Petrini Inc. v. Ecstasy, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Maryland District Court, Case No. 1:93-cv-01716-JFM

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Petrini Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Henry T. Meneely

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Henry T. Meneely +1 410 263 0202 +1 410 263 9241
v.
No Logo "Ecstasy" a Cherubini 44 Sailing Yacht, C.G. Official No. 664095, Defendant
Hayden, Michael V. Hayden, Michael V., Defendant
Officially listed as "Michael Hayden"
Motorola, Inc. Unknown Role, Motorola, Inc.
Office Baltimore
Filed 6/11/1993
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 120 - Contract: Marine
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1333 Admiralty
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Anne Arundel
Terminated 6/17/1993
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 8 Filed: 6/21/1993, Entered: 6/21/1993 Remark
Expense Report of Dismissal: Vessel Ecstasy (cag, Deputy Clerk)
    LREF
    Blank 7 Filed: 6/17/1993, Entered: 6/18/1993 OrderCourt Filing
    ORDER OF SATISFACTION "DIRECTING" this Case has been Paid, Settled and Satisfied and "DIRECTING" U.S. Marshall to release the Vessel "ECSTASY". ( signed by Judge J. F. Motz 6/17/93) (c/m 6/18/93-cag) (MICROFILMED 6/18/93) (cag, Deputy Clerk)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 6/17/1993, Entered: 6/18/1993 Terminated Case
      Case closed (cag, Deputy Clerk)
        LREF
        Blank 6 Filed: 6/14/1993, Entered: 6/15/1993 Summons Returned Executed
        RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to "Ecstasy" 6/11/93. (cag, Deputy Clerk)
          LREF
          Blank 5 Filed: 6/11/1993, Entered: 6/15/1993 Summons Issued
          SUMMONS(ES) (60 days) issued for Michael Hayden. (cag, Deputy Clerk)
            LREF
            Blank 4 Filed: 6/11/1993, Entered: 6/15/1993 Remark
            Warrant of Arest in Rem Issued as to Vessel "ECSTASY". (cag, Deputy Clerk)
              LREF
              Blank 3 Filed: 6/11/1993, Entered: 6/15/1993 OrderCourt Filing
              ORDER "DIRECTING" Clerk to Issue Warrant for the Arrest of the Vessel "ECSTASY". ( signed by Chf Judge Walter E. Black Jr. ) (c/d USM) (cag, Deputy Clerk)
                LREF
                Blank 2 Filed: 6/11/1993, Entered: 6/15/1993, Terminated: 6/11/1993 OrderCourt Filing
                ORDER granting [2-1] motion for Appointment of Substitute Custodian; "APPOINTING" Petrini, Inc. as substitute Custodian as therein set forth. ( signed by Chf Judge Walter E. Black Jr. ) (cag, Deputy Clerk)
                  LREF
                  Blank 2 Filed: 6/11/1993, Entered: 6/15/1993, Terminated: 6/11/1993 Motion to Appoint Custodian
                  MOTION by Petrini Inc. for Appointment of Substitute Custodian and Affidavit. (cag, Deputy Clerk)
                    LREF
                    Blank 1 Filed: 6/11/1993, Entered: 6/15/1993 Complaint
                    COMPLAINT and Attachments filed; FILING FEE $ 120.00 RECEIPT # 13610 (cag, Deputy Clerk)
                      LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 30 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?