Oh v. Weller

Federal Civil Lawsuit Maryland District Court, Case No. 1:93-cv-01721-AH
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Jung, Ki-oh, Plaintiff

Represented by McNamee, Hosea, Jernigan, Kim, Greenan & Lynch, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert J Kim +1 301 441 2420 +1 301 982 9450 rkim@mhlawyers.com
Space John Paul Lynch +1 301 441 2420 +1 301 982 9450 jlynch@mhlawyers.com
v.
No Logo George A. Weller, Defendant

Represented by Lord and Whip PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert P Schlenger +1 410 539 5881 +1 410 685 6726
Attributes
Office Baltimore
Filed 6/14/1993
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $1000000
Nature of Suit 350 - Motor Vehicle Personal Injury
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Tort/Motor Vehicle (P.I.)
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Dismissed - Other
County 88888
Terminated 3/8/1994
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
Timeline
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 7 Filed: 3/8/1994, Entered: 3/10/1994 Stipulation of DismissalCourt Filing
STIPULATION of dismissal and APPROVAL "DISMISSING" action with prejudice (Signed Senior Judge Alexander Harvey, II) dated Mar. 8, 1994 (c/m and MICROFILMED 3/8/94 mjl) (rank, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 3/8/1994, Entered: 3/10/1994 Terminated Case
Case closed (rank, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 6 Filed: 2/4/1994, Entered: 2/10/1994 Pretrial OrderCourt Filing
PRETRIAL ORDER filed ( signed by Sr Judge Alexander Harvey II ) dated Feb. 3, 1994 (rank, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 2/3/1994, Entered: 2/10/1994 Pretrial Conference - Final
Pre-trial conference held before Harvey, S.J. (In chambers) (rank, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 5 Filed: 8/27/1993, Entered: 8/27/1993 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
SCHEDULING ORDER( signed by Sr Judge Alexander Harvey II ) dated Aug. 26, 1993 (c/m by chambers 8/26/93) (rank, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 4 Filed: 8/24/1993, Entered: 8/25/1993 Answer
ANSWER to Complaint by George A. Weller (Attorney Robert P. Schlenger), (rank, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 3 Filed: 6/14/1993, Entered: 6/18/1993 Summons Issued
SUMMONS(ES) issued for George A. Weller (60) Days (rank, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 2 Filed: 6/14/1993, Entered: 6/18/1993 Jury Demand
DEMAND for jury trial by Jung Ki Oh (rank, Deputy Clerk)
LREF
Blank 1 Filed: 6/14/1993, Entered: 6/18/1993 Complaint
COMPLAINT filed; FILING FEE $ 120 RECEIPT # 013615L (rank, Deputy Clerk)
LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 39 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?