BUZZFEED INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:18-cv-01556

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 25, 2020 at 7:07 PM DT (8.7 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Buzzfeed Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Buzzfeed Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Matthew Lynn Schafer +1 646 798 0693 matthew.schafer@buzzfeed.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Loevy & Loevy

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Fusion Communications Corp matt@loevy.com
v.
Federal Bureau of Prisons Federal Bureau of Prisons, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY April Denise Seabrook +1 202 252 2525 +1 202 252 2599 april.seabrook@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Scott Leeson Sroka +1 202 252 7113 +1 202 514 9155 scott.sroka@usdoj.gov
United States Department of Justice United States Department of Justice, Defendant
Officially listed as "U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY April Denise Seabrook +1 202 252 2525 +1 202 252 2599 april.seabrook@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Scott Leeson Sroka +1 202 252 7113 +1 202 514 9155 scott.sroka@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 05 U.S.C. § 552
Nature of Suit 895 - Freedom of Information Act
  Entries (47) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 9/25/2020, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 9/4/2020, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 9/4/2020, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 8/7/2020, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 7/28/2020, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/28/2020, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 6/12/2020, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 5/20/2020, Entered: None Extension of Time to
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 5/20/2020, Entered: None Notice of Substitution of Counsel
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 4/21/2020, Entered: None Status Report
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 4/21/2020, Entered: None Status Report
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 8/6/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/30/2019, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/29/2019, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/17/2019, Entered: None Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/14/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/30/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/20/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/10/2019, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/25/2019, Entered: None LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/8/2019, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/28/2019, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/25/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/28/2019, Entered: None Notice of Substitution of Counsel
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/16/2019, Entered: None Stay
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/15/2019, Entered: None Stay
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/19/2018, Entered: 11/19/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                      PROPOSED BRIEFING SCHEDULE by FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Sroka, Scott)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/19/2018, Entered: 11/19/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                        Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Sroka, Scott)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/17/2018, Entered: 9/17/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                                          ANSWER to Complaint by FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Sroka, Scott)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/13/2018, Entered: 8/13/2018 Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                            Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Sroka, Scott)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/13/2018, Entered: 8/13/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Leeson Sroka on behalf of All Defendants (Sroka, Scott)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/10/2018, Entered: 8/10/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by April Denise Seabrook on behalf of All Defendants (Seabrook, April)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/24/2018, Entered: 7/24/2018 Summons Returned Executed in FOIA case as to U.S. Attorney
                                                                  RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/16/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/15/2018. (Topic, Matthew)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/24/2018, Entered: 7/24/2018 Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General
                                                                    RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 07/16/2018. (Topic, Matthew)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/24/2018, Entered: 7/24/2018 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
                                                                      RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 7/16/2018 (Topic, Matthew)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/24/2018, Entered: 7/24/2018 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
                                                                        RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS served on 7/16/2018 (Topic, Matthew)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/11/2018, Entered: 7/11/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Lynn Schafer on behalf of BUZZFEED INC. (Schafer, Matthew)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/29/2018, Entered: 6/29/2018 Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG
                                                                            SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent) (zmd)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/29/2018, Entered: 6/29/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Topic on behalf of BUZZFEED INC. (Topic, Matthew)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 1 Filed: 6/29/2018, Entered: 6/29/2018 Complaint
                                                                                COMPLAINT against FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5564099) filed by BUZZFEED INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet, # 5 Summons)(Topic, Matthew)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                MINUTE ORDER: Having considered the parties' Joint Status Report 14, it is hereby ordered that the parties shall adhere to the following briefing schedule: Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment due January 16, 2019. Plaintiff's Opposition and combined Cross-Motion due February 19, 2019. Defendants' Reply and combined Opposition due March 5, 2019. Plaintiff's Reply due March 19, 2019. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 11/20/18. (DJS)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  Set/Reset Deadlines: Cross Motion due by 2/19/2019. Response to Cross Motion due by 3/5/2019. Reply to Cross Motion due by 3/19/2019. Summary Judgment motions due by 1/16/2019. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 2/19/2019. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 3/5/2019. (tb)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/19/2018. (tb)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. The requirements of LCvR 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil procedure appear to be inapplicable. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and propose a schedule for proceeding in this matter. The schedule shall address the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff, whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case, whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case, whether and when either party anticipates filing a dispositive motion, and any other pertinent issues. The parties shall file a joint status report that addresses these issues and that contains a proposed schedule and proposed order no later than 11/19/18. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 10/18/18. (DJS)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 9/17/2018. (tb)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER: Granting 11 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by September 17, 2018. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 8/13/18. (DJS)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zsb)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                            This case has been viewed 1 time.

                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                            Space
                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                             
                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                            Need Password Help?