Ayati-Ghaffari v. JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 4:18-cv-00483

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated April 6, 2020 at 6:27 PM EDT (1.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit Real Property: Other
  Entries (168) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 4/6/2020, Entered: None Notice (Other)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 3/24/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Default Judgment
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 3/5/2020, Entered: None Notice (Other)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 2/19/2020, Entered: None Default Judgment
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 2/10/2020, Entered: None Order
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 2/4/2020, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 1/15/2020, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 11/21/2019, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 11/21/2019, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 11/5/2019, Entered: None Response to Non-Motion
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 11/5/2019, Entered: None Response to Non-Motion
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 10/28/2019, Entered: None Remark
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 10/28/2019, Entered: None Request for Entry of Default by Clerk
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 10/23/2019, Entered: None Response to Motion
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 10/22/2019, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 9/16/2019, Entered: None Default Judgment
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 9/11/2019, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 9/9/2019, Entered: None Default Judgment
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 8/30/2019, Entered: None Default Judgment
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 8/29/2019, Entered: None Default Judgment
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 8/28/2019, Entered: None Default Judgment
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 8/27/2019, Entered: None Default Judgment
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 8/26/2019, Entered: None Default Judgment
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 8/23/2019, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 8/22/2019, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 8/21/2019, Entered: None Default Judgment
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 8/21/2019, Entered: None Reopen Case
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 7/1/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 6/12/2019, Entered: None Brief
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 6/10/2019, Entered: None Response to Non-Motion
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 6/7/2019, Entered: None Brief
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 5/30/2019, Entered: None Brief
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 5/22/2019, Entered: None Brief
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 5/22/2019, Entered: None Brief
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 5/16/2019, Entered: None Brief
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 5/13/2019, Entered: None Response to Non-Motion
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 5/9/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 4/9/2019, Entered: None Response to Non-Motion
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 4/2/2019, Entered: None Response to Non-Motion
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 4/2/2019, Entered: None Response to Non-Motion
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 4/2/2019, Entered: None Response to Non-Motion
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 3/28/2019, Entered: None Response to Non-Motion
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 3/25/2019, Entered: None Response to Non-Motion
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 3/25/2019, Entered: None Reconsideration
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 3/25/2019, Entered: None Response to Non-Motion
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 3/22/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 3/20/2019, Entered: None Order Adopting Report and Recommendations
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 3/20/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 3/20/2019, Entered: None Order Adopting Report and Recommendations
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 3/20/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 3/18/2019, Entered: None Response to Non-Motion
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 3/12/2019, Entered: None Response to Non-Motion
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 3/12/2019, Entered: None Response to Non-Motion
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 3/12/2019, Entered: None Response to Non-Motion
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 3/12/2019, Entered: None Response to Non-Motion
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 3/12/2019, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 3/4/2019, Entered: None Response to Non-Motion
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 3/1/2019, Entered: None Response to Non-Motion
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 3/1/2019, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 3/1/2019, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 3/1/2019, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 2/28/2019, Entered: None Response to Non-Motion
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 2/26/2019, Entered: None Acknowledgment of Receipt
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 2/22/2019, Entered: None Brief
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 2/22/2019, Entered: None Reconsideration
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 2/22/2019, Entered: None Reconsideration
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 2/20/2019, Entered: None Objection to Report and Recommendations
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 2/20/2019, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 2/19/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 2/19/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 2/14/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 2/14/2019, Entered: None Response to Non-Motion
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 2/14/2019, Entered: None Response to Non-Motion
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 2/12/2019, Entered: None Response to Non-Motion
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 2/11/2019, Entered: None Report and Recommendations
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 2/11/2019, Entered: None Report and Recommendations
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 2/11/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 2/8/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 2/7/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 2/6/2019, Entered: None Response to Non-Motion
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 2/5/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 1/25/2019, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 1/18/2019, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 1/18/2019, Entered: None Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 1/8/2019, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 1/8/2019, Entered: None Recusal
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 1/3/2019, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 12/28/2018, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 12/28/2018, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 12/27/2018, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 12/27/2018, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 12/26/2018, Entered: None Response to Non-Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 12/20/2018, Entered: None Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 12/18/2018, Entered: None Response to Non-Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: None Acknowledgment of Receipt
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 12/12/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 12/12/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 11/9/2018, Entered: None Acknowledgment of Receipt
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 10/24/2018, Entered: None Response to Non-Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 10/18/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 10/12/2018, Entered: None Status report
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 9/25/2018, Entered: None Status report
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 9/19/2018, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 9/19/2018, Entered: None Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 9/19/2018, Entered: None Response to Non-Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 9/19/2018, Entered: None Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 9/11/2018, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 9/6/2018, Entered: None Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 9/5/2018, Entered: None More Definite Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 9/5/2018, Entered: None Objection to Report and Recommendations
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 9/5/2018, Entered: None Suggestion of Bankruptcy
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 9/5/2018, Entered: None Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 9/4/2018, Entered: None Admitted Exhibits List
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 9/4/2018, Entered: None Memorandum and OpinionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE for 47 Report and Recommendations. It is ORDERED that Plaintiff Feysal Ayati-Ghaffari's Emergency Motion for Relief from 9/4/2018 Auction to Properly Plead (Dkt. 25 ) is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 9/4/2018. (baf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 9/4/2018, Entered: None Response to Non-Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 8/31/2018, Entered: None Additional Attachments to Main Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 8/31/2018, Entered: None Objection to Report and Recommendations
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 8/31/2018, Entered: None order on motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 8/31/2018, Entered: None Report and Recommendations
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 8/31/2018, Entered: None Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 8/31/2018, Entered: None Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 8/31/2018, Entered: None Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 8/31/2018, Entered: None Consolidate Cases
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 8/31/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 8/30/2018, Entered: None Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 8/30/2018, Entered: None Order Setting Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 8/30/2018, Entered: None Response to Non-Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 8/29/2018, Entered: None Response to Non-Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 8/29/2018, Entered: None scheduling conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 8/28/2018, Entered: None scheduling conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 8/28/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 8/28/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 8/28/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 8/28/2018, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 8/28/2018, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 8/23/2018, Entered: None Response to Non-Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 8/23/2018, Entered: None Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 8/23/2018, Entered: None Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 8/22/2018, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/22/2018, Entered: None Response to Non-Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 8/20/2018, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/20/2018, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/17/2018, Entered: None Response to Non-Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/17/2018, Entered: None Response to Non-Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/15/2018, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/13/2018, Entered: None Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/9/2018, Entered: None Sanctions
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/6/2018, Entered: None Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/6/2018, Entered: None Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/31/2018, Entered: None Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/31/2018, Entered: None Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/31/2018, Entered: None Report of Rule 26.f Planning Meeting
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/30/2018, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/30/2018, Entered: None Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/30/2018, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/20/2018, Entered: None Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/17/2018, Entered: None Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/16/2018, Entered: None Acknowledgment of Receipt
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/16/2018, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/10/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/10/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/9/2018, Entered: None Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/9/2018, Entered: None Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/9/2018, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/9/2018, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/9/2018, Entered: None notice of removal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 2 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?