United States v. Knecht
Federal Civil Lawsuit Ohio Northern District Court, Case No. 1:18-cv-01503

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 4, 2019 at 1:00 AM ST (2.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward J. Murphy +1 202 307 6064 +1 202 514 5238 Edward.J.Murphy@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Brian F Knecht, Defendant
No Logo Crawford County Treasurer, Defendant
No Logo First Federal Community Bank, Defendant
No Logo Kathleen M Knecht, Defendant
Citation Section 26 U.S.C. § 7403
Nature of Suit 870 - Federal Tax Suits: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/5/2019, Entered: None Default Judgment
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/5/2019, Entered: None Default Judgment (Govt. Collection Cases Only)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: None Case Management Conference Scheduling Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Crawford County Treasurer, First Federal Community Bank, Brian F Knecht, Kathleen M Knecht. (Attachments: # 1 Magistrate Consent Form) (D,Ky) (Entered: 07/03/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/2/2018, Entered: 7/2/2018 Complaint
          Complaint against All Defendants. Filing fee exempt. Filed by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons to Kathleen M. Knecht, # 3 Summons to Brian F. Knecht, # 4 Summons to First Federal Community Bank, # 5 Summons to Crawford County Treasurer) (Murphy, Edward) Modified on 7/3/2018 (D,Ky).
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Judge Dan Aaron Polster assigned to case. (D,Ky)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. (D,Ky)
                Request RequestSpace LREF

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 4 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?