhibit 3 - JPML Dkt 798 - CTO-13, # 4 Proposed Order)(AKR) [Transferred from kyed on 6/11/2018.] (Entered: 03/05/2018)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              MOTION to Stay Ruling to re 5 MOTION to Expedite by Commonwealth of Kentucky ex rel. Attorney General Andy Beshear by McKesson Corporation (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - JPML Dkt 328 - Transfer Order, # 2 Exhibit 2 - EDKY Stay Order (Jan 22, 2018), # 3 Exhibit 3 - JPML Dkt 798 - CTO-13, # 4 Proposed Order)(Browning, Carol) Modified adding text to better describe pleading on 3/5/2018 (AKR). [Transferred from kyed on 6/11/2018.] (Entered: 03/02/2018)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re 5 MOTION to Expedite by Commonwealth of Kentucky ex rel. Attorney General Andy Beshear CORRECTED filed by Commonwealth of Kentucky. (Natter, Elizabeth) [Transferred from kyed on 6/11/2018.] (Entered: 03/02/2018)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  MOTION to Expedite Briefing Schedule by Commonwealth of Kentucky ex rel. Attorney General Andy Beshear (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit Order on Remands, # 3 Order on State Coordination, # 4 Proposed Order)(Natter, Elizabeth) Modified adding text to reflect caption of pleading on 3/2/2018 (AKR). [Transferred from kyed on 6/11/2018.] (Entered: 03/01/2018)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    MOTION to Remand to State Court by Commonwealth of Kentucky ex rel. Attorney General Andy Beshear (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit Ex. A Order on Remands, # 3 Order Regarding State coordination, # 4 Proposed Order)(Natter, Elizabeth) [Transferred from kyed on 6/11/2018.] (Entered: 03/01/2018)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by McKesson Corporation. (AKR) [Transferred from kyed on 6/11/2018.] (Entered: 02/23/2018)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Franklin Circuit Court, case number 18-CI-00056. ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4011158), filed by McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A - State Court Record, complaint, agreed order)(AKR) [Transferred from kyed on 6/11/2018.] (Entered: 02/23/2018)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                          Statistics

                                                          This case has been viewed 7 times.

                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                          Space
                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                           
                                                          PlainSite
                                                          Sign Up
                                                          Need Password Help?